Saul et al v. Ecolab Inc.
Plaintiff: Tammy Tucker Saul and Gregory saul
Defendant: Ecolab Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv01717
Filed: June 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: William J Martinez
Referring Judge: Nina Y Wang
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2021 Filing 20 Proposed Scheduling Order by Defendant Ecolab Inc.. (Gill, Ryan)
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER: Counsel for the parties and all counsel who may later enter an appearance shall review and familiarize themselves with the undersigned's Revised Practice Standards (as most recently revised effective December 1, 2020 and as they may be amended from time to time), which may be downloaded #here. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 8/ 2/2021. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Magistrate Judge Wang, or such other Magistrate Judge who may in the future be reassigned this case, is designated to conduct NDISPO proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 72(a) and (b). Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the Magistrate Judge or on the request of the parties by motion, the court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 8/2/2021. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
July 23, 2021 Filing 17 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #16 Consent/Non-Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge William J. Martinez. All future pleadings should be designated as 21-cv-01717-WJM. (Text Only Entry). (alave, )
July 23, 2021 Filing 16 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant Ecolab Inc. All parties do not consent.. (Gill, Ryan)
July 23, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Victoria Brittany Hambley on behalf of Ecolab Inc.Attorney Victoria Brittany Hambley added to party Ecolab Inc.(pty:dft) (Hambley, Victoria)
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER granting #13 Motion to Continue. The Scheduling Conference is RE-SET for 8/26/2021 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. The Parties' Proposed Scheduling Order is due 8/19/2021. The Consent Form deadline REMAINS SET. By Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 07/13/21. Text Only Entry(nywlc2, )
July 12, 2021 Filing 13 First MOTION to Continue Scheduling Conference set for August 10, 2021 by Plaintiffs Gregory Saul, Tammy Tucker Saul. (Cannon, Sam)
June 28, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Joanna M. Frederick, Esq. by Joanna Marie Frederick on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Joanna Marie Frederick added to party Gregory Saul(pty:pla), Attorney Joanna Marie Frederick added to party Tammy Tucker Saul(pty:pla) (Frederick, Joanna)
June 28, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Sam Cannon, Esq. by Sam C. Cannon on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Sam C. Cannon added to party Gregory Saul(pty:pla), Attorney Sam C. Cannon added to party Tammy Tucker Saul(pty:pla) (Cannon, Sam)
June 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 06/25/2021 Setting Scheduling/ Planning Conference and Setting Deadline for Filing of Consent/Non-Consent Form. Consent Form due by 7/27/2021. Proposed Scheduling Order due 8/3/2021 Telephonic Scheduling Planning Conference set for 8/10/2021 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. (nmarb, )
June 23, 2021 Filing 12 RETURN of Service of Summons, Amended Complaint upon Ecolab Inc. on 5/28/2021 (cpomm, )
June 23, 2021 Filing 8 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (cpomm, )
June 23, 2021 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Ecolab Inc., filed by Tammy Tucker Saul, Gregory Saul.(cpomm, )
June 23, 2021 Filing 6 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Text Only Entry (cpomm, )
June 23, 2021 Filing 5 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (cpomm, )
June 23, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of State Court Document to #1 Notice of Removal - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal of State Action to U.S. District Court by Defendant Ecolab Inc. (Gill, Ryan) (Modified on 7/29/2021 to correct docket text (trvo, ).
June 23, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE re Civil Cover Sheet by Defendant Ecolab Inc. (Gill, Ryan)
June 23, 2021 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Gill, Ryan)
June 23, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Ecolab Inc. from District Court, County of Denver, State of Colorado, Case Number 2021CV31068. (Filing fee $ 402, Receipt Number 1082-7928612), filed by Ecolab Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit C - Amended Complaint as served on Ecolab, #4 Exhibit D - Colorado Secretary of State Registered Voter Information, #5 Exhibit E - Delaware Secretary of State for Ecolab Inc., #6 Exhibit F - Minnesota Secretary of State Certificate for Defendant Ecolab Inc., #7 Exhibit G - Colorado Secretary of State - Ecolab, #8 Exhibit H - State court filings)(Gill, Ryan) (Modified on 7/29/2021 to correct main document) (trvo, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Saul et al v. Ecolab Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tammy Tucker Saul
Represented By: Joanna Marie Frederick
Represented By: Sam C. Cannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory saul
Represented By: Joanna Marie Frederick
Represented By: Sam C. Cannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ecolab Inc.
Represented By: Ryan Christopher Gill
Represented By: Victoria Brittany Hambley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?