Franco v. McLeish
Plaintiff: Jose Loviano Franco
Defendant: David McLeish
Interested Party: Indemnity Insurance Company of North America
Case Number: 1:2021cv01736
Filed: June 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Daniel D Domenico
Referring Judge: Kathleen M Tafoya
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 27, 2021 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION to Intervene by Interested Party Indemnity Insurance Company of North America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint in Intervention)(Derwinski, Anthony) Modified on 8/9/2021 to correct party designation (athom, ).
June 30, 2021 Filing 10 ANSWER to #3 Complaint and Jury Demand by David McLeish.(Dagner, Deana)
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE DEADLINES. Proposed Scheduling Order due 8/24/2021. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 6/28/2021. (evaug )
June 28, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jennifer Torres on behalf of Jose Loviano FrancoAttorney Jennifer Torres added to party Jose Loviano Franco(pty:pla) (Torres, Jennifer)
June 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of Local Civ. R. 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions, and (5) pursuant to Local Civ. R. 16.6 and at the discretion of the Magistrate Judge, convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 6/25/2021. Text Only Entry (dddlc2, )
June 25, 2021 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (jtorr, )
June 25, 2021 Filing 5 Case assigned to Judge Daniel D. Domenico and drawn to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Text Only Entry. (jtorr, )
June 25, 2021 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons, District Court Civil Case Cover Sheet, and Complaint upon David McLeish on 06/07/2021. (jtorr, )
June 25, 2021 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against David McLeish, filed by Jose Loviano Franco.(jtorr, )
June 25, 2021 Filing 2 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (jtorr, )
June 25, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by David McLeish from Pueblo District Court, Case Number 2021CV30200. (Filing fee $ 402, Receipt Number 1082-7931337), filed by David McLeish. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Dagner, Deana)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Franco v. McLeish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Loviano Franco
Represented By: Jennifer Torres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David McLeish
Represented By: Deana R. Dagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Indemnity Insurance Company of North America
Represented By: Anthony E. Derwinski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?