Fairweather v. Eisai, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Robin Fairweather
Defendant: Arena Pharmaceuticals GmbH, Arena Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Eisai Co., Ltd and Eisai, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv01811
Filed: July 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Daniel D Domenico
Referring Judge: Kathleen M Tafoya
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 AMENDED ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE DEADLINES. Proposed Scheduling Order due 10/15/2021. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 8/12/2021. (evaug)
August 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MINUTE ORDER granting #17 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants Eisai Inc. and Arena Pharmaceuticals, Inc., shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint on or before September 27, 2021. The deadlines set forth in the Order Setting Initial Case Deadlines are vacated, to be reset by separate order. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 8/11/21. Text Only Entry(kmtlc1 )
August 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER REFERRING MOTION: #17 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Extend all Current Deadlines filed by Eisai, Inc. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 8/11/2021. Text Only Entry (dddlc1, )
August 11, 2021 Filing 18 Defendants Eisai Co., Ltd. and Arena Pharmaceuticals GmbH terminated pursuant to #13 Notice of Partial Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice filed on 8/11/2021. Text Only Entry (dddlc1, )
August 11, 2021 Filing 17 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Extend all Current Deadlines by Defendant Eisai, Inc.. (Douglas, Matthew)
August 11, 2021 Filing 16 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Eisai Co., Ltd for Eisai, Inc.. (Douglas, Matthew)
August 11, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Adrienne Darrow Boyd on behalf of Eisai, Inc.Attorney Adrienne Darrow Boyd added to party Eisai, Inc.(pty:dft) (Boyd, Adrienne)
August 11, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Matthew J. Douglas on behalf of Eisai, Inc.Attorney Matthew J. Douglas added to party Eisai, Inc.(pty:dft) (Douglas, Matthew)
August 11, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Party EISAI CO, LTD and ARENA PHARMACEUTICALS GMBH by Plaintiff Robin Fairweather (Katz, Seth)
August 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER re: #11 Response to Order to Show Cause. Being satisfied that cause has been shown and that Plaintiff has adequately alleged facts supporting the Court's subject-matter jurisdiction over this case, #8 Order to Show Cause is hereby DISCHARGED. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a)(1)(A), Plaintiff may amend her complaint as a matter of course, without the Court's leave, within twenty-one days after serving it. If Plaintiff does so, she must comply with Local Civ. R. 15.1(a) by filing a notice of filing the Amended Complaint with a copy of the Amended Complaint attached as an exhibit to the notice that strikes through (e.g., strikes through) the text deleted from the original Complaint and underlines (e.g., underlines) the text added to the Amended Complaint. SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 8/5/2021. Text Only Entry (dddlc1, )
August 4, 2021 Filing 11 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #8 by Plaintiff Robin Fairweather. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Seth Katz)(Katz, Seth)
July 28, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robin Fairweather. Arena Pharmaceuticals, Inc. served on 7/23/2021, answer due 8/13/2021. (Katz, Seth)
July 28, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robin Fairweather. Eisai, Inc. served on 7/23/2021, answer due 8/13/2021. (Katz, Seth)
July 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. It is ORDERED that on or before 8/6/2021, Plaintiff must show cause why this case should not be dismissed due to the Court's lack of subject-matter jurisdiction. By Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 07/23/2021. (athom, )
July 21, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONSES issued by Clerk. (athom, )
July 21, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS REQUEST as to EISAI, INC. re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Robin Fairweather. (Attachments: #1 Summons EISAI CO., LTD, #2 Summons ARENA PHARMACEUTICALS GmbH, #3 Summons ARENA PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.)(Katz, Seth)
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE DEADLINES. Proposed Scheduling Order due 8/31/2021. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 7/8/2021. (evaug )
July 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of Local Civ. R. 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions, and (5) pursuant to Local Civ. R. 16.6 and at the discretion of the Magistrate Judge, convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 7/7/2021. Text Only Entry (dddlc1, )
July 2, 2021 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). No Summons Issued (cpomm, )
July 2, 2021 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge Daniel D. Domenico and drawn to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Text Only Entry (cpomm, )
July 2, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Arena Pharmaceuticals GmbH, Arena Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Eisai Co., Ltd, Eisai, Inc. (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number 1082-7942354)Attorney Seth Alan Katz added to party Robin Fairweather(pty:pla), filed by Robin Fairweather. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Katz, Seth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fairweather v. Eisai, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robin Fairweather
Represented By: Seth Alan Katz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arena Pharmaceuticals GmbH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arena Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eisai Co., Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eisai, Inc.
Represented By: Adrienne Darrow Boyd
Represented By: Matthew J. Douglas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?