Advisor Law PLLC v. AdvisorLaw, LLC
Plaintiff: Advisor Law PLLC
Defendant: AdvisorLaw LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv01830
Filed: July 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Raymond P Moore
Referring Judge: Nina Y Wang
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 3, 2021 Filing 35 Civil Case Terminated pursuant to #34 Stipulation to dismiss. Text Only Entry. (rvill, )
August 2, 2021 Filing 34 Stipulated MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice by Defendant AdvisorLaw LLC. (Eismeier, Dana)
July 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER SETTING RULE 16(b) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 7/29/2021. A Scheduling Conference is set for 9/7/2021 01:00 PM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. The parties shall electronically file their proposed scheduling order and also provide a copy in Word format sent via email to Wang_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov, on or before 8/31/2021. (bwilk, )
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MINUTE ORDER: With the assignment of this matter, the parties are advised that throughout this case they are expected to be familiar and comply with not only the Local Rules of this District, but also Judge Raymond P. Moore's Civil Practice Standards, which may be found at: http://www.cod.uscourts.gov/JudicialOfficers/ActiveArticleIIIJudges/HonRaymondPMoore.aspx. SO ORDERED by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 7/8/2021. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order, and (5) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. By Judge Raymond P. Moore on 7/8/2021. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
July 6, 2021 Filing 30 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (cpomm, )
July 6, 2021 Filing 29 Case assigned to Judge Raymond P. Moore and drawn to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Text Only Entry (cpomm, )
July 6, 2021 Filing 28 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (cpomm, )
July 6, 2021 Filing 27 Case transferred in from District of Florida Southern; Case Number 9:21-cv-80042. File, transfer order and docket sheet received
July 6, 2021 Filing 26 FORM AO 120 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. PATENT AND TRADEMARK (Attachments: #1 Order) (ebz) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 7/6/2021.]
July 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER. Defendant's Motion to Transfer Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) DE #9 is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is directed to transfer this case to the District of Colorado and thereafter CLOSE this case and DENY AS MOOT any pending motions. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 7/6/2021. See attached document for full details. (ebz) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 7/6/2021.]
July 6, 2021 Filing 24 Joint NOTICE of Mediator Selection. Notice of Scheduling Mediation Selected/Added Glenn J. Waldman as Mediator. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lott, Leslie) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 7/6/2021.]
July 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Civil Case Terminated per DE#25 ORDER. Defendant's Motion to Transfer Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) DE #9 is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is directed to transfer this case to the District of Colorado and thereafter CLOSE this case and DENY AS MOOT any pending motions. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 7/6/2021. Closing Case. (ebz) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 7/6/2021.]
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER SETTING DISCOVERY PROCEDURE. Signed by Magistrate Judge William Matthewman on 5/7/2021. See attached document for full details. (kza) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 7/6/2021.]
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND PRE-TRIAL SCHEDULE, REQUIRING MEDIATION, AND REFERRING CERTAIN MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE (Jury Trial set for 9/12/2022 09:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge Raag Singhal., Calendar Call set for 9/9/2022 10:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge Raag Singhal., Amended Pleadings due by 8/30/2021., Discovery due by 2/11/2022., Expert Discovery due by 2/11/2022., Fact Discovery due by 2/11/2022., Joinder of Parties due by 8/30/2021., Mediation Deadline 5/26/2022., In Limine Motions due by 7/29/2022., Dispositive Motions due by 4/29/2022., Motions due by 4/29/2022., Pretrial Stipulation due by 8/30/2022), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. (Mediation Deadline 5/26/2022), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge William Matthewman for Discovery Matters. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 5/6/2021. See attached document for full details. (ebz) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here. [Transferred from Florida Southern on 7/6/2021.]
May 5, 2021 Filing 21 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 26(f) by Advisor Law PLLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Scheduling Order)(DeSouza, Daniel) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 7/6/2021.]
April 23, 2021 Filing 20 REPLY to Response to Motion re #9 Defendant's MOTION to Change Venue AdvisorLaw, LLC's Motion to Transfer Venue Defendant's Reply in Support of Motion to Transfer Venue filed by AdvisorLaw, LLC. (Lott, Leslie) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 7/6/2021.]
April 23, 2021 Filing 19 REPLY to Response to Motion re #10 Defendant's MOTION to Stay re #9 Defendant's MOTION to Change Venue AdvisorLaw, LLC's Motion to Transfer Venue Defendant AdvisorLaw, LLC's Motion to Stay Pending Order on Motion to Transfer Defendant's Reply in Support of Motion to Stay Pending Order on Motion to Transfer filed by AdvisorLaw, LLC. (Lott, Leslie) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 7/6/2021.]
April 16, 2021 Filing 18 RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 Defendant's MOTION to Stay re #9 Defendant's MOTION to Change Venue AdvisorLaw, LLC's Motion to Transfer Venue Defendant AdvisorLaw, LLC's Motion to Stay Pending Order on Motion to Transfer filed by Advisor Law PLLC. Replies due by 4/23/2021. (DeSouza, Daniel) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 7/6/2021.]
April 16, 2021 Filing 17 RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 Defendant's MOTION to Change Venue AdvisorLaw, LLC's Motion to Transfer Venue filed by Advisor Law PLLC. Replies due by 4/23/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration)(DeSouza, Daniel) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 7/6/2021.]
April 16, 2021 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Advisor Law PLLC (DeSouza, Daniel) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 7/6/2021.]
April 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Michael Ley. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 4/12/2021. (pb00) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 7/6/2021.]
April 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Dana L. Eismeier. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 4/12/2021. (pb00) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 7/6/2021.]
April 12, 2021 Filing 13 Defendant's MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Michael Ley. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-14598882 by AdvisorLaw, LLC. Responses due by 4/26/2021 (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Lott, Leslie) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 7/6/2021.]
April 12, 2021 Filing 12 Defendant's MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Dana L. Eismeier. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-14598792 by AdvisorLaw, LLC. Responses due by 4/26/2021 (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Lott, Leslie) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 7/6/2021.]
April 12, 2021 Filing 11 Defendant's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by AdvisorLaw, LLC (Lott, Leslie) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 7/6/2021.]
April 12, 2021 Filing 10 Defendant's MOTION to Stay re #9 Defendant's MOTION to Change Venue AdvisorLaw, LLC's Motion to Transfer Venue Defendant AdvisorLaw, LLC's Motion to Stay Pending Order on Motion to Transfer by AdvisorLaw, LLC. Responses due by 4/26/2021 (Lott, Leslie) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 7/6/2021.]
April 12, 2021 Filing 9 Defendant's MOTION to Change Venue AdvisorLaw, LLC's Motion to Transfer Venue by AdvisorLaw, LLC. Attorney Leslie Jean Lott added to party AdvisorLaw, LLC(pty:dft). Responses due by 4/26/2021 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Lott, Leslie) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 7/6/2021.]
February 12, 2021 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Advisor Law PLLC. AdvisorLaw, LLC waiver sent on 2/10/2021, answer due 4/12/2021. (DeSouza, Daniel) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 7/6/2021.]
February 12, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE by Advisor Law PLLC re #6 Summons Returned Executed Notice Withdrawing Return of Service (DeSouza, Daniel) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 7/6/2021.]
January 27, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Advisor Law PLLC. AdvisorLaw, LLC served on 1/26/2021, answer due 2/16/2021. (DeSouza, Daniel) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 7/6/2021.]
January 11, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICEUnless otherwise specified by the Court, every motion, legal memorandum, brief, and otherwise shall: be double-spaced, in justified alignment, in 12-point font, using either Times New Roman or Arial typeface. This Notice does not supplant the requirements and provisions of Local Rule 7.1(c). The Court cautions parties against excessive use of footnotes.Multiple Plaintiffs or Defendants shall file joint motions with co-parties unless there are clear conflicts of position. If conflicts of position exist, parties shall explain the conflicts in their separate motions.Failure to comply with any of these procedures may result in the imposition of appropriate sanctions. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 1/11/2021. (pb00) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 7/6/2021.]
January 11, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to AdvisorLaw, LLC. (kpe) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 7/6/2021.]
January 11, 2021 Filing 3 FORM AO 120 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. PATENT AND TRADEMARK (kpe) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 7/6/2021.]
January 8, 2021 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Raag Singhal. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge William Matthewman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (kpe) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 7/6/2021.]
January 8, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AdvisorLaw, LLC. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-14182548, filed by Advisor Law PLLC. (Attachments: #1 Summon(s) Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(DeSouza, Daniel) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 7/6/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Advisor Law PLLC v. AdvisorLaw, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Advisor Law PLLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AdvisorLaw LLC
Represented By: Dana L. Eismeier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?