Pepaj et al v. BPB, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Brooke Taylor, Jessica Golden, Rachel Bernstein, Tiffany Toth Gray, Eva Pepaj, Brooke Johnson, Jessie Golden, Rachel Koren, Tiffany Toth, Lina Posada and Marketa Kazodova
Defendant: BPB, LLC doing business as The Mansion, Colorado Springs Liquid Assets, LLC doing business as Gasoline Alley and Cansano, LLC and Does 1-10 doing business as Blondies Ultra Lounge
Case Number: 1:2021cv01849
Filed: July 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Kathleen M Tafoya
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 AMENDED ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE DEADLINES. Consent Form due by 9/27/2021. Proposed Scheduling Order due 9/27/2021. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 8/23/2021. (evaug )
August 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER granting #15 Motion for Enlargement of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint. Defendant BPB, LLC shall answer or otherwise respond by 9/13/2021. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 8/23/21. Text Only Entry(kmtlc1 )
August 20, 2021 Filing 15 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint, by Defendant BPB, LLC. (Bailey, Justin)
August 20, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Justin Tyler Bailey on behalf of BPB, LLC Attorney Justin Tyler Bailey added to party BPB, LLC (pty:dft) (Bailey, Justin)
August 17, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Joseph Anthony O'Keefe on behalf of BPB, LLC Attorney Joseph Anthony O'Keefe added to party BPB, LLC (pty:dft) (O'Keefe, Joseph)
August 3, 2021 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Cansano, LLC served on 7/31/2021, answer due 8/21/2021. (Casas, Joseph)
August 3, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Colorado Springs Liquid Assets, LLC served on 7/31/2021, answer due 8/21/2021. (Casas, Joseph)
August 3, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. BPB, LLC served on 7/31/2021, answer due 8/21/2021. (Casas, Joseph)
July 14, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Dennis C. Postiglione on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Dennis C. Postiglione added to party Rachel Bernstein(pty:pla), Attorney Dennis C. Postiglione added to party Jessica Golden(pty:pla), Attorney Dennis C. Postiglione added to party Marketa Kazodova(pty:pla), Attorney Dennis C. Postiglione added to party Eva Pepaj(pty:pla), Attorney Dennis C. Postiglione added to party Lina Posada(pty:pla), Attorney Dennis C. Postiglione added to party Brooke Taylor(pty:pla), Attorney Dennis C. Postiglione added to party Tiffany Toth Gray (pty:pla) (Postiglione, Dennis)
July 14, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by John Vincent Golaszewski on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney John Vincent Golaszewski added to party Rachel Bernstein(pty:pla), Attorney John Vincent Golaszewski added to party Jessica Golden(pty:pla), Attorney John Vincent Golaszewski added to party Marketa Kazodova(pty:pla), Attorney John Vincent Golaszewski added to party Eva Pepaj(pty:pla), Attorney John Vincent Golaszewski added to party Lina Posada(pty:pla), Attorney John Vincent Golaszewski added to party Brooke Taylor(pty:pla), Attorney John Vincent Golaszewski added to party Tiffany Toth Gray (pty:pla) (Golaszewski, John)
July 9, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONSES issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (jgonz, )
July 9, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Cansano, LLC; Colorado Springs Liquid Assets, LLC; BPB, LLC by Plaintiffs Rachel Bernstein, Jessica Golden, Marketa Kazodova, Eva Pepaj, Lina Posada, Brooke Taylor, Tiffany Toth Gray. (Attachments: #1 Summons Corrected Summons, #2 Summons Corrected Summons, #3 Summons Corrected Summons)(Casas, Joseph)
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE DEADLINES. Consent Form due by 9/1/2021. Proposed Scheduling Order due 9/1/2021. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 7/8/2021. (evaug )
July 7, 2021 Filing 4 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. NO SUMMONS ISSUED. Summons submitted has incomplete caption and not issued. Please file completed summons for issuance using the event Summons Request. (jsalz, )
July 7, 2021 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Text Only Entry. (jsalz, )
July 7, 2021 Filing 2 Filing fee: $ 402.00, receipt number COX099635 (jsalz, )
July 7, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT 1:21-cv-1849 against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402)., filed by Eva Pepaj, Lina Posada, Rachel Bernstein, Marketa Kazodova, Jessica Golden, Brooke Taylor, Tiffany Toth Gray. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A-D, #2 Summons The Mansions Summons, #3 Summons Gasoline Alley Summons, #4 Summons Blondie's Ultra Lounge Summons, #5 Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet)(Casas, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pepaj et al v. BPB, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brooke Taylor
Represented By: Joseph N. Casas
Represented By: Dennis C. Postiglione
Represented By: John Vincent Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Golden
Represented By: Joseph N. Casas
Represented By: Dennis C. Postiglione
Represented By: John Vincent Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachel Bernstein
Represented By: Joseph N. Casas
Represented By: Dennis C. Postiglione
Represented By: John Vincent Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiffany Toth Gray
Represented By: Joseph N. Casas
Represented By: Dennis C. Postiglione
Represented By: John Vincent Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eva Pepaj
Represented By: Joseph N. Casas
Represented By: Dennis C. Postiglione
Represented By: John Vincent Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brooke Johnson
Represented By: Joseph N. Casas
Represented By: Dennis C. Postiglione
Represented By: John Vincent Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessie Golden
Represented By: Joseph N. Casas
Represented By: Dennis C. Postiglione
Represented By: John Vincent Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachel Koren
Represented By: Joseph N. Casas
Represented By: Dennis C. Postiglione
Represented By: John Vincent Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiffany Toth
Represented By: Joseph N. Casas
Represented By: Dennis C. Postiglione
Represented By: John Vincent Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lina Posada
Represented By: Joseph N. Casas
Represented By: Dennis C. Postiglione
Represented By: John Vincent Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marketa Kazodova
Represented By: Joseph N. Casas
Represented By: Dennis C. Postiglione
Represented By: John Vincent Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BPB, LLC doing business as The Mansion
Represented By: Joseph Anthony O'Keefe
Represented By: Justin Tyler Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colorado Springs Liquid Assets, LLC doing business as Gasoline Alley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cansano, LLC and Does 1-10 doing business as Blondies Ultra Lounge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?