Garner v. International Union, United Automobile, Aerospace and Agricultural Implement Workers of America
Plaintiff: Eric L. Garner
Defendant: International Union, United Automobile, Aerospace and Agricultural Implement Workers of America
Case Number: 1:2021cv01860
Filed: July 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Christine M Arguello
Referring Judge: Nina Y Wang
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Magistrate Judge Wang is designated to conduct NDISPO proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b). Court-sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. The Magistrate Judge, at his/her discretion, may convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. SO ORDERED by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 9/3/2021. Text Only Entry (cmasec)
September 2, 2021 Filing 9 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #8 . All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Christine M. Arguello. All future pleadings should be designated as 21-cv-01860-CMA. (Text Only Entry) (cmadr, )
September 1, 2021 Filing 8 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Eric L. Garner Plaintiff does not consent. (cmadr, )
September 1, 2021 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS Returned Executed by Eric L. Garner. International Union, United Automobile, Aerospace and Agricultural Implement Workers of America waiver sent on 8/13/2021, answer due 10/12/2021. (alave, )
August 16, 2021 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Service by Mail by Clerk of Court re #5 Minute Order, to Eric L. Garner, 9100 East Girard Avenue, Apartment 12, Denver, CO 80231. Text Only Entry. (alave, )
August 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 08/13/2021. Consent Form due by 9/7/2021. Telephonic Status Conference set for 9/21/2021 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. All participants shall use the following dial-in information: 888-363-4749, Access Code: 5738976#. A copy of this Minute Order shall be sent to: Eric L. Garner, 9100 East Girard Avenue, Apartment 12 Denver, CO 80231. (alave, )
August 2, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued over counter by Clerk. (cpomm, )
July 8, 2021 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. NO SUMMONS ISSUED. (jsalz, )
July 8, 2021 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Text Only Entry (jsalz, )
July 8, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against International Union, United Automobile, Aerospace and Agricultural Implement Workers of America. Filing Fee: $402.00 Receipt Number: COX099638, filed by Eric L. Garner. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Receipt)(jsalz, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garner v. International Union, United Automobile, Aerospace and Agricultural Implement Workers of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric L. Garner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Union, United Automobile, Aerospace and Agricultural Implement Workers of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?