211 Productions, Inc. et al v. WideOpenWest Finance, LLC
Plaintiff: 211 Productions, Inc., After II Movie, LLC, AMBI Distribution Corp., Badhouse Studios, LLC, Bodyguard Productions, Inc, Dallas Buyers Club, LLC, Day of Dead Productions, Inc., Eve Nevada, LLC, Hannibal Classics, Inc., HUNTER KILLER PRODUCTIONS, INC., I am Wrath Production, Inc., Justice Everywhere Productions, LLC, Killing Link Distribution, LLC, LF2 Productions, Inc., LHF Productions, Inc., Millennium Funding, Inc., Millennium IP, Inc., Millennium Media, Inc., MON, LLC, Nikola Productions, Inc., Outpost Productions, Inc., Paradox Studios, LLC, RAMBO V PRODUCTIONS, INC., Rupture CAL, Inc., Screen Media Ventures, LLC, Venice PI, LLC., Voltage Holdings, LLC. and Wonder One, LLC
Defendant: WIDEOPENWEST Finance, LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv01901
Filed: July 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Daniel D Domenico
Referring Judge: Michael E Hegarty
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 2 September 2021. For good cause shown, the parties' Joint Stipulated Motion to Continue Scheduling Conference #20 is granted. The Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) Scheduling Conference currently set for September 30, 2021 is vacated and rescheduled for October 28, 2021, at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom A-501, on the fifth floor of the Alfred A. Arraj United States Courthouse located at 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado.(cmadr, )
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER REFERRING MOTION: #20 Joint Motion to Continue Scheduling Conference filed by WideOpenWest Finance, LLC. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 9/2/2021. Text Only Entry (dddlc1, )
September 2, 2021 Filing 20 Joint MOTION to Continue Scheduling Conference by Defendant WideOpenWest Finance, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Szewczyk, Margaret)
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER GRANTING #18 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond. Defendant WideOpenWest Finance, LLC must answer or otherwise respond to #1 Complaint on or before 9/20/2021. SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 9/1/2021. Text Only Entry (dddlc1, )
September 1, 2021 Filing 18 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,, by Defendant WideOpenWest Finance, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Szewczyk, Margaret)
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 30 August 2021. Due to a conflict on the Court's calendar, the Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) Scheduling Conference set for September 16, 2021 is vacated and rescheduled for September 30, 2021, at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom A-501, on the fifth floor of the Alfred A. Arraj United States Courthouse located at 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado. (cmadr, )
August 3, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Zachary Charles Howenstine on behalf of WideOpenWest Finance, LLCAttorney Zachary Charles Howenstine added to party WideOpenWest Finance, LLC(pty:dft) (Howenstine, Zachary)
August 3, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Richard L. Brophy on behalf of WideOpenWest Finance, LLCAttorney Richard L. Brophy added to party WideOpenWest Finance, LLC(pty:dft) (Brophy, Richard)
August 3, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Margaret R. Szewczyk on behalf of WideOpenWest Finance, LLC (Szewczyk, Margaret)
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING #12 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond. Defendant must answer or otherwise respond to #1 Complaint on or before 9/6/2021. SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 8/2/2021. Text Only Entry (dddlc1, )
August 2, 2021 Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,, by Defendant WideOpenWest Finance, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Szewczyk, Margaret)
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 16 July 2021. Proposed Scheduling Order due 9/9/2021. Scheduling Conference set for 9/16/2021 01:30 PM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. (cmadr, )
July 15, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by I am Wrath Production, Inc., Outpost Productions, Inc., Day of Dead Productions, Inc., Venice PI, LLC., Millennium IP, Inc., After II Movie, LLC, Paradox Studios, LLC, 211 Productions, Inc., Millennium Media, Inc., Rambo V Productions, Inc., Millennium Funding, Inc., Killing Link Distribution, LLC, Voltage Holdings, LLC., Screen Media Ventures, LLC, Dallas Buyers Club, LLC, Wonder One, LLC, AMBI Distribution Corp., Hannibal Classics, Inc., Justice Everywhere Productions, LLC, Nikola Productions, Inc., LF2 Productions, Inc., LHF Productions, Inc., Eve Nevada, LLC, Badhouse Studios, LLC, Rupture CAL, Inc., Hunter Killer Productions, Inc., MON, LLC, Bodyguard Productions, Inc. WideOpenWest Finance, LLC served on 7/15/2021, answer due 8/5/2021. (Culpepper, Kerry)
July 15, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by F. Christopher Austin on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney F. Christopher Austin added to party 211 Productions, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney F. Christopher Austin added to party AMBI Distribution Corp.(pty:pla), Attorney F. Christopher Austin added to party After II Movie, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney F. Christopher Austin added to party Badhouse Studios, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney F. Christopher Austin added to party Bodyguard Productions, Inc(pty:pla), Attorney F. Christopher Austin added to party Dallas Buyers Club, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney F. Christopher Austin added to party Day of Dead Productions, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney F. Christopher Austin added to party Eve Nevada, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney F. Christopher Austin added to party Hannibal Classics, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney F. Christopher Austin added to party Hunter Killer Productions, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney F. Christopher Austin added to party I am Wrath Production, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney F. Christopher Austin added to party Justice Everywhere Productions, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney F. Christopher Austin added to party Killing Link Distribution, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney F. Christopher Austin added to party LF2 Productions, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney F. Christopher Austin added to party LHF Productions, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney F. Christopher Austin added to party MON, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney F. Christopher Austin added to party Millennium Funding, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney F. Christopher Austin added to party Millennium IP, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney F. Christopher Austin added to party Millennium Media, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney F. Christopher Austin added to party Nikola Productions, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney F. Christopher Austin added to party Outpost Productions, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney F. Christopher Austin added to party Paradox Studios, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney F. Christopher Austin added to party Rambo V Productions, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney F. Christopher Austin added to party Rupture CAL, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney F. Christopher Austin added to party Screen Media Ventures, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney F. Christopher Austin added to party Venice PI, LLC.(pty:pla), Attorney F. Christopher Austin added to party Voltage Holdings, LLC.(pty:pla), Attorney F. Christopher Austin added to party Wonder One, LLC(pty:pla) (Austin, F.)
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of Local Civ. R. 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions, and (5) pursuant to Local Civ. R. 16.6 and at the discretion of the Magistrate Judge, convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 7/15/2021. Text Only Entry (dddlc1, )
July 14, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Kerry Steven Culpepper on behalf of 211 Productions, Inc., AMBI Distribution Corp., After II Movie, LLC, Badhouse Studios, LLC, Bodyguard Productions, Inc, Dallas Buyers Club, LLC, Day of Dead Productions, Inc., Eve Nevada, LLC, Hannibal Classics, Inc., Hunter Killer Productions, Inc., I am Wrath Production, Inc., Justice Everywhere Productions, LLC, Killing Link Distribution, LLC, LF2 Productions, Inc., LHF Productions, Inc., MON, LLC, Millennium Funding, Inc., Millennium IP, Inc., Millennium Media, Inc., Nikola Productions, Inc., Outpost Productions, Inc., Paradox Studios, LLC, Rambo V Productions, Inc., Rupture CAL, Inc., Screen Media Ventures, LLC, Venice PI, LLC., Voltage Holdings, LLC., Wonder One, LLCAttorney Kerry Steven Culpepper added to party 211 Productions, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Kerry Steven Culpepper added to party AMBI Distribution Corp.(pty:pla), Attorney Kerry Steven Culpepper added to party After II Movie, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Kerry Steven Culpepper added to party Badhouse Studios, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Kerry Steven Culpepper added to party Bodyguard Productions, Inc(pty:pla), Attorney Kerry Steven Culpepper added to party Dallas Buyers Club, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Kerry Steven Culpepper added to party Day of Dead Productions, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Kerry Steven Culpepper added to party Eve Nevada, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Kerry Steven Culpepper added to party Hannibal Classics, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Kerry Steven Culpepper added to party Hunter Killer Productions, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Kerry Steven Culpepper added to party I am Wrath Production, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Kerry Steven Culpepper added to party Justice Everywhere Productions, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Kerry Steven Culpepper added to party Killing Link Distribution, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Kerry Steven Culpepper added to party LF2 Productions, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Kerry Steven Culpepper added to party LHF Productions, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Kerry Steven Culpepper added to party MON, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Kerry Steven Culpepper added to party Millennium Funding, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Kerry Steven Culpepper added to party Millennium IP, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Kerry Steven Culpepper added to party Millennium Media, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Kerry Steven Culpepper added to party Nikola Productions, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Kerry Steven Culpepper added to party Outpost Productions, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Kerry Steven Culpepper added to party Paradox Studios, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Kerry Steven Culpepper added to party Rambo V Productions, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Kerry Steven Culpepper added to party Rupture CAL, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Kerry Steven Culpepper added to party Screen Media Ventures, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Kerry Steven Culpepper added to party Venice PI, LLC.(pty:pla), Attorney Kerry Steven Culpepper added to party Voltage Holdings, LLC.(pty:pla), Attorney Kerry Steven Culpepper added to party Wonder One, LLC(pty:pla) (Culpepper, Kerry)
July 14, 2021 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Daniel D. Domenico for all further proceedings. All future pleadings should be designated as 21-cv-01901-DDD-MEH. (sphil, )
July 14, 2021 Filing 5 Report re Copyright: Report on the filing of an action emailed separately to the Director of the Copyright Office. (cpomm, )
July 14, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (cpomm, )
July 13, 2021 Filing 3 Case assigned to Judge Marcia S. Krieger and drawn to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Text Only Entry (cpomm, )
July 13, 2021 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Millennium IP, Inc. for 211 Productions, Inc., LF2 Productions, Inc., RAMBO V PRODUCTIONS, INC.; Corporate Parent Millennium Funding, Inc. for Bodyguard Productions, Inc, HUNTER KILLER PRODUCTIONS, INC., LHF Productions, Inc.; Corporate Parent Millennium Media, Inc. for Day of Dead Productions, Inc., Nikola Productions, Inc., Outpost Productions, Inc.; Corporate Parent Voltage Pictures, LLC for After II Movie, LLC, Dallas Buyers Club, LLC, Eve Nevada, LLC, MON, LLC, Venice PI, LLC., Wonder One, LLC; Corporate Parent AMBI Distribution Corp. for Paradox Studios, LLC, Rupture CAL, Inc.; Corporate Parent Hannibal Classics, Inc. for I am Wrath Production, Inc., Justice Everywhere Productions, LLC; Corporate Parent Hannibal Media, Inc. for Badhouse Studios, LLC; Corporate Parent Cinetel Films, Inc. for Killing Link Distribution, LLC. (Lee, Joshua)
July 13, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for contributory infringement and vicarious infringement against WIDEOPENWEST Finance, LLC (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number 1082-7957593)Attorney Joshua J. Lee added to party 211 Productions, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Joshua J. Lee added to party AMBI Distribution Corp.(pty:pla), Attorney Joshua J. Lee added to party After II Movie, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Joshua J. Lee added to party Badhouse Studios, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Joshua J. Lee added to party Bodyguard Productions, Inc(pty:pla), Attorney Joshua J. Lee added to party Dallas Buyers Club, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Joshua J. Lee added to party Day of Dead Productions, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Joshua J. Lee added to party Eve Nevada, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Joshua J. Lee added to party HUNTER KILLER PRODUCTIONS, INC.(pty:pla), Attorney Joshua J. Lee added to party Hannibal Classics, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Joshua J. Lee added to party I am Wrath Production, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Joshua J. Lee added to party Justice Everywhere Productions, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Joshua J. Lee added to party Killing Link Distribution, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Joshua J. Lee added to party LF2 Productions, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Joshua J. Lee added to party LHF Productions, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Joshua J. Lee added to party MON, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Joshua J. Lee added to party Millennium Funding, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Joshua J. Lee added to party Millennium IP, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Joshua J. Lee added to party Millennium Media, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Joshua J. Lee added to party Nikola Productions, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Joshua J. Lee added to party Outpost Productions, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Joshua J. Lee added to party Paradox Studios, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Joshua J. Lee added to party RAMBO V PRODUCTIONS, INC.(pty:pla), Attorney Joshua J. Lee added to party Rupture CAL, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Joshua J. Lee added to party Screen Media Ventures, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Joshua J. Lee added to party Venice PI, LLC.(pty:pla), Attorney Joshua J. Lee added to party Voltage Holdings, LLC.(pty:pla), Attorney Joshua J. Lee added to party Wonder One, LLC(pty:pla), filed by I am Wrath Production, Inc., Outpost Productions, Inc., Day of Dead Productions, Inc., Venice PI, LLC., Millennium IP, Inc., After II Movie, LLC, Paradox Studios, LLC, 211 Productions, Inc., Millennium Media, Inc., RAMBO V PRODUCTIONS, INC., Millennium Funding, Inc., Killing Link Distribution, LLC, Voltage Holdings, LLC., Screen Media Ventures, LLC, Dallas Buyers Club, LLC, Wonder One, LLC, AMBI Distribution Corp., Hannibal Classics, Inc., Justice Everywhere Productions, LLC, Nikola Productions, Inc., LF2 Productions, Inc., LHF Productions, Inc., Eve Nevada, LLC, Badhouse Studios, LLC, Rupture CAL, Inc., HUNTER KILLER PRODUCTIONS, INC., MON, LLC, Bodyguard Productions, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Affidavit Declaration of KS, #5 Affidavit Declaration of SWC, #6 Summons, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lee, Joshua)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: 211 Productions, Inc. et al v. WideOpenWest Finance, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 211 Productions, Inc.
Represented By: Joshua J. Lee
Represented By: F. Christopher Austin
Represented By: Kerry Steven Culpepper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: After II Movie, LLC
Represented By: Joshua J. Lee
Represented By: F. Christopher Austin
Represented By: Kerry Steven Culpepper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMBI Distribution Corp.
Represented By: Joshua J. Lee
Represented By: F. Christopher Austin
Represented By: Kerry Steven Culpepper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Badhouse Studios, LLC
Represented By: Joshua J. Lee
Represented By: F. Christopher Austin
Represented By: Kerry Steven Culpepper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bodyguard Productions, Inc
Represented By: Joshua J. Lee
Represented By: F. Christopher Austin
Represented By: Kerry Steven Culpepper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dallas Buyers Club, LLC
Represented By: Joshua J. Lee
Represented By: F. Christopher Austin
Represented By: Kerry Steven Culpepper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Day of Dead Productions, Inc.
Represented By: Joshua J. Lee
Represented By: F. Christopher Austin
Represented By: Kerry Steven Culpepper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eve Nevada, LLC
Represented By: Joshua J. Lee
Represented By: F. Christopher Austin
Represented By: Kerry Steven Culpepper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hannibal Classics, Inc.
Represented By: Joshua J. Lee
Represented By: F. Christopher Austin
Represented By: Kerry Steven Culpepper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HUNTER KILLER PRODUCTIONS, INC.
Represented By: Joshua J. Lee
Represented By: F. Christopher Austin
Represented By: Kerry Steven Culpepper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: I am Wrath Production, Inc.
Represented By: Joshua J. Lee
Represented By: F. Christopher Austin
Represented By: Kerry Steven Culpepper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justice Everywhere Productions, LLC
Represented By: Joshua J. Lee
Represented By: F. Christopher Austin
Represented By: Kerry Steven Culpepper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Killing Link Distribution, LLC
Represented By: Joshua J. Lee
Represented By: F. Christopher Austin
Represented By: Kerry Steven Culpepper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LF2 Productions, Inc.
Represented By: Joshua J. Lee
Represented By: F. Christopher Austin
Represented By: Kerry Steven Culpepper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LHF Productions, Inc.
Represented By: Joshua J. Lee
Represented By: F. Christopher Austin
Represented By: Kerry Steven Culpepper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Millennium Funding, Inc.
Represented By: Joshua J. Lee
Represented By: F. Christopher Austin
Represented By: Kerry Steven Culpepper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Millennium IP, Inc.
Represented By: Joshua J. Lee
Represented By: F. Christopher Austin
Represented By: Kerry Steven Culpepper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Millennium Media, Inc.
Represented By: Joshua J. Lee
Represented By: F. Christopher Austin
Represented By: Kerry Steven Culpepper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MON, LLC
Represented By: Joshua J. Lee
Represented By: F. Christopher Austin
Represented By: Kerry Steven Culpepper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nikola Productions, Inc.
Represented By: Joshua J. Lee
Represented By: F. Christopher Austin
Represented By: Kerry Steven Culpepper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Outpost Productions, Inc.
Represented By: Joshua J. Lee
Represented By: F. Christopher Austin
Represented By: Kerry Steven Culpepper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paradox Studios, LLC
Represented By: Joshua J. Lee
Represented By: F. Christopher Austin
Represented By: Kerry Steven Culpepper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RAMBO V PRODUCTIONS, INC.
Represented By: Joshua J. Lee
Represented By: F. Christopher Austin
Represented By: Kerry Steven Culpepper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rupture CAL, Inc.
Represented By: Joshua J. Lee
Represented By: F. Christopher Austin
Represented By: Kerry Steven Culpepper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Screen Media Ventures, LLC
Represented By: Joshua J. Lee
Represented By: F. Christopher Austin
Represented By: Kerry Steven Culpepper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Venice PI, LLC.
Represented By: Joshua J. Lee
Represented By: F. Christopher Austin
Represented By: Kerry Steven Culpepper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Voltage Holdings, LLC.
Represented By: Joshua J. Lee
Represented By: F. Christopher Austin
Represented By: Kerry Steven Culpepper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wonder One, LLC
Represented By: Joshua J. Lee
Represented By: F. Christopher Austin
Represented By: Kerry Steven Culpepper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WIDEOPENWEST Finance, LLC
Represented By: Margaret R. Szewczyk
Represented By: Richard L. Brophy
Represented By: Zachary Charles Howenstine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?