Cokan Enterprises, Inc. v. Hansen Company, Inc., The
Plaintiff: Cokan Enterprises, Inc.
Defendant: Hansen Company, Inc., The
Case Number: 1:2021cv01925
Filed: July 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Lewis T Babcock
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER re: #9 Defendant's MOTION to Stay Pending Arbitration. Defendant shall file a reply to this motion on or before September 28, 2021. Plaintiff may file a sur-reply on or before October 12, 2021, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 9/7/2021. (ebuch)
September 3, 2021 Filing 16 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #15 Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Lewis T. Babcock and drawn to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. All future pleadings should be designated as 21-cv-01925-LTB. (Text Only Entry) (agarc, )
September 3, 2021 Filing 15 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Cokan Enterprises, Inc. All parties do not consent.. (Cross, Michael)
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER Pursuant to 10 Minute Order, the parties were ordered to submit the form indicating consent/nonconsent to magistrate judge jurisdiction by 9/2/2021. No such form has been filed. Accordingly, the parties are ORDERED to file the Consent Form by 9/7/2021. SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 9/3/2021. Text Only Entry (stvlc2, )
August 27, 2021 Filing 13 RESPONSE to #9 MOTION to Stay Pending Arbitration filed by Plaintiff Cokan Enterprises, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Cross, Michael)
August 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. Plaintiff's response to #9 Motion to Stay is due 8/27/2021. SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 8/20/2021. Text Only Entry(stvlc2, )
August 20, 2021 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #9 MOTION to Stay Pending Arbitration Attorney Michael P. Cross added to party Cokan Enterprises, Inc.(pty:pla) by Plaintiff Cokan Enterprises, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Cross, Michael)
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER In light of the filing of #9 Defendant's Motion to Stay Pending Arbitration, the Scheduling Conference set for 9/16/2021 10:45 AM is VACATED to be reset, if necessary, after a ruling on the Motion. The Election Concerning Consent/Non-Consent to United States Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form remains due by 9/2/2021. SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 8/2/2021. Text Only Entry (stvlc1, )
July 30, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION to Stay Pending Arbitration by Defendant Hansen Company, Inc., The. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Motion to Stay Pending Arbitration, #2 Exhibit B to Motion to Stay Pending Arbitration)(Burkhart, Rachel)
July 22, 2021 Filing 8 ANSWER to #4 Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Hansen Company, Inc., The.(Burkhart, Rachel)
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 9/16/2021 10:45 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Consent Form due by 9/2/2021. Proposed Scheduling Order due 9/9/2021, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 7/16/2021. (jgonz, )
July 15, 2021 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (jsalz, )
July 15, 2021 Filing 5 STATE COURT ORDER Granting Defendant The Hansen Company, Inc's Unopposed Motion for an Enlargement of Time to AnswerPlaintiff's Complaint or Otherwise Respond. By Michael James Vallejos, District Court Judge, Denver County on 7/7/2021. (jsalz, )
July 15, 2021 Filing 4 COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Hansen Company, Inc., The, filed by Cokan Enterprises, Inc.(jsalz, )
July 15, 2021 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Text Only Entry (jsalz, )
July 15, 2021 Filing 2 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (jsalz, )
July 15, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by THE HANSEN COMPANY, INC. from District Court, City and County of Denver, Case Number 21-cv-31345. (Filing fee $ 402, Receipt Number 1082-7961805), filed by THE HANSEN COMPANY, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 - State Court - Civil Case Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit 2- State Court - Summons, #4 Exhibit 3 - State Court - Complaint and Jury Demand, #5 Exhibit 4 - State Court - Waiver and Acceptance of Service, #6 Exhibit 5 - State Court - Delay Reduction Order, #7 Exhibit 6 - State Court - Entry of Appearance for Rachel Burkhart, #8 Exhibit 7 - State Court - Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time, #9 Exhibit 8 - State Court - Order Granting Motion for Enlargement of Time, #10 Exhibit 9 - State Court - Docket Sheet, #11 Exhibit 10 - State Court - Notice of Removal of Civil Action)(Burkhart, Rachel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cokan Enterprises, Inc. v. Hansen Company, Inc., The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cokan Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: Michael P. Cross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hansen Company, Inc., The
Represented By: Rachel L. Burkhart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?