Wambolt & Associates, LLC v. Baltimore
Plaintiff: Wambolt & Associates, LLC
Defendant: Amy (I) K. Baltimore and Amy K. Baltimore, CPA
Case Number: 1:2021cv01931
Filed: July 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: S Kato Crews
Referring Judge: Regina M Rodriguez
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 9/8/2021. (amont, )
September 8, 2021 Filing 20 COURTROOM MINUTES for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews: Telephone Scheduling Conference held on 9/8/2021. Discovery due by 7/1/2022. Dispositive Motions due by 8/1/2022. Joint Status Report due by 12/2/2021. FTR: Courtroom C-201. (amont, )
September 1, 2021 Filing 19 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendants Amy K. Baltimore, CPA, Amy (I) K. Baltimore All parties do not consent.. (Hearing, Gregory)
September 1, 2021 Filing 18 Proposed Scheduling Order Filed on Behalf of Both Parties by Defendants Amy K. Baltimore, CPA, Amy (I) K. Baltimore. (Hearing, Gregory)
August 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Given its unopposed nature, the Court finds good cause to GRANT the Motion. Accordingly, the deadline for the designation of any potential nonparties at fault is extended until 45 days after the exchange of Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 8-27-2021. Text Only Entry (skclc2).
August 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Setting Telephonic Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference. The Telephonic Scheduling Conference is set for 9-8-2021 at 10:00 am in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. The parties shall file their proposed scheduling order, and email a copy in Word format to Crews_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov, on or before 9-1-2021. The Magistrate Judge Consent Form [#5] is due 9-1-2021. Dial in information for the Scheduling Conference is as follows:CONFERENCE CALL LINE: (888) 251-2909ACCESS CODE: 5662814# SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 8-27-2021. Text Only Entry (skclc2).
August 27, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Joseph Andrew Ausmus on behalf of Wambolt & Associates, LLCAttorney Joseph Andrew Ausmus added to party Wambolt & Associates, LLC(pty:pla) (Ausmus, Joseph)
August 27, 2021 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM regarding #12 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Designate Non-Parties at Fault filed by Amy K. Baltimore, CPA, Amy (I) K. Baltimore. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. By Judge Regina M Rodriguez on 8/27/2021. Text Only Entry (rmrja)
August 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of Local Civ. R. 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions, and (5) pursuant to Local Civ. R. 16.6 and at the discretion of the Magistrate Judge, convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. SO ORDERED by Judge Regina M Rodriguez on 8/27/2021. Text Only Entry (rmrja)
August 26, 2021 Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Designate Non-Parties at Fault by Defendants Amy K. Baltimore, CPA, Amy (I) K. Baltimore. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Hearing, Gregory)
August 13, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Adam Reginald Ausmus on behalf of Wambolt & Associates, LLCAttorney Adam Reginald Ausmus added to party Wambolt & Associates, LLC(pty:pla) (Ausmus, Adam)
July 29, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Filing of State Court Docket by Defendants Amy K. Baltimore, CPA, Amy (I) K. Baltimore (Hearing, Gregory)
July 29, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Filing of Certificate of Review Filed in State Court Action by Defendants Amy K. Baltimore, CPA, Amy (I) K. Baltimore (Hearing, Gregory)
July 29, 2021 Filing 8 STATE COURT ORDER Order Regarding Notice of Removal by Defendants Amy K. Baltimore, CPA, Amy (I) K. Baltimore. (Hearing, Gregory)
July 23, 2021 Filing 7 ANSWER to #3 Complaint by Amy K. Baltimore, CPA, Amy (I) K. Baltimore.(Hearing, Gregory)
July 16, 2021 Filing 6 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (cpomm, )
July 16, 2021 Filing 5 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (cpomm, )
July 16, 2021 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons, Complaint upon Amy K. Baltimore on 06/18/2021 (cpomm, )
July 16, 2021 Filing 3 VERIFIED COMPLAINT against Amy K. Baltimore, CPA, Amy (I) K. Baltimore, filed by Wambolt & Associates, LLC.(cpomm, )
July 16, 2021 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge Regina M Rodriguez and drawn to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Text Only Entry (cpomm, )
July 16, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Amy K. Baltimore, CPA, Amy K. Baltimore from Jefferson County District Court, Case Number 2021CV30585. (Filing fee $ 402, Receipt Number 1082-7962683), filed by Amy K. Baltimore, CPA, Amy K. Baltimore. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Verified Complaint and Jury Demand, #2 Exhibit B - Return of Service, #3 Exhibit C- State Civil Case Cover Sheet, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hearing, Gregory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wambolt & Associates, LLC v. Baltimore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wambolt & Associates, LLC
Represented By: Adam Reginald Ausmus
Represented By: Joseph Andrew Ausmus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amy (I) K. Baltimore
Represented By: Gregory Steve Hearing, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amy K. Baltimore, CPA
Represented By: Gregory Steve Hearing, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?