Gerads v. Prebish et al
Plaintiff: Casandra Gerads
Defendant: John (I) Forrest Prebish, Paula Prebish and John Forrest Prebish
Case Number: 1:2021cv01960
Filed: July 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Michael E Hegarty
Referring Judge: Regina M Rodriguez
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2021 Filing 18 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, and Jury Demand by John Forrest Prebish, John (I) Forrest Prebish, Paula Prebish.(Eckert, Isaac)
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to #1 Plaintiff's Complaint. Defendants' deadline to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended to and including 8/31/2021. SO ORDERED. By Judge Regina M Rodriguez on 8/17/2021. Text Only Entry(rmrja)
August 17, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint, by Defendants John Forrest Prebish, John (I) Forrest Prebish, Paula Prebish. (Eckert, Isaac)
August 17, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Valerie Ann Garcia on behalf of All Defendants Attorney Valerie Ann Garcia added to party John Forrest Prebish(pty:dft), Attorney Valerie Ann Garcia added to party John (I) Forrest Prebish(pty:dft), Attorney Valerie Ann Garcia added to party Paula Prebish(pty:dft) (Garcia, Valerie)
August 17, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Isaac Matthew Eckert on behalf of All Defendants Attorney Isaac Matthew Eckert added to party John Forrest Prebish(pty:dft), Attorney Isaac Matthew Eckert added to party John (I) Forrest Prebish(pty:dft), Attorney Isaac Matthew Eckert added to party Paula Prebish(pty:dft) (Eckert, Isaac)
August 3, 2021 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Casandra Gerads. John (I) Forrest Prebish served on 7/27/2021, answer due 8/17/2021. (Kosla, Taylor)
August 3, 2021 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Casandra Gerads. Paula Prebish served on 7/27/2021, answer due 8/17/2021. (Kosla, Taylor)
August 3, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Casandra Gerads. John Forrest Prebish served on 7/27/2021, answer due 8/17/2021. (Kosla, Taylor)
July 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of Local Civ. R. 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions, and (5) pursuant to Local Civ. R. 16.6 and at the discretion of the Magistrate Judge, convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. SO ORDERED. By Judge Regina M Rodriguez on 7/27/2021. Text Only Entry (rmrja)
July 27, 2021 Filing 9 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #8 Minute Order. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Regina M Rodriguez. All future pleadings should be designated as 21-cv-01960-RMR. (Text Only Entry) (jgonz, )
July 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER re: #6 Consent/Non-Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge filed by Casandra Gerads. the Court directs the Clerk of Court to reassign this case under D.C. Colo. LCivR 40.1(a), by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 7/27/2021. (jgonz, )
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 7/26/2021 Setting Scheduling Conference for 11/2/2021 10:15 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Proposed Scheduling Order due 10/26/2021.. (jgonz, )
July 26, 2021 Filing 6 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Casandra Gerads All parties do not consent.. (Kosla, Taylor)
July 20, 2021 Filing 5 Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number COX99765 (cpomm, )
July 20, 2021 Filing 4 Administrative Notice: No filing fee received with case opening. Attorney contacted with instructions to submit filing fee within 3 hours. (Text Only Entry) (cpomm, )
July 20, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (cpomm, )
July 20, 2021 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Text Only Entry (cpomm, )
July 20, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against John Forrest Prebish, Paula Prebish, John Forrest Prebish as next of friend of minor, T.B. (Filing fee $ 402).Attorney Taylor L. Kosla added to party Casandra Gerads(pty:pla), filed by Casandra Gerads. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Kosla, Taylor)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gerads v. Prebish et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Casandra Gerads
Represented By: Taylor L. Kosla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John (I) Forrest Prebish
Represented By: Isaac Matthew Eckert
Represented By: Valerie Ann Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paula Prebish
Represented By: Isaac Matthew Eckert
Represented By: Valerie Ann Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Forrest Prebish
Represented By: Isaac Matthew Eckert
Represented By: Valerie Ann Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?