McDaniel et al v. Dominium Management Services, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Tonya McDaniel and Ashley McDaniel
Defendant: Dominium Management Services, LLC and Mel Terrazas
Case Number: 1:2021cv01997
Filed: July 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 31, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Granting Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915. The Applications to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs (Long Form), ECF Nos. #2 and #5 , are granted. By Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 08/31/2021. (athom, )
August 5, 2021 Filing 5 Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs by Plaintiff Tonya McDaniel. (athom, )
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TONYA McDANIEL TO CURE DEFICIENCY. If Ms. Tonya McDaniel fails to cure the designated deficiency within thirty days from the date of this Order she will be dismissed from the action without further notice. By Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 07/26/2021. (athom, )
July 22, 2021 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry. (jtorr, )
July 22, 2021 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs (Long Form) by Plaintiff Ashley McDaniel. (jtorr, )
July 22, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Dominium Management Services, LLC, Mel Terrazas, filed by Tonya McDaniel, Ashley McDaniel.(jtorr, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McDaniel et al v. Dominium Management Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tonya McDaniel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashley McDaniel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dominium Management Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mel Terrazas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?