Davis v. Frankel et al
Plaintiff: Andra Davis
Defendant: Michell Frankel, Sports Development Limited, Alland Arts, Inc and Impact Sports Basketball LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv02044
Filed: July 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Michael E Hegarty
Referring Judge: William J Martinez
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2021 Filing 25 Civil Case Terminated pursuant to Plaintiff's Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) Notice of Dismissal #23 filed in this case on 9/2/2021. Text Only Entry. (trvo, )
September 7, 2021 Filing 24 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #9 First MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , #12 MOTION to Stay Plaintiff and Defendant by Plaintiff Andra Davis. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Proposed Order for Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time)(Bryant, Mark)
September 2, 2021 Filing 23 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL by Plaintiff Andra Davis (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - NFLPA Rules)(Bryant, Mark)
August 23, 2021 Filing 22 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES re: #11 Notice of Entry of Appearance filed by attorney Mark Lee Bryant. DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - counsel must submit a change of contact request through the Attorney Services Portal Account pursuant to D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(c) and 3.5 of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases) (Text Only Entry) (trvo, )
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 19 August 2021. For good cause shown, the parties' Joint Motion to Amend Motion Response Deadlines #19 is granted. Plaintiff shall respond to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss on or before September 7, 2021. Defendants shall respond to Plaintiff's Motion to Stay (ECF #12 ) on or before September 8, 2021.(cmadr, )
August 19, 2021 Filing 20 MEMORANDUM regarding #19 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #9 First MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , #12 MOTION to Stay filed by Alland Arts, Inc, Sports Development Limited, Michell Frankel, Impact Sports Basketball LLC. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty by Judge William J. Martinez on 8/19/2021. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
August 18, 2021 Filing 19 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #9 First MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , #12 MOTION to Stay by Defendants Alland Arts, Inc, Michell Frankel, Impact Sports Basketball LLC, Sports Development Limited. (Ginsberg, Peter)
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: This matter is before the Court on Defendants' Response to Order to Show Cause #16 : Based on its review of Defendants' Response, the Court is satisfied it has diversity jurisdiction over this action pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1332. As a consequence, the Order to Show Cause is DISCHARGED. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 8/16/2021. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
August 9, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE re #1 Notice of Removal,, AMENDED by Defendants Alland Arts, Inc, Michell Frankel, Impact Sports Basketball LLC, Sports Development Limited (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9)(LaBranche, Marci)
August 9, 2021 Filing 16 RESPONSE to Order to Show Cause by Defendants Alland Arts, Inc, Michell Frankel, Impact Sports Basketball LLC, Sports Development Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(LaBranche, Marci)
August 6, 2021 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM regarding #12 MOTION to Stay filed by Andra Davis. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty by Judge William J. Martinez on 8/6/2021. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: Counsel for the parties and all counsel who may later enter an appearance shall review and familiarize themselves with the undersigned's Revised Practice Standards (as most recently revised effective December 1, 2020 and as they may be amended from time to time), which may be downloaded #here. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 8/ 6/2021. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Magistrate Judge Hegarty, or such other Magistrate Judge who may in the future be reassigned this case, is designated to conduct NDISPO proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 72(a) and (b). Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the Magistrate Judge or on the request of the parties by motion, the court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 8/6/2021. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
August 4, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION to Stay by Plaintiff Andra Davis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - NFL Players Association Rules & Regulations, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Complaint to NFL Players Association, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D - Letter from NFL Players Association Regarding Arbitration)(Bryant, Mark)
August 4, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Mark Lee Bryant on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Mark Lee Bryant added to party Andra Davis(pty:pla) (Bryant, Mark)
August 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE returnable August 9, 2021. The party invoking jurisdiction of a federal court bears the burden of establishing that jurisdiction is proper. Merida Delgado v. Gonzales, 428 F.3d 916, 919 (10th Cir. 2005). Defendants' Notice of Removal alleges that the Court has jurisdiction pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1332 based on the diversity of the parties. Per 28 U.S.C. 1332(c)(1), "a corporation shall be deemed to be a citizen of every State and foreign state by which it has been incorporated and of the State or foreign state where it has its principal place of business." Defendants allege that Defendant Alland Arts, Inc. "was and is a business doing business out of Florida." (ECF No. 1-2 at 4.) Such an allegation is not sufficient to determine the citizenship of Defendant Alland Arts, Inc., such that the Court may determine whether it has diversity jurisdiction. Accordingly, Defendants are ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE no later than August 9, 2021 as to why the Court should not dismiss this action sua sponte based on their failure to allege sufficient facts to show that the Court has diversity jurisdiction over this matter. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 8/4/2021. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
August 3, 2021 Filing 9 First MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Defendants Alland Arts, Inc, Michell Frankel, Impact Sports Basketball LLC, Sports Development Limited. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Affidavit)(Ginsberg, Peter)
August 2, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Peter R. Ginsberg on behalf of All Defendants Attorney Peter R. Ginsberg added to party Alland Arts, Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Peter R. Ginsberg added to party Michell Frankel(pty:dft), Attorney Peter R. Ginsberg added to party Impact Sports Basketball LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Peter R. Ginsberg added to party Sports Development Limited(pty:dft) (Ginsberg, Peter)
July 29, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Marci Gilligan LaBranche on behalf of All Defendants (LaBranche, Marci)
July 28, 2021 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (jtorr, )
July 28, 2021 Filing 5 Case assigned to Judge William J. Martinez and drawn to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Text Only Entry. (jtorr, )
July 28, 2021 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons, Civil Cover Sheet, Complaint, Counterclaim, and Jury Demand upon Alland Arts, Inc on 06/29/2021. (jtorr, )
July 28, 2021 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Alland Arts, Inc, Michell Frankel, Impact Sports Basketball LLC, Sports Development Limited, filed by Andra Davis.(jtorr, )
July 28, 2021 Filing 2 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (jtorr, )
July 28, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Alland Arts, Inc., Sports Development Limited, Michell Frankel, Impact Sports Basketball LLC from Arapahoe County District Court, Case Number 2021cv31113. (Filing fee $ 402, Receipt Number 1082-7981503), filed by Alland Arts, Inc., Sports Development Limited, Michell Frankel, Impact Sports Basketball LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9)(LaBranche, Marci)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. Frankel et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andra Davis
Represented By: Mark Lee Bryant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michell Frankel
Represented By: Marci Gilligan LaBranche
Represented By: Peter R. Ginsberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sports Development Limited
Represented By: Marci Gilligan LaBranche
Represented By: Peter R. Ginsberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alland Arts, Inc
Represented By: Marci Gilligan LaBranche
Represented By: Peter R. Ginsberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Impact Sports Basketball LLC
Represented By: Marci Gilligan LaBranche
Represented By: Peter R. Ginsberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?