Parsons Home & Property, L.L.C. v. General Motors L.L.C
Plaintiff: Parsons Home & Property L.L.C.
Defendant: General Motors Coporation and General Motors L.L.C.
Case Number: 1:2021cv02051
Filed: July 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Raymond P Moore
Referring Judge: Kathleen M Tafoya
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 2301
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MINUTE ORDER: With the assignment of this matter, the parties are advised that throughout this case they are expected to be familiar and comply with not only the Local Rules of this District, but also Judge Raymond P. Moore's Civil Practice Standards, which may be found at: http://www.cod.uscourts.gov/JudicialOfficers/ActiveArticleIIIJudges/HonRaymondPMoore.aspx. SO ORDERED by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 9/24/2021. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
September 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order, and (5) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. By Judge Raymond P. Moore on 9/24/2021. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
September 24, 2021 Filing 25 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE by Senior Judge Blackburn. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Raymond P. Moore. All future pleadings should be designated as 21-cv-02051-RM. (athom, )
September 23, 2021 Filing 24 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #23 Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn and drawn to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. All future pleadings should be designated as 21-cv-02051-REB. (Text Only Entry) (agarc, )
September 23, 2021 Filing 23 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Parsons Home & Property L.L.C. All parties do not consent.. (Bullock, Tim)
September 23, 2021 Filing 22 NOTICE by Plaintiff Parsons Home & Property L.L.C. (Bullock, Tim)
September 17, 2021 Filing 21 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Bullock, Tim)
September 14, 2021 Filing 20 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent General Motors Holdings, LLC for General Motors L.L.C.. (O'Connor, Shane)
September 14, 2021 Filing 19 ANSWER to #11 Amended Complaint, by General Motors L.L.C..(O'Connor, Shane)
September 14, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Cody Clayton Bourke on behalf of General Motors L.L.C.Attorney Cody Clayton Bourke added to party General Motors L.L.C.(pty:dft) (Bourke, Cody)
September 14, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Shane Patrick O'Connor on behalf of General Motors L.L.C.Attorney Shane Patrick O'Connor added to party General Motors L.L.C.(pty:dft) (O'Connor, Shane)
August 30, 2021 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Parsons Home & Property L.L.C.. General Motors L.L.C. served on 8/24/2021, answer due 9/14/2021. (Bullock, Tim)
August 23, 2021 Filing 15 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (cpomm, )
August 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER finding as moot #13 Motion to Revise Caption, as Plaintiff has filed an Amended Complaint in which the correct defendant is named. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 8/18/21. Text Only Entry(kmtlc1 )
August 18, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify All Filings by Plaintiff Parsons Home & Property L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Bullock, Tim)
August 18, 2021 Filing 12 SUMMONS REQUEST as to General Motors L.L.C. re #11 Amended Complaint, by Plaintiff Parsons Home & Property L.L.C.. (Bullock, Tim)
August 17, 2021 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT 8-17-21 against General Motors L.L.C., filed by Parsons Home & Property L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6)(Bullock, Tim)
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Plaintiff may file a clean copy of its Amended Complaint on or before August 17, 2021. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 8/16/21. Text Only Entry (kmtlc1 )
August 13, 2021 Filing 9 Notice of AMENDED COMPLAINT, Summons, and Civil Case Cover Sheet and against General Motors L.L.C., filed by Parsons Home & Property L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Document Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #8 Summons Summons, #9 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Bullock, Tim) Modified on 8/13/2021 to correct document type (agarc, ).
August 2, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Parsons Home & Property L.L.C.. General Motors Coporation served on 8/2/2021, answer due 8/23/2021. (Bullock, Tim)
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE DEADLINES. Consent Form due by 9/27/2021. Proposed Scheduling Order due 9/27/2021. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 8/2/2021. (evaug )
July 29, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (cpomm, )
July 29, 2021 Filing 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Text Only Entry (cpomm, )
July 29, 2021 Filing 4 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES: re: #3 Summons Request, #1 Complaint, #2 Notice (Other) filed by attorney Tim A. Bullock.The document was scanned and not converted directly to portable document format (PDF). DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - future documents must be filed pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 1.3(f) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases). (Text Only Entry) (cpomm, )
July 29, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS REQUEST as to General Motors Corporation by Defendant PARSONS HOME & PROPERTY. (Bullock, Tim)
July 29, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE re #1 Complaint, Civil Case Cover Sheet by Defendant PARSONS HOME & PROPERTY (Bullock, Tim)
July 29, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against General Motors Corporation (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number 1082-7983720)Attorney Tim A. Bullock added to party PARSONS HOME & PROPERTY(pty:dft), filed by PARSONS HOME & PROPERTY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6)(Bullock, Tim)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parsons Home & Property, L.L.C. v. General Motors L.L.C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Parsons Home & Property L.L.C.
Represented By: Tim A. Bullock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Motors Coporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Motors L.L.C.
Represented By: Cody Clayton Bourke
Represented By: Shane Patrick O'Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?