Matzdorf et al v. Uponor, Inc et al
Plaintiff: Joel W. Matzdorf, Mikayla Matzdorf, Duangdow C. Hoyord and Luke T. Hoyord
Defendant: Uponor, Inc., Uponor North America, Inc., Uponor, Inc and Uponor North America, Inc
Case Number: 1:2021cv02057
Filed: July 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Raymond P Moore
Referring Judge: Scott T Varholak
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 lp
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 22, 2021 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM regarding #15 MOTION to Compel Arbitration or, in the Alternative, (1) Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint and Class Allegations; and (2) Strike Class Allegations filed by Uponor North America, Inc, Uponor, Inc. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. By Judge Raymond P. Moore on 9/22/2021. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
September 22, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION to Compel Arbitration or, in the Alternative, (1) Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint and Class Allegations; and (2) Strike Class Allegations by Defendants Uponor North America, Inc, Uponor, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Stacey Beissel)(Gibbs, John)
September 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: After considering the joint motion #13 , and finding sufficient cause, the motion is GRANTED. It is therefore ORDERED that (1) Defendants' deadline to respond to the Complaint is extended to and including September 22, 2021; and (2) the page limits applicable to Defendants' forthcoming Motion to Compel/Dismiss/Strike and to Plaintiffs' response are enlarged to 25 pages each, exclusive of the certificate of service. SO ORDERED by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 9/15/2021. (Text Only Entry)(rmsec )
September 14, 2021 Filing 13 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by One-Week, Joint MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Defendants Uponor North America, Inc, Uponor, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Exhibit A)(Gibbs, John)
September 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER: With the assignment of this matter, the parties are advised that throughout this case they are expected to be familiar and comply with not only the Local Rules of this District, but also Judge Raymond P. Moore's Civil Practice Standards, which may be found at: http://www.cod.uscourts.gov/JudicialOfficers/ActiveArticleIIIJudges/HonRaymondPMoore.aspx. SO ORDERED by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 9/14/2021. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
September 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order, and (5) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. By Judge Raymond P. Moore on 9/14/2021. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
September 14, 2021 Filing 10 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #9 Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Raymond P. Moore and drawn to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. All future pleadings should be designated as 21-cv-2057-RM. (Text Only Entry) (cpomm, )
September 14, 2021 Filing 9 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendants Uponor North America, Inc, Uponor, Inc All parties do not consent.. (Gibbs, John)
August 25, 2021 Filing 8 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to the Complaint by Defendants Uponor North America, Inc, Uponor, Inc. All Defendants. (Gibbs, John)
August 19, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Uponor North America, Inc served on 8/11/2021, answer due 9/1/2021. (Manship, Penny)
August 19, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Uponor, Inc served on 8/11/2021, answer due 9/1/2021. (Manship, Penny)
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Setting Deadline for Filing Election Concerning Consent/Non-Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form and Setting Scheduling Conference. Consent Form due on or before October 7, 2021. Proposed Scheduling Order due on or before October 14, 2021. Scheduling Conference set for October 20, 2021 11:00 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 8/9/2021. (agarc, )
July 30, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (jtorr, )
July 30, 2021 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Text Only Entry. (jtorr, )
July 30, 2021 Filing 2 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES re: #1 Complaint, filed by attorney Michael Menghini. DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - counsel must submit a change of contact request through the Attorney Services Portal Account pursuant to D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(c) and 3.5 of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases).(Text Only Entry) (jtorr, )
July 29, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Uponor North America, Inc., Uponor, Inc. (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number 1082-7984170)Attorney Michael C. Menghini added to party Duangdow C. Hoyord(pty:pla), Attorney Michael C. Menghini added to party Luke T. Hoyord(pty:pla), Attorney Michael C. Menghini added to party Joel W. Matzdorf(pty:pla), Attorney Michael C. Menghini added to party Mikayla Matzdorf(pty:pla), filed by Joel W. Matzdorf, Luke T. Hoyord, Duangdow C. Hoyord, Mikayla Matzdorf. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons - Uponor, Inc., #3 Summons Summons - Uponor North America, Inc.)(Menghini, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Matzdorf et al v. Uponor, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joel W. Matzdorf
Represented By: Michael C. Menghini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mikayla Matzdorf
Represented By: Michael C. Menghini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Duangdow C. Hoyord
Represented By: Michael C. Menghini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luke T. Hoyord
Represented By: Michael C. Menghini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Uponor, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Uponor North America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Uponor, Inc
Represented By: John S. Gibbs, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Uponor North America, Inc
Represented By: John S. Gibbs, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?