City of Fort Collins v. Open International, LLC et al
Plaintiff: City of Fort Collins
Defendant: Open International, LLC and Open Investments, LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv02063
Filed: July 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Daniel D Domenico
Referring Judge: Nina Y Wang
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #24 Motion for Extension of Time to File re #24 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Submit Proposed Stipulated Protective Order. The parties have until and including 10/1/2021 to submit a draft Protective Order. SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 9/27/2021. Text Only Entry (dddlc2, )
September 24, 2021 Filing 24 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Submit Proposed Stipulated Protective Order by Plaintiff City of Fort Collins. (Shoaei, Maral)
September 17, 2021 Filing 23 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Christopher David Mack on behalf of Open International, LLCAttorney Christopher David Mack added to party Open International, LLC(pty:dft) (Mack, Christopher)
September 16, 2021 Filing 22 COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for Scheduling Conference held on 9/16/2021 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Parties shall submit a proposed Protective Order on or before 9/24/2021. Discovery due 5/26/2022. 702 Motions due 5/26/2022. Dispositive motions due 6/27/2022. FTR: NYW-FTR. (bwilk, )
September 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 09/16/2021. Discovery due by 5/26/2022. Dispositive Motions due by 6/27/2022. (alave, )
September 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of Local Civ. R. 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions, and (5) pursuant to Local Civ. R. 16.6 and at the discretion of the Magistrate Judge, convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 9/15/2021. Text Only Entry (dddlc2, )
September 13, 2021 Filing 19 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to the Complaint by Plaintiff City of Fort Collins. City of Fort Collins answer due 10/8/2021. (Collard, Case)
September 9, 2021 Filing 18 Proposed Scheduling Order by Counter Defendant City of Fort Collins, Plaintiff City of Fort Collins. (Collard, Case)
September 3, 2021 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE by Senior Judge Blackburn. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Daniel D. Domenico. All future pleadings should be designated as 21-cv-0263-DDD. (athom, )
September 2, 2021 Filing 16 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #14 . All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn. All future pleadings should be designated as 21-cv-02063-REB. (Text Only Entry) (cmadr, )
September 2, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Andrea Ahn Wechter on behalf of City of Fort CollinsAttorney Andrea Ahn Wechter added to party City of Fort Collins(pty:cd), Attorney Andrea Ahn Wechter added to party City of Fort Collins(pty:pla) (Wechter, Andrea)
September 2, 2021 Filing 14 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff City of Fort Collins All parties do not consent.. (Collard, Case)
August 27, 2021 Filing 13 ANSWER to #6 Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against City of Fort Collins by Open Investments, LLC, Open International, LLC.(Swanson, Paul)
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STANDING ORDER: As of August 16, 2021, the public health risks caused by the coronavirus, and in particular, the Delta variant of the coronavirus, continue to be present. In order to support public health efforts to cabin the spread of the coronavirus, to protect the health of the Parties and counsel by minimizing their need to travel, and to protect the health of the general public, the following measures are adopted in an abundance of caution. Accordingly, IT IS ORDERED THAT: (1) All proceedings, notwithstanding any evidentiary proceedings, including but not limited to trials, which are scheduled to occur through January 1, 2022, shall be held via telephone conference, unless otherwise ordered by the court. Participants may access this court's conference line by using the following dial-in information: 1-888-363-4749, Access Code 5738976. This Amended Standing Order does not apply to any criminal matters; evidentiary civil matters; or other matters specifically set after the effective date to be in-person, scheduled through January 1, 2022; (2) All jury trials scheduled to occur through January 1, 2022 shall proceed as scheduled, pursuant to the District of Colorado's Jury Trial Protocols and its effective General Order(s), available at http://www.cod.uscourts.gov/CourtOperations/COVID-19Guidance.aspx; and (3) Parties and/or counsel are advised to check information on the website of the United States District Court for the District of Colorado (http://www.cod.uscourts.gov/) and specifically, for Magistrate Judge Wang, for continuing information. By Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 08/17/2021. Text Only Entry (nywlc2, )
August 3, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Maral Shoaei on behalf of City of Fort CollinsAttorney Maral Shoaei added to party City of Fort Collins(pty:pla) (Shoaei, Maral)
August 3, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Case L. Collard on behalf of City of Fort CollinsAttorney Case L. Collard added to party City of Fort Collins(pty:pla) (Collard, Case)
August 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER: In light of the #2 Stipulated Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint, filed under D.C.COLO.LCivR. 6.1(a), Defendants' responses to the Complaint are due 8/27/2021. By Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 08/03/2021. Text Only Entry(nywlc2, )
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Setting Scheduling/Planning Conference and Setting Deadline for Filing of Consent/Non-Consent Form by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 08/02/2021. Consent Form due by 9/2/2021. Proposed Scheduling Order due 9/9/2021. Scheduling Conference set for 9/16/2021 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. (alave, )
July 30, 2021 Filing 7 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (cpomm, )
July 30, 2021 Filing 6 COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Open International, LLC, Open Investments, LLC, filed by City of Fort Collins.(cpomm, )
July 30, 2021 Filing 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Text Only Entry (cpomm, )
July 30, 2021 Filing 4 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (cpomm, )
July 30, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Hannah E. Armentrout on behalf of Open International, LLC, Open Investments, LLCAttorney Hannah E. Armentrout added to party Open International, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Hannah E. Armentrout added to party Open Investments, LLC(pty:dft) (Armentrout, Hannah)
July 30, 2021 Filing 2 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Defendants Open International, LLC, Open Investments, LLC. (Swanson, Paul)
July 30, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Open Investments, LLC, Open International, LLC from District Court, Larimer County Colorado, Case Number 2021CV30475. (Filing fee $ 402, Receipt Number 1082-7984909), filed by Open Investments, LLC, Open International, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2-State Court Waiver of Service, #3 Exhibit 3-State Court Docket, #4 Exhibit 4-State Court Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet)(Swanson, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: City of Fort Collins v. Open International, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Fort Collins
Represented By: Andrea Ahn Wechter
Represented By: Case L. Collard
Represented By: Maral Shoaei
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Open International, LLC
Represented By: Hannah E. Armentrout
Represented By: Paul Douglas Swanson
Represented By: Christopher David Mack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Open Investments, LLC
Represented By: Hannah E. Armentrout
Represented By: Paul Douglas Swanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?