Rosales v. Walmart, Inc.
Plaintiff: Martha Rosales
Defendant: Walmart, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv02078
Filed: August 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Philip A Brimmer
Referring Judge: Nina Y Wang
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2021 Filing 14 Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Martha Rosales. (McKendree, John)
September 23, 2021 Filing 13 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant Walmart, Inc. All parties do not consent.. (Baird, John)
September 20, 2021 Filing 12 BRIEF in Opposition to #11 MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice filed by Plaintiff Martha Rosales. (McKendree, John)
September 14, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice by Defendant Walmart, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Charge of Discrimination, #2 Exhibit B: Schmidt v. U.S. West, #3 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Baird, John)
August 17, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Beth Ann Doherty Quinn on behalf of Walmart, Inc.Attorney Beth Ann Doherty Quinn added to party Walmart, Inc.(pty:dft) (Quinn, Beth)
August 17, 2021 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Baird, John)
August 17, 2021 Filing 8 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to the Complaint by Defendant Walmart, Inc.. Walmart, Inc. answer due 9/14/2021. (Baird, John)
August 17, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by John Mark Baird on behalf of Walmart, Inc.Attorney John Mark Baird added to party Walmart, Inc.(pty:dft) (Baird, John)
August 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER SETTING RULE 16(b) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 08/13/2021. Proposed Scheduling Order due 9/23/2021. Scheduling Conference set for 9/30/2021 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang, via telephone conference. All participants shall use the following dial-in information: 888-363-4749, Access Code: 5738976#. (alave, )
August 9, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Martha Rosales. Walmart, Inc. served on 8/3/2021, answer due 8/24/2021. (McKendree, John)
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang for non-dispositive matters. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, and (4) conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding, by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 8/02/2021. Text Only Entry (pabsec)
August 2, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (cpomm, )
August 2, 2021 Filing 2 Case assigned to Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer and drawn to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Text Only Entry (cpomm, )
August 2, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND against Walmart, Inc. (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number ACODC-7987135)Attorney John W. McKendree added to party Martha Rosales(pty:pla), filed by Martha Rosales. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(McKendree, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rosales v. Walmart, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martha Rosales
Represented By: John W. McKendree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart, Inc.
Represented By: Beth Ann Doherty Quinn
Represented By: John Mark Baird
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?