Vyanet Operating Group, Inc. v. Maurice et al
Plaintiff: Vyanet Operating Group, Inc.
Defendant: Frederick J. Maurice and Christopher A. Heath
Case Number: 1:2021cv02085
Filed: August 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Christine M Arguello
Referring Judge: S Kato Crews
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MINUTE ORDER RE: Briefing for Motion to Dismiss. In light of the Court's Order [#28] Plaintiffs shall file their response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by 10-20-2021. Defendants shall reply by 11-3-2021. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 9-29-2021. Text Only Entry (skclc2).
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MINUTE ORDER RE: [#20] Motion to Dismiss. The Court previously found Defendants' Motion to Dismiss [#20] moot because it was not clearly directed at the operative complaint. However, because Plaintiff amended their complaint pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a)(1)(B) as a matter of course, Defendants' Motion to Dismiss [#20] is properly directed at the operative complaint, which the Court will address in due course. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 9-29-2021. Text Only Entry (skclc2).
September 29, 2021 Filing 27 RESPONSE to #22 MOTION to Vacate 12 Minute Order,, Scheduling Conference and Stay All Discovery Pending Resolution of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss filed by Plaintiff Vyanet Operating Group, Inc.. (Collopy, Patrick)
September 27, 2021 Filing 26 Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Vyanet Operating Group, Inc.. (Collopy, Patrick)
September 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER finding as moot #11 Motion to Dismiss; finding as moot #20 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff filed an amended complaint on 8-26-2021 that the clerk accepted for docketing on 9-10-2021, thereby becoming the operative complaint. Accordingly, the Court finds Defendants' Motion to Dismiss [#11] and [#20] are moot because they are not directed at the operative complaint. See Gotfredson v. Larsen LP, 432 F. Supp. 2d 1163, 1172 (D. Colo. 2006) (observing that an amended pleading supersedes the pleading it modifies, thereby mooting any motions to dismiss directed at the inoperative pleading); Strich v. U.S., No. 09-cv-01913-REB-KLM, 2010 WL 148269, at *1 (D. Colo. Jan. 11, 2010) ("The filing of an amended complaint moots a motion to dismiss directed at the complaint that is supplanted and superseded."). Defendants may refile their motion to dismiss. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 9-23-2021. Text Only Entry (skclc2).
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MEMORANDUM regarding #22 MOTION to Vacate 12 Minute Order,, Scheduling Conference and Stay All Discovery Pending Resolution of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss filed by Christopher A. Heath, Frederick J. Maurice. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 9/9/2021. Text Only Entry (cmasec)
September 8, 2021 Filing 22 MOTION to Vacate 12 Minute Order,, Scheduling Conference and Stay All Discovery Pending Resolution of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by Defendants Christopher A. Heath, Frederick J. Maurice. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) re Motion to Vacate Scheduling Conference and Stay All Discovery Pending Resolution of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss)(Glantz, Perry)
September 7, 2021 Filing 21 MEMORANDUM regarding #20 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Christopher A. Heath, Frederick J. Maurice. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 9/7/2021. Text Only Entry (cmasec)
September 3, 2021 Filing 20 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendants Christopher A. Heath, Frederick J. Maurice. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- LLC Membership Purchase Agreement, #2 Exhibit B- First Addendum to LLC Membership Purchase Agreement, #3 Exhibit C- Demand Letter with Spreadsheets, #4 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Proposed Order re Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint)(Glantz, Perry) Modified on 9/29/2021 to reactivate the motion pursuant to 28 Minute order (agarc, ).
August 31, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE of Change of Address/Contact Information by Perry L. Glantz (Glantz, Perry)
August 26, 2021 Filing 24 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Christopher A. Heath, Frederick J. Maurice filed by Vyanet Operating Group, Inc.(trvo, )
August 26, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of Filing Amended Pleading by Plaintiff Vyanet Operating Group, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Collopy, Patrick)
August 25, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Patrick Joseph Collopy on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Patrick Joseph Collopy added to party Vyanet Operating Group, Inc.(pty:pla) (Collopy, Patrick)
August 24, 2021 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM regarding #11 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Christopher A. Heath, Frederick J. Maurice. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 8/24/2021. Text Only Entry (cmasec)
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Magistrate Judge Crews is designated to conduct NDISPO proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b). Court-sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. The Magistrate Judge, at his/her discretion, may convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. SO ORDERED by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 8/24/2021. Text Only Entry (cmasec)
August 24, 2021 Filing 14 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #13 Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Christine M. Arguello and drawn to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. All future pleadings should be designated as 21-cv-02085-CMA. (Text Only Entry) (agarc, )
August 24, 2021 Filing 13 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Vyanet Operating Group, Inc. All parties do not consent.. (Ellis, Jared)
August 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Setting Telephonic Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference. The Telephonic Scheduling Conference is set for 10-4-2021 at 10:30 am in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. The parties shall file their proposed scheduling order, and email a copy in Word format to Crews_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov, on or before 9-27-2021. The Magistrate Judge Consent Form [#7] is due 9-27-2021. Dial in information for the Scheduling Conference is as follows:CONFERENCE CALL LINE: (888) 251-2909ACCESS CODE: 5662814# SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 8-8-2021. Text Only Entry (skclc2).
August 5, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendants Christopher A. Heath, Frederick J. Maurice. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- LLC Membership Purchase Agreement, #2 Exhibit B- First Addendum to LLC Membership Purchase Agreement, #3 Exhibit C- Demand Letter with Spreadsheets, #4 Proposed Order (PDF Only) re Motion to Dismiss)(Glantz, Perry)
August 5, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Judith S. Araujo on behalf of All Defendants Attorney Judith S. Araujo added to party Christopher A. Heath(pty:dft), Attorney Judith S. Araujo added to party Frederick J. Maurice(pty:dft) (Araujo, Judith)
August 5, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jared Richard Ellis on behalf of Vyanet Operating Group, Inc.Attorney Jared Richard Ellis added to party Vyanet Operating Group, Inc.(pty:pla) (Ellis, Jared)
August 3, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Ryan L. Winter on behalf of Vyanet Operating Group, Inc.Attorney Ryan L. Winter added to party Vyanet Operating Group, Inc.(pty:pla) (Winter, Ryan)
August 2, 2021 Filing 7 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (jsalz, )
August 2, 2021 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT/RETURN of Service of Summons and Complaint upon Carol Nelson Maurice on 07/10/2021. (jsalz, )
August 2, 2021 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT/RETURN of Service of Summons and Complaint upon Christopher A. Heath on 07/03/2021. (jsalz, )
August 2, 2021 Filing 4 COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Christopher A. Heath, Frederick J. Maurice, filed by Vyanet Operating Group, Inc..(jsalz, )
August 2, 2021 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Text Only Entry. (jsalz, )
August 2, 2021 Filing 2 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (jsalz, )
August 2, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Frederick J. Maurice, Christopher A. Heath from District Court, Denver County, Colorado, Case Number 2021CV032051. (Filing fee $ 402, Receipt Number ACODC-7990979), filed by Frederick J. Maurice, Christopher A. Heath. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- 2021-06-30 Complaint and Jury Demand, #2 Exhibit 2- 2021-06-30 District Court Civil Case Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit 3- 2021-06-30 Summons- Heath, #4 Exhibit 4- 2021-06-30 Summons- Maurice, #5 Exhibit 5- 2021-06-30 Delay Reduction Order, #6 Exhibit 6- 2021-06-30 Pre-Trial Order, #7 Exhibit 7- 2021-07-06 Affidavit of Service- Heath (served 07-03-2021), #8 Exhibit 8- 2021-07-12 Affidavit of Service- Maurice (served 7-10-21), #9 Exhibit 9- 2021-07-15 Certificate of Service of PTO and DRO, #10 Exhibit 10- 2021-07-20 Entry of Appearance- PLG, #11 Exhibit 11- 2021-07-20 Entry of Appearance- JSA, #12 Exhibit 12- 2021-07-29 Register of Actions and Party Information)(Glantz, Perry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vyanet Operating Group, Inc. v. Maurice et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vyanet Operating Group, Inc.
Represented By: Jared Richard Ellis
Represented By: Patrick Collopy
Represented By: Ryan L. Winter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frederick J. Maurice
Represented By: Perry L. Glantz
Represented By: Judith S. Araujo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher A. Heath
Represented By: Perry L. Glantz
Represented By: Judith S. Araujo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?