Foster et al v. Lincoln County/DOC et al
Plaintiff: Morgan Foster and Randall Curfman
Defendant: Lincoln County/DOC, Melissa N. Piccione, Stephen I. Vancamp, Keith T. Nosker, Micheal R. Glaser, Amber R. Velder, Colton J. Chase, Raelina K. Miller, Michael J. Wells, Travis E. Turano, Jessica E. Casarubias, Jesse W. Baidridge, Anthony J. Baylor, Brayton Medina, Joe A. Cordova, Candida J. Guest, Barbarra A. Martinez, Jeremy Alcorn, Randy Smithgall, Kamal Foster, Brandon Smith, Tyshawn Pikula, Jacob Herrera, Jazmine Murry and Kendrick Warwick
Case Number: 1:2021cv02102
Filed: August 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - Civil Rights (U.S. not a defendant)
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFFS TO FILE AN AMENDED PRISONER COMPLAINT within thirty (30) days from the date of this order, an Amended Prisoner Complaint that complies with all directives contained in this order, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 9/29/2021. (evana, )
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO PROCEED PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1915. That the Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915 (ECF Nos. #5 and #6 ) are GRANTED. That within thirty days of the date of this Order Plaintiffs' custodian shall disburse, if funds are available, from Plaintiff Foster's prison account an initial partial filing fee of $84.00 and from Plaintiff Curfman's prison account an initial partial filing fee of $38.00 to the Clerk of the United States District Court for the District of Colorado, which represents twenty percent of the greater of the (1) average monthly deposits, or (2) average monthly balance in each Plaintiff's prison accounts for the six-month period immediately preceding the filing of the complaint. See 28 U.S.C. 1915(b). That the Clerk of the Court shall send a copy of this order to DOC_inmateaccounts@state.co.us. That the Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915 (ECF Nos. #2 , #11 , and #12 ) are DENIED. That the Motion for Extension of Time (ECF No. #10 ) is DENIED as moot, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 9/28/2021.(evana, )
September 27, 2021 Filing 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Lincoln County/DOC, Melissa N. Piccione, Stephen I. Vancamp, filed by Morgan Foster.(evana, )
September 27, 2021 Filing 13 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Lincoln County/DOC, Melissa N. Piccione, Stephen I. Vancamp, filed by Randall Curfman.(evana, )
September 27, 2021 Filing 12 Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915. by Plaintiff Morgan Foster. (evana, )
September 27, 2021 Filing 11 Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915. by Plaintiff Randall Curfman. (evana, )
September 27, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time by Plaintiffs Randall Curfman, Morgan Foster. (evana, )
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER On August 9, 2021, the Court issued an Order Directing Plaintiffs to Cure Deficiencies (ECF No. #4 ). Plaintiff Curfman was ordered to submit a Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915 on the court-approved form, along with the supporting documentation, within 30 days. Plaintiff Curfman also was instructed that he must sign the Prisoner Complaint. On September 7, 2021, both Plaintiffs submitted a Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915 (ECF Nos. #5 and #6 ). Plaintiff Curfman, however, did not address his required signature on the Prisoner Complaint. As such, Plaintiffs must submit a joint Prisoner Complaint that is signed by both of them within 21 days of the date of this minute order, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 9/8/2021. (evana, )
September 7, 2021 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Jesse W. Baidridge, Anthony J. Baylor, Jessica E. Casarubias, Colton J. Chase, Joe A. Cordova, Micheal R. Glaser, Candida J. Guest, Lincoln County/DOC, Barbarra A. Martinez, Brayton Medina, Raelina K. Miller, Keith T. Nosker, Melissa N. Piccione, Travis E. Turano, Stephen I. Vancamp, Amber R. Velder, Michael J. Wells, filed by Randall Curfman.(evana, )
September 7, 2021 Filing 7 AMENDED PRISONER COMPLAINT against Jesse W. Baidridge, Anthony J. Baylor, Jessica E. Casarubias, Colton J. Chase, Joe A. Cordova, Micheal R. Glaser, Candida J. Guest, Lincoln County/DOC, Barbarra A. Martinez, Brayton Medina, Raelina K. Miller, Keith T. Nosker, Melissa N. Piccione, Travis E. Turano, Stephen I. Vancamp, Amber R. Velder, Michael J. Wells, filed by Morgan Foster.(evana, )
September 7, 2021 Filing 6 Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915. by Plaintiff Morgan Foster. (evana, )
September 7, 2021 Filing 5 Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915. by Plaintiff Randall Curfman. (evana, )
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFFS TO CURE DEFICIENCIES within thirty days from the date of this Order. Any papers that Plaintiffs file in response to this Order must include the civil action number on this Order, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 8/9/2021. (evana, )
August 2, 2021 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry. (jtorr, )
August 2, 2021 Filing 2 Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915 by Plaintiff Morgan Foster. (jtorr, )
August 2, 2021 Filing 1 Prisoner COMPLAINT against Jesse W. Baidridge, Anthony J. Baylor, Jessica E. Casarubias, Colton J. Chase, Joe A. Cordova, Micheal R. Glaser, Candida J. Guest, Lincoln County/DOC, Barbarra A. Martinez, Brayton Medina, Raelina K. Miller, Keith T. Nosker, Melissa N. Piccione, Travis E. Turano, Stephen I. Vancamp, Amber R. Velder, Michael J. Wells, filed by Randall Curfman, Morgan Foster. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jtorr, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Foster et al v. Lincoln County/DOC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Morgan Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randall Curfman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lincoln County/DOC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melissa N. Piccione
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen I. Vancamp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith T. Nosker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Micheal R. Glaser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amber R. Velder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colton J. Chase
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raelina K. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Wells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travis E. Turano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jessica E. Casarubias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jesse W. Baidridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony J. Baylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brayton Medina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe A. Cordova
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Candida J. Guest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbarra A. Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeremy Alcorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy Smithgall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kamal Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandon Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyshawn Pikula
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacob Herrera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jazmine Murry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kendrick Warwick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?