Behavior Analyst Certification Board, Inc. et al v. Solis
Plaintiff: Behavior Analyst Certification Board, Inc and NCS Pearson, Inc doing business as Pearson VUE
Defendant: Dailys Solis
Case Number: 1:2021cv02131
Filed: August 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Scott T Varholak
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. All Defendants. (Sabey, Mark)
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Setting Deadline for Filing Election Concerning Consent/Non-Consent to Magistrate Jurisdiction Form and Setting Scheduling Conference. Consent Form due on or before October 6, 2021. Proposed Scheduling Order due on or before October 13, 2021. Scheduling Conference set for October 20, 2021 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 8/9/2021. (agarc, )
August 6, 2021 Filing 4 Report re Copyright: Report on the filing of an action emailed separately to the Director of the Copyright Office. (jtorr, )
August 6, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (jtorr, )
August 6, 2021 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Text Only Entry. (jtorr, )
August 6, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number ACODC-8006134)Attorney Mark Lynn Sabey added to party Behavior Analyst Certification Board, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Mark Lynn Sabey added to party NCS Pearson, Inc.(pty:pla), filed by Behavior Analyst Certification Board, Inc., NCS Pearson, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Sabey, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Behavior Analyst Certification Board, Inc. et al v. Solis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Behavior Analyst Certification Board, Inc
Represented By: Mark Lynn Sabey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NCS Pearson, Inc doing business as Pearson VUE
Represented By: Mark Lynn Sabey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dailys Solis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?