Well Master Corporation v. Flowco Production Solutions, LLC
Plaintiff: Well Master Corporation
Defendant: Flowco Production Solutions, LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv02145
Filed: August 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Christine M Arguello
Referring Judge: Kristen L Mix
Nature of Suit: Patent
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 6, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Adam K. Yowell on behalf of Flowco Production Solutions, LLCAttorney Adam K. Yowell added to party Flowco Production Solutions, LLC(pty:dft) (Yowell, Adam)
October 6, 2021 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM regarding #16 MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify #1 Complaint, filed by Well Master Corporation. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 10/6/2021. Text Only Entry (cmasec)
October 6, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Well Master Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit to Motion to Amend Complaint)(Lieb, Benjamin)
September 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 09/21/2021. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint #12 is GRANTED. Defendant has up to and including October 6, 2021 to file an Answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Complaint.(alave, )
September 21, 2021 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM regarding #12 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond filed by Flowco Production Solutions, LLC. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 9/21/2021. Text Only Entry (cmasec)
September 17, 2021 Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Porada, Frank)
September 17, 2021 Filing 12 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond by Defendant Flowco Production Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Proposed Order Granting Joint Motion For Extension Of Time To Answer Or Otherwise Respond To Complaint)(Porada, Frank)
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 09/09/2021. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Unopposed Motion to Reset Scheduling Conference Date #9 is GRANTED. Proposed Scheduling Order due 12/1/2021. Scheduling Conference set for 12/9/2021 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix.(alave, )
September 9, 2021 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM regarding #9 Unopposed MOTION to Reset Scheduling Conference filed by Well Master Corporation. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 9/9/2021. Text Only Entry (cmasec)
September 8, 2021 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION to Reset Scheduling Conference by Plaintiff Well Master Corporation. (Lieb, Benjamin)
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 3 September 2021. Proposed Scheduling Order due 10/28/2021. Scheduling Conference set for 11/4/2021 11:00 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. (Attachments: #1 Continuation of Main Document, #2 Continuation of Main Document, #3 Continuation of Main Document) (cmadr, )
August 27, 2021 Filing 7 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to the Complaint by Defendant Flowco Production Solutions, LLC. Flowco Production Solutions, LLC answer due 9/22/2021. (Lieb, Benjamin)
August 12, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Well Master Corporation. Flowco Production Solutions, LLC served on 8/10/2021, answer due 8/31/2021. (Lieb, Benjamin)
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Magistrate Judge Mix is designated to conduct NDISPO proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b). Court-sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. The Magistrate Judge, at his/her discretion, may convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. SO ORDERED by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 8/10/2021. Text Only Entry (cmasec)
August 10, 2021 Filing 4 Report re Patent/Trademark: Report on the filing of an action emailed (NEF) to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (jtorr, )
August 10, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (jtorr, )
August 9, 2021 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge Christine M. Arguello and drawn to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Text Only Entry. (jtorr, )
August 9, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Flowco Production Solutions, LLC (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number ACODC-8009314)Attorney Benjamin B. Lieb added to party Well Master Corporation(pty:pla), filed by Well Master Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Disclosure Statement, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit 4, #8 Exhibit 5, #9 Exhibit 6, #10 Exhibit 7, #11 Exhibit 8)(Lieb, Benjamin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Well Master Corporation v. Flowco Production Solutions, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Well Master Corporation
Represented By: Benjamin B. Lieb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flowco Production Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Adam K. Yowell
Represented By: Frank Christopher Porada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?