Martin Marietta Materials, Inc. v. Iverson et al
Plaintiff: Martin Marietta Materials, Inc.
Defendant: Timothy Iverson and Jeanne Iverson
Case Number: 1:2021cv02153
Filed: August 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: William J Martinez
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2021 Filing 17 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #16 Minute Order. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge William J. Martinez. All future pleadings should be designated as 21-cv-02153-WJM. (Text Only Entry) (alave, )
October 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER re: #14 Consent/Non-Consent Form to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge filed by Martin Marietta Materials, Inc. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this case shall be assigned to a District Judge under D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(c)(8) and D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(a), by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 10/01/2021. (alave, )
September 30, 2021 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Martin Marietta Materials, Inc.. Jeanne Iverson served on 8/10/2021, answer due 8/31/2021; Timothy Iverson served on 9/28/2021, answer due 10/19/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavits of Service)(Wert, William)
September 29, 2021 Filing 14 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Martin Marietta Materials, Inc. All parties do not consent.. (Wert, William)
September 23, 2021 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint by Martin Marietta Materials, Inc..(Raley, Bennett)
September 15, 2021 Filing 12 CORRECTION TO THE DEFENDANTS ANSWER TO THE COMPLAINT by Defendant Jeanne Iverson. (alave, )
September 15, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Change of Address/Contact Information by Defendant Jeanne Iverson (alave, )
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 3 September 2021. Proposed Scheduling Order due 10/28/2021. Scheduling Conference set for 11/7/2021 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. (Attachments: #1 Continuation of Main Document, #2 Continuation of Main Document) (cmadr, )
September 2, 2021 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Jeanne Iverson.(cmadr, )
August 26, 2021 Filing 8 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES:re: #7 Notice of Entry of Appearance filed by attorney William Davis Wert and Bennett W. Raley. The s/signature did not match the filers name on the account for which the login and password are registered. DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - future documents must be filed pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 4.3(c) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases).(Text Only Entry) (alave, )
August 11, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of William Davis Wert by Bennett W. Raley on behalf of Martin Marietta Materials, Inc. (Raley, Bennett)
August 10, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (jsalz, )
August 9, 2021 Filing 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Text Only Entry. (jsalz, )
August 9, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Related Cases by Plaintiff Martin Marietta Materials, Inc. (Raley, Bennett)
August 9, 2021 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Raley, Bennett)
August 9, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Timothy and Jeanne Iverson by Plaintiff Martin Marietta Materials, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons - Timothy Iverson)(Raley, Bennett)
August 9, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Timothy Iverson, Jeanne Iverson. (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number ACODC-8010564)Attorney Bennett W. Raley added to party Martin Marietta Materials, Inc.(pty:pla), filed by Martin Marietta Materials, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Lease Memorandum, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Raley, Bennett) Modified on 8/10/2021 to fix title.(alave, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martin Marietta Materials, Inc. v. Iverson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin Marietta Materials, Inc.
Represented By: Bennett W. Raley
Represented By: William Davis Wert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Iverson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeanne Iverson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?