Davis v. Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Carole Kristin Davis
Defendant: Commissioner Social Security Administration and Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Interested Party: SSA Noticing and USAO-SS-Noticing
Case Number: 1:2021cv02155
Filed: August 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Marcia S Krieger
Nature of Suit: Social Security - DIWC/DIWW (405(g))
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 402
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond: Commissioner, Social Security Administration answer due 10/29/2021. By Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 10/5/21. Text Only Entry(msklc2, )
October 4, 2021 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint, by Defendant Commissioner, Social Security Administration. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Pedderson, Danielle)
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 8/10/2021, re: #1 Complaint, filed by Carole Kristin Davis. ORDERED as follows: that opening and response briefs shall be limited to no more than twenty (20) pages; and that reply briefs shall be limited to no more than ten (10) pages. (sphil, )
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Granting #2 the Application to Proceed in District CourtWithout Prepaying Fees or Costs, by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 8/10/2021.(sphil, )
August 9, 2021 Filing 6 Utility Setting Answer Deadlines: Commissioner, Social Security Administration Answer Due 10/8/2021. Text Only Entry. (sphil, )
August 9, 2021 Filing 5 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (jsalz, )
August 9, 2021 Filing 4 Case assigned to Judge Marcia S. Krieger. Text Only Entry (jsalz, )
August 9, 2021 Filing 3 Administrative Notice: Social Security Case Service. Pursuant to the Letter of Agreement signed by the Clerk, U.S. District Court;U.S. Attorneys Office for the District of Colorado (USAO), and Social Security Administration (SSA), service of the initiating document(s) by the plaintiff to the SSA, the U.S. Attorney General, and USAO in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(i) is not necessary unless the court otherwise orders. A summons is not required and will not be issued. (Text Only Entry) (jsalz, )
August 9, 2021 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. by Plaintiff Carole Kristin Davis. (Abbott, Teresa)
August 9, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT AND PETITION FOR REVIEW against Commissioner Social Security Administration Attorney Teresa H. Abbott added to party Carole Kristin Davis(pty:pla), filed by Carole Kristin Davis. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Abbott, Teresa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carole Kristin Davis
Represented By: Teresa H. Abbott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Represented By: Danielle Alicia Pedderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Noticing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: USAO-SS-Noticing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?