DarkOwl, LLC v. Arkowl LLC et al
Plaintiff: darkowl llc and DarkOwl, LLC
Defendant: arkowl llc and Arkowl Corporation
Case Number: 1:2021cv02163
Filed: August 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Kristen L Mix
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1051
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Michael H. Frasier on behalf of Arkowl Corporation, Arkowl LLCAttorney Michael H. Frasier added to party Arkowl Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Michael H. Frasier added to party Arkowl LLC(pty:dft) (Frasier, Michael)
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 09/07/2021. Proposed Scheduling Order due 11/16/2021. Scheduling/Planning Conference set for 11/23/2021 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. (Attachments: #1 Continuation of Main Document, #2 Continuation of Main Document) (alave, )
August 20, 2021 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by DarkOwl, LLC. Arkowl Corporation waiver sent on 8/11/2021, answer due 10/10/2021. (Danielson, Sabrina)
August 20, 2021 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by DarkOwl, LLC. DarkOwl, LLC waiver sent on 8/11/2021, answer due 10/10/2021. (Danielson, Sabrina)
August 19, 2021 Filing 12 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (alave, )
August 11, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Arkowl Corporation by Plaintiff DarkOwl, LLC. (Danielson, Sabrina)
August 11, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Arkowl LLC by Plaintiff DarkOwl, LLC. (Danielson, Sabrina)
August 11, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Kourtney Mueller Merrill on behalf of DarkOwl, LLCAttorney Kourtney Mueller Merrill added to party DarkOwl, LLC(pty:pla) (Merrill, Kourtney)
August 11, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Sabrina J. Danielson on behalf of DarkOwl, LLCAttorney Sabrina J. Danielson added to party DarkOwl, LLC(pty:pla) (Danielson, Sabrina)
August 10, 2021 Filing 7 Report re Patent/Trademark: Report on the filing of an action emailed (NEF) to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (jtorr, )
August 10, 2021 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. No summons issued. (jtorr, )
August 10, 2021 Filing 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Text Only Entry. (jtorr, )
August 10, 2021 Filing 4 Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number COX099999 (jsalz, )
August 10, 2021 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Dunn, Lindsey)
August 10, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment against Arkowl Corporation, arkowl llc Attorney Lindsey Erin Dunn added to party darkowl llc(pty:pla), filed by darkowl llc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Dunn, Lindsey)
August 10, 2021 Filing 1 Administrative Notice: No initiating document. Attorney contacted with instructions to file the initiating document within 24 hours. (Text Only Entry) (jtorr, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DarkOwl, LLC v. Arkowl LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: darkowl llc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DarkOwl, LLC
Represented By: Kourtney Mueller Merrill
Represented By: Sabrina J. Danielson
Represented By: Lindsey Erin Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: arkowl llc
Represented By: Michael H. Frasier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arkowl Corporation
Represented By: Michael H. Frasier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?