Shumaker v. Burgess Services LLC
Plaintiff: Jackie Shumaker
Defendant: Burgess Services LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv02291
Filed: August 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Michael E Hegarty
Referring Judge: William J Martinez
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2021 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jackie Shumaker. Burgess Services LLC served on 10/13/2021, answer due 11/3/2021. (Calderon Baron, Sergio)
October 6, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (trvo, )
September 30, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS REQUEST by Plaintiff Jackie Shumaker. (Calderon Baron, Sergio)
September 10, 2021 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Calderon Baron, Sergio)
August 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 26 August 2021. Proposed Scheduling Order due 10/26/2021. Scheduling Conference set for 11/2/2021 11:30 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. (cmadr, )
August 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Counsel for the parties and all counsel who may later enter an appearance shall review and familiarize themselves with the undersigned's Revised Practice Standards (as most recently revised effective December 1, 2020 and as they may be amended from time to time), which may be downloaded #here. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 8/ 25/2021. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
August 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Magistrate Judge Hegarty, or such other Magistrate Judge who may in the future be reassigned to this case, is designated to conduct NDISPO proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 72(a) and (b). ALSO ORDERED that unless service has otherwise been completed or arranged, Plaintiff's counsel is directed to effect service of the summons and complaint pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure no later than 30 days from the date of this Referral Order, in order for the initial scheduling conference to be held promptly. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the Magistrate Judge or on the request of the parties by motion, the court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 8/25/2021. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
August 25, 2021 Filing 5 CASE REASSIGNED. This case was originally assigned incorrectly and has therefore been randomly reassigned to Judge William J. Martinez and drawn to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. All future pleadings should be designated as 21-cv-02291-WJM. (Text only entry.) (jtorr, )
August 25, 2021 Filing 4 Report re Copyright: Report on the filing of an action emailed separately to the Director of the Copyright Office. (jtorr, )
August 25, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (jtorr, )
August 24, 2021 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn and drawn to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Text Only Entry. (jtorr, )
August 24, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Burgess Services LLC (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number ACODC-8037190)Attorney Sergio Calderon Baron added to party Jackie Shumaker(pty:pla), filed by Jackie Shumaker. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #5 Summons)(Calderon Baron, Sergio)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shumaker v. Burgess Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jackie Shumaker
Represented By: Sergio Calderon Baron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Burgess Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?