Level 3 Communications LLC v. AT&T Corporation
Plaintiff: Level 3 Communications LLC
Defendant: AT&T Corporation
Case Number: 1:2021cv02394
Filed: September 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Raymond P Moore
Referring Judge: N Reid Neureiter
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47 U.S.C. ยง 0203 - Telecommunications Collection of Charges
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 30, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 30, 2022 Filing 33 Civil Case Terminated pursuant to the #32 stipulation to dismiss filed in this case. Text Only Entry. (sdunb, )
March 30, 2022 Filing 32 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Case by Plaintiff Level 3 Communications LLC. (Steese, Charles)
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER GOVERNING CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 19 January 2022. (cmadr, )
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 19 January 2022. It is hereby ORDERED that the Stipulated Motion for Entry of Protective Order(Dkt. #28 ) is GRANTED. The proposed Stipulated Protective Order GoverningConfidential Information (Dkt. #28-1) is APPROVED with the changes at 1516 andmade an Order of Court. PLEASE READ ATTACHED MINUTE ORDER. (cmadr, )
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MEMORANDUM regarding #28 Stipulated MOTION for Protective Order filed by Level 3 Communications LLC. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. By Judge Raymond P. Moore on 1/19/2022. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
January 18, 2022 Filing 28 Stipulated MOTION for Protective Order by Plaintiff Level 3 Communications LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Steese, Charles)
January 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on January 12, 2022. (rvill, )
January 12, 2022 Filing 26 COURTROOM MINUTES for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 1/12/2022. Joint Status Report due by 8/5/2022. Discovery due by 10/21/2022. Dispositive Motions due by 11/16/2022. A Final Pretrial Conference is set for 1/10/2023 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom C203 before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. FTR: Courtroom C203. (rvill, )
January 11, 2022 Filing 25 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Douglas Nelson Marsh on behalf of Level 3 Communications LLCAttorney Douglas Nelson Marsh added to party Level 3 Communications LLC(pty:pla) (Marsh, Douglas)
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MINUTE ORDER. The upcoming Scheduling Conference on January 12, 2022 at 11:30 a.m. in this matter shall be conducted via telephone. The parties are directed to call the conference line as a participant at (888) 398-2342, Access Code 5755390# at the scheduled time. The Court notes that the parties may hear the conclusion of a prior hearing at the time they call in, and are instructed to simply wait until their case is called. SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on January 11, 2022. Text Only Entry. (rvill, )
January 6, 2022 Filing 23 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent AT&T Inc. for AT&T Corporation. (DeCook, Rebecca)
January 6, 2022 Filing 22 NOTICE OF CASE ASSOCIATION by Rebecca B. DeCook on behalf of AT&T Corporation (DeCook, Rebecca)
January 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MINUTE ORDER: With the assignment of this matter, the parties are advised that throughout this case they are expected to be familiar and comply with not only the Local Rules of this District, but also Judge Raymond P. Moore's Civil Practice Standards, which may be found at: http://www.cod.uscourts.gov/JudicialOfficers/ActiveArticleIIIJudges/HonRaymondPMoore.aspx. SO ORDERED by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 1/5/2022. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
January 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order, and (5) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. By Judge Raymond P. Moore on 1/5/2022. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec)
January 5, 2022 Filing 19 Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Level 3 Communications LLC. (Steese, Charles)
January 5, 2022 Filing 18 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Michael D. Warden on behalf of AT&T CorporationAttorney Michael D. Warden added to party AT&T Corporation(pty:dft) (Warden, Michael)
December 17, 2021 Filing 17 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, and Defenses of Defendant AT&T Corp. by AT&T Corporation.(DeCook, Rebecca)
December 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. After conferral pursuant to Local Civil Rule 3.2(d), and pursuant to Local Civil Rule 40.1(d)(4)(B) and the approval of the Chief Judge, the Clerk of Court is directed to reassign this case to Judge Raymond P. Moore as the presiding judge. All future pleadings should be designated 1:21-cv-02394-RM. SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 12/2/2021. Text Only Entry (dddlc2, )
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond re #14 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint. Defendant AT&T Corporation has until and including12/17/2021 to file its Answer or other response. SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 11/22/2021. Text Only Entry(dddlc2, )
November 19, 2021 Filing 14 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint, by Defendant AT&T Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(DeCook, Rebecca)
November 18, 2021 Filing 13 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #12 Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Daniel D. Domenico and drawn to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. All future pleadings should be designated as 21-cv-02394-DDD. (Text Only Entry) (cmadr, )
November 18, 2021 Filing 12 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Level 3 Communications LLC All parties do not consent.. (Steese, Charles)
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on November 12, 2021. The Joint Motion to Re-Set Scheduling Conference (Dkt. #10 ) is GRANTED. Proposed Scheduling Order due 1/5/2022. Scheduling Conference reset for 1/12/2022 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom C203 before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. PLEASE READ ATTACHED MINUTE ORDER. (rvill, )
November 12, 2021 Filing 10 Joint MOTION to Reset Scheduling Conference by Defendant AT&T Corporation. (DeCook, Rebecca)
November 8, 2021 Filing 9 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint, by Defendant AT&T Corporation. (DeCook, Rebecca)
November 8, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Rebecca B. DeCook on behalf of AT&T CorporationAttorney Rebecca B. DeCook added to party AT&T Corporation(pty:dft) (DeCook, Rebecca)
September 13, 2021 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Level 3 Communications LLC. AT&T Corporation waiver sent on 9/7/2021, answer due 11/6/2021. (Steese, Charles)
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE AND SETTING DEADLINE FOR FILING OF CONSENT/NON-CONSENT FORM by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 10 September 2021. Consent Form due by 11/18/2021. Proposed Scheduling Order due 11/25/2021. Scheduling Conference set for 12/2/2021 10:30 AM in Courtroom C203 before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. The Scheduling Conference will be conducted via telephone. The parties are directed to call the conference line as a participant at (888) 398-2342, Access Code 5755390# at the scheduled time. (cmadr, )
September 7, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (jcharl, )
September 3, 2021 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Text Only Entry. (jcharl, )
September 3, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE ASSOCIATION by Charles Walter Steese on behalf of Level 3 Communications LLC (Steese, Charles)
September 3, 2021 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Level 3 Financing, Inc, Corporate Parent Lumen Technologies Inc for Level 3 Communications LLC. (Steese, Charles)
September 3, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AT&T Corporation (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number ACODC-8057516)Attorney Charles Walter Steese added to party Level 3 Communications LLC(pty:pla), filed by Level 3 Communications LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Steese, Charles)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Level 3 Communications LLC v. AT&T Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Level 3 Communications LLC
Represented By: Charles Walter Steese
Represented By: Douglas Nelson Marsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AT&T Corporation
Represented By: Michael D. Warden
Represented By: Rebecca B. DeCook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?