Invisible Structures, Inc. v. Airfield Systems, LLC
Plaintiff: Invisible Structures, Inc.
Defendant: Airfield Systems, LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv02607
Filed: September 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Philip A Brimmer
Referring Judge: Scott T Varholak
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1125 Unfair Competition (Lanham Act)
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 20, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 20, 2023 Filing 44 Report re Patent/Trademark: Report on the determination of an action emailed (NEF) to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (athom, )
January 20, 2023 Filing 43 Civil Case Terminated pursuant to the #42 Stipulation of Dismissal of Case filed in this case on 01/20/2023. Text Only Entry (athom, )
January 20, 2023 Filing 42 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Case by Plaintiff Invisible Structures, Inc.. (Quiat, Laurin)
October 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting #39 Motion to Amend/Correct/Modify. Fact discovery due 12/30/2022. Expert Disclosures Due 1/20/2023. Rebuttal Expert Disclosures due 2/10/2023, Expert Discovery Due 3/3/2023. SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 10/7/2022. Text Only Entry(stvlc4, )
October 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 40 MEMORANDUM regarding #39 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify 26 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct/Modify,, Scheduling Order and Extend Deadline to Complete Fact and Expert Discovery filed by Invisible Structures, Inc. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 10/07/2022. Text Only Entry (pablc4, )
October 7, 2022 Filing 39 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify 26 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct/Modify,, Scheduling Order and Extend Deadline to Complete Fact and Expert Discovery by Plaintiff Invisible Structures, Inc.. (Quiat, Laurin)
September 23, 2022 Filing 38 ANSWER to #37 Amended Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Airfield Systems, LLC.(Talley, Evan)
September 9, 2022 Filing 37 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Airfield Systems, LLC, filed by Invisible Structures, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Quiat, Laurin)
September 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MINUTE ORDER by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 9/08/2022. This matter is before the Court on #32 Plaintiff's Notice of Filing Amended Complaint. On or before September 9, 2022, plaintiff shall file a clean (non-redlined) version of Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint. Text Only Entry (pabsec, )
September 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting #33 Motion to Amend Scheduling Order and Extend Deadline to Complete Mediation. The deadline for parties to complete private mediation is moved from 9/16/2022 to 11/11/2022. SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 9/7/2022. Text Only Entry(stvlc4, )
September 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MEMORANDUM regarding #33 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify 26 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct/Modify,, Scheduling Order and Extend Deadline to Complete Mediation filed by Invisible Structures, Inc. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak, by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 9/07/2022. Text Only Entry (pabsec, )
September 7, 2022 Filing 33 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify 26 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct/Modify,, Scheduling Order and Extend Deadline to Complete Mediation by Plaintiff Invisible Structures, Inc.. (Quiat, Laurin)
September 6, 2022 Filing 32 NOTICE of Filing Amended Pleading by Plaintiff Invisible Structures, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Redlined Amended Complaint)(Quiat, Laurin)
August 10, 2022 Filing 31 MINUTE ENTRY for Discovery Hearing held before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 8/10/2022. FTR: A402. (morti, )
August 10, 2022 Filing 30 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jim V. John on behalf of Airfield Systems, LLCAttorney Jim V. John added to party Airfield Systems, LLC(pty:dft) (John, Jim)
August 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MINUTE ORDER Per the request of the parties, this matter is set for a Discovery Hearing on 8/10/2022 10:30 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. On or before 8/8/2022, the parties shall submit via email to Varholak_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov a brief joint statement setting forth the issues in dispute. SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 8/1/2022. Text Only Entry (stvlc2, )
July 7, 2022 Filing 28 MINUTE ENTRY for Discovery Hearing held before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 7/7/2022. ORDERED: Defendant shall produce the documents and supplement discovery on or before July 15, 2022. If Plaintiff needs to come back to compel production of discovery, the court will be inclined to imposefees. FTR: 402. (morti, )
July 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MINUTE ORDER Per the request of the parties, a Discovery Hearing is set for 7/7/2022 9:00 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Pursuant to Magistrate Judge Varholak's Practice Standards and with allowances for the upcoming holiday, on or before 7/5/2022, the parties shall submit via email to Varholak_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov a brief joint statement setting forth the issues in dispute. SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 7/1/22. Text Only Entry (stvlc3, Andrew)
June 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #24 Motion to Amend Scheduling Order. AFS to serve responses to 3/21/22 requests by 6/22/2022. Final day to serve discovery requests 9/1/2022. Parties to complete private mediation by 9/16/2022. Fact discovery due 10/31/2022. Expert disclosures due 11/18/2022. Rebuttal expert disclosures due 12/29/2022. Expert discovery due by 1/30/2023. Dispositive Motions due by 3/8/2023. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 4/27/2023. The Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/22/2023 is VACATED and RESET for 5/4/2023 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 6/15/2022. Text Only Entry(stvlc2, )
June 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MEMORANDUM regarding #24 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify #18 Scheduling Order and Extend Deadlines filed by Invisible Structures, Inc. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak, by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 06/14/2022. Text Only Entry (pabsec, )
June 14, 2022 Filing 24 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify #18 Scheduling Order and Extend Deadlines by Plaintiff Invisible Structures, Inc.. (Quiat, Laurin)
March 1, 2022 Filing 23 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Douglas John Sorocco on behalf of Airfield Systems, LLCAttorney Douglas John Sorocco added to party Airfield Systems, LLC(pty:dft) (Sorocco, Douglas)
January 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 27 January 2022. (cmadr, )
January 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #19 Motion for Protective Order. The Court will enter the Protective Order proposed by the parties. SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 1/27/2022. Text Only Entry(stvlc2, )
January 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MEMORANDUM regarding #19 Stipulated MOTION for Protective Order filed by Invisible Structures, Inc. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak, by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 1/27/2022. Text Only Entry (pabsec, )
January 27, 2022 Filing 19 Stipulated MOTION for Protective Order by Plaintiff Invisible Structures, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Order)(Quiat, Laurin)
January 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 1/27/2022. (morti, )
January 27, 2022 Filing 17 MINUTE ENTRY for Scheduling Conference held before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 1/27/2022. Discovery due by 10/28/2022. Dispositive Motions due by 12/8/2022. Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/22/2023 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. FTR: 402. (morti, )
January 20, 2022 Filing 16 Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Invisible Structures, Inc.. (Brandyberry, Jared)
November 24, 2021 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Airfield Systems, LLC.(Talley, Evan)
November 24, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Evan W. Talley on behalf of Airfield Systems, LLCAttorney Evan W. Talley added to party Airfield Systems, LLC(pty:dft) (Talley, Evan)
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER Per the request of the parties, the Scheduling Conference set for 21/1/2021 is VACATED and RESET for 1/27/2022 10:45 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Proposed Scheduling Order due 1/20/2022. SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 11/16/2021. Text Only Entry (stvlc2, )
November 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak for non-dispositive matters. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, and (4) conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding, by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 11/14/2021. Text Only Entry (pabsec, )
November 10, 2021 Filing 11 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #10 Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer and drawn to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. All future pleadings should be designated as 21-cv-02607-PAB. (Text Only Entry) (cmadr, )
November 10, 2021 Filing 10 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Invisible Structures, Inc. All parties do not consent.. (Quiat, Laurin)
October 27, 2021 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Invisible Structures, Inc.. Airfield Systems, LLC waiver sent on 9/28/2021, answer due 11/27/2021. (Quiat, Laurin)
September 30, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Brendan E Clark on behalf of Invisible Structures, Inc.Attorney Brendan E Clark added to party Invisible Structures, Inc.(pty:pla) (Clark, Brendan)
September 28, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jared Alan Brandyberry on behalf of Invisible Structures, Inc.Attorney Jared Alan Brandyberry added to party Invisible Structures, Inc.(pty:pla) (Brandyberry, Jared)
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER SETTING DEADLINE FOR FILING ELECTION CONCERNING CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO MAGISTRATE JURISDICTION FORM AND SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 27 September 2021. Consent Form due by 11/17/2021. Proposed Scheduling Order due11/24/2021 Scheduling Conference set for 12/1/2021 10:45 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. (csarr, )
September 27, 2021 Filing 5 Report re Patent/Trademark: Report on the filing of an action emailed (NEF) to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (cpomm, )
September 27, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (cpomm, )
September 27, 2021 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Text Only Entry (cpomm, )
September 27, 2021 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Quiat, Laurin)
September 27, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Verified Complaint with Jury Demand against Airfield Systems, LLC (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number ACODC-8094286)Attorney Laurin D. Quiat added to party Invisible Structures, Inc.(pty:pla), filed by Invisible Structures, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4)(Quiat, Laurin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Invisible Structures, Inc. v. Airfield Systems, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Invisible Structures, Inc.
Represented By: Brendan E Clark
Represented By: Jared Alan Brandyberry
Represented By: Laurin D. Quiat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Airfield Systems, LLC
Represented By: Evan W. Talley
Represented By: Douglas John Sorocco
Represented By: Jim V. John
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?