SEBO America, LLC v. Does
Plaintiff: SEBO America, LLC
Defendant: Does and Phan Tran Phong
Case Number: 1:2021cv02865
Filed: October 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Raymond P Moore
Referring Judge: Scott T Varholak
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 44
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 22, 2021 Filing 25 MOTION for Release of Funds by Plaintiff SEBO America, LLC. (Sturman, Jeffrey)
December 22, 2021 Filing 24 Civil Case Terminated pursuant to the #23 Notice of Voluntary dismissal of case without prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a).,filed on 12/22/2021. By Judge Raymond P. Moore. Text Only Entry (evana, )
December 22, 2021 Filing 23 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Case by Plaintiff SEBO America, LLC (Sturman, Jeffrey)
December 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 21 December 2021. Proposed Scheduling Order due 2/15/2022. Scheduling Conference set for 2/22/2022 11:30 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. (cmadr, )
November 30, 2021 Filing 21 SUMMONS issued by Clerk as to Phan Tran Phong on 11/30/2021. (sdunb, )
November 29, 2021 Filing 20 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Phan Tran Phong by Plaintiff SEBO America, LLC. (Sturman, Jeffrey)
November 29, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE of Filing Amended Pleading re #18 Amended Complaint by Plaintiff SEBO America, LLC (Sturman, Jeffrey)
November 29, 2021 Filing 18 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Does, filed by SEBO America, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Redline of Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint)(Sturman, Jeffrey)
November 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER. The Court ORDERS: The hearing scheduled for November 12, 2021, at 2:00 p.m. is VACATED and Plaintiff shall file proof of service on named Defendants before any renewal of its motion for a temporary restraining order. By Judge Raymond P. Moore on 11/05/2021. (sdunb, )
November 1, 2021 Filing 16 PAYMENT RECEIVED from SEBO America, LLC in the amount of $ 5,000.00; Receipt Number COX101003. (sdunb, )
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #11 MOTION for Leave to Seek Third Party Discovery to Learn Defendant's Identities by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 29 October 2021. For the foregoing reasons, the Motion is GRANTED. Plaintiff may serve a thirdparty subpoena pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 45 prior to the Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f)conference on Amazon, Inc. for the limited purpose of ascertaining the identity of the Doe Defendant as identified by the Amazon seller information listed in the Complaint. The subpoena shall be limited to providing Plaintiff with the true name, address, telephone number, and email address of the Defendant as identified by the Amazon seller information. Plaintiff shall also serve a copy of this Order with the subpoena.(cmadr, )
October 29, 2021 Filing 14 Utility Setting/Resetting Deadlines/Hearings: Hearing on the Plaintiff's request for a preliminary injunction set for 11/12/2021 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom A 601 before Judge Raymond P. Moore pursuant to #13 Temporary Restraining Order. Text Only Entry. (sdunb, )
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. This order shall remain in full force and effect pending hearing and determination of an application for a preliminary injunction or the expiration of fourteen (14) days from the date of this order, whichever comes first. By Judge Raymond P. Moore on 10/29/2021. (sdunb, )
October 28, 2021 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM regarding #11 MOTION for Leave to Seek Third Party Discovery to Learn Defendant's Identities filed by SEBO America, LLC. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Entered by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 10/28/2021. Text Only Entry (cpear)
October 27, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Seek Third Party Discovery to Learn Defendant's Identities by Plaintiff SEBO America, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Sturman, Jeffrey)
October 26, 2021 Filing 10 Proposed Pretrial Order for Motion for Temporary Restraining Order by Plaintiff SEBO America, LLC. (Sturman, Jeffrey)
October 26, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Plaintiff SEBO America, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit)(Sturman, Jeffrey)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER: With the assignment of this matter, the parties are advised that throughout this case they are expected to be familiar and comply with not only the Local Rules of this District, but also Judge Raymond P. Moore's Civil Practice Standards, which may be found at: http://www.cod.uscourts.gov/JudicialOfficers/ActiveArticleIIIJudges/HonRaymondPMoore.aspx. SO ORDERED by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 10/26/2021. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order, and (5) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. By Judge Raymond P. Moore on 10/26/2021. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
October 25, 2021 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). NO SUMMONS ISSUED. (jsalz, )
October 25, 2021 Filing 5 Report re Patent/Trademark: Report on the filing of an action emailed (NEF) to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (jsalz, )
October 25, 2021 Filing 4 Case assigned to Judge Raymond P. Moore and drawn to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Text Only Entry. (jsalz, )
October 25, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Related Cases by Defendant SEBO America, LLC (Sturman, Jeffrey)
October 25, 2021 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Sturman, Jeffrey)
October 25, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DOES (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number ACODC-8141973)Attorney Jeffrey Michael Sturman added to party SEBO America, LLC(pty:dft), filed by SEBO America, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sturman, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SEBO America, LLC v. Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SEBO America, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey Michael Sturman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phan Tran Phong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?