Broadband iTV, Inc. v. Dish Network, L.L.C.
Plaintiff: Broadband iTV, Inc.
Defendant: Dish Network Llc and Darryl J. Adams
Case Number: 1:2021cv02867
Filed: October 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Raymond P Moore
Referring Judge: Nina Y Wang
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 1, 2021 Filing 207 Civil Case Terminated pursuant to the #206 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Case filed in this case. Text Only Entry. (sdunb, )
December 1, 2021 Filing 206 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Case (Joint) Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice of All Claims Under Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) by Plaintiff Broadband iTV, Inc.. (Day, M.)
November 15, 2021 Filing 205 COURTROOM MINUTES for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang: Telephonic Status Conference held on 11/15/2021. Joint Status Report due by 2/28/2022. Telephonic Status Conference set for 3/8/2022 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. The parties are directed to call the conference line as a participant at (888) 363-4749, Access Code 5738976# at the scheduled time. FTR: Courtroom A502. (slibi, )
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 204 MINUTE ORDER: In light of the Parties' #203 Joint Status Report, a Telephonic Status Conference is SET for 11/15/2021 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. All Parties shall participate at the designated time by using the following dial-in information: 888-363-4749; Access Code 5738976#. By Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 11/08/2021. Text Only Entry (nywlc2, )
November 5, 2021 Filing 203 Joint STATUS REPORT by Plaintiff Broadband iTV, Inc.. (Day, M.)
November 4, 2021 Filing 202 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by M. Elizabeth Day on behalf of Broadband iTV, Inc.Attorney M. Elizabeth Day added to party Broadband iTV, Inc.(pty:pla) (Day, M.)
November 1, 2021 Filing 201 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant Dish Network Llc All parties do not consent.. (Caridis, Alyssa)
October 28, 2021 Filing 200 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Clement S. Roberts on behalf of Dish Network LlcAttorney Clement S. Roberts added to party Dish Network Llc(pty:dft) (Roberts, Clement)
October 28, 2021 Filing 199 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Alyssa M. Caridis on behalf of Dish Network LlcAttorney Alyssa M. Caridis added to party Dish Network Llc(pty:dft) (Caridis, Alyssa)
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 198 MINUTE ORDER: This case in before the court sua sponte after its transfer from the United States District Court for the Western District of Texas. From the transferred docket, it appears that discovery is closed and several motions are pending for adjudication. In order to assist the court in proceeding in an efficient manner, no later than November 5, 2021, the Parties are ORDERED to submit a Status Report, including but not necessarily limited to: (1) the current patents and claims asserted; (2) identification of all pending motions and associated briefing, by name and associated docket entry numbers from this District's Electronic Court Filing system; (3) identification of significant rulings by the Honorable Alan D. Albright and the associated docket entry number from this District's Electronic Court Filing system (e.g., "Claim Construction Ruling [Doc. 74]"), and (4) any other outstanding matter that the Parties seek to bring to the court's attention at this time. By Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 10/27/2021. Text Only Entry (nywlc2, )
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 197 MINUTE ORDER: With the assignment of this matter, the parties are advised that throughout this case they are expected to be familiar and comply with not only the Local Rules of this District, but also Judge Raymond P. Moore's Civil Practice Standards, which may be found at: http://www.cod.uscourts.gov/JudicialOfficers/ActiveArticleIIIJudges/HonRaymondPMoore.aspx. SO ORDERED by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 10/26/2021. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 196 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order, and (5) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. By Judge Raymond P. Moore on 10/26/2021. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
October 25, 2021 Filing 192 Case transferred in from District of Texas Western; Case Number 6:19-cv-00716. File, transfer order and docket sheet received
October 22, 2021 Filing 195 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (norlin, )
October 22, 2021 Filing 194 Case assigned to Judge Raymond P. Moore and drawn to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Text Only Entry (norlin, )
October 22, 2021 Filing 193 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (norlin, )
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 191 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO THE DISTRICT OF COLORADO re #190 Order. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (jc5) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
October 22, 2021 Case transferred to District of Colorado. (jc5) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
October 21, 2021 Filing 190 Federal Circuit ORDER granting Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed by DISH Network L.L.C. The district court's order #83 denying DISH's motion to transfer is vacated, and the district court is directed to grant the transfer motion.(lad) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 189 ORDER APPOINTING SPECIAL MASTER. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (lad) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
October 15, 2021 Filing 188 NOTICE Pursuant to 35 U.S.C. 282 by DISH Network, L.L.C. (Caridis, Alyssa) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
October 14, 2021 Filing 186 Redacted Copy of Dkt 173-DISH NETWORK L.L.C.S OPPOSITION TO BROADBAND ITV, INC.s MOTIONS IN LIMINE of #174 Sealed Document, by DISH Network, L.L.C.. (Caridis, Alyssa) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
October 13, 2021 Filing 185 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by DISH Network, L.L.C., re #146 Sealed Motion DISH NETWORK L.L.C.S MOTION FOR FURTHER CONSTRUCTION OF THE WHEREIN LIMITATION by DISH Network, L.L.C. filed by Defendant DISH Network, L.L.C. (Caridis, Alyssa) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
October 13, 2021 Filing 184 Redacted Copy Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motions in Limine of #172 Sealed Document, by BROADBAND iTV, INC.. (Kramer, Robert) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
October 13, 2021 Filing 183 NOTICE (JOINT) CONCERNING AN EXTENSION OF THE DUE DATE FOR OBJECTIONS TO THE REQUESTED JURY CHARGE by BROADBAND iTV, INC. (Kramer, Robert) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 181 ORDER CANCELLING Final Pretrial Conference. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (bot1) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 182 Standing Order Regarding Order Governing Proceedings Patent Cases. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
October 8, 2021 Filing 180 Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: #1 Ex A, #2 Proposed Order) (Caridis, Alyssa) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
October 8, 2021 Filing 179 NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR DAILY TRIAL TRANSCRIPTS AND REAL TIME REPORTING by BROADBAND iTV, INC. (Kramer, Robert) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 178 ORDER GRANTING #171 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Abigail L. Colella. Attorney added for DISH Network, L.L.C. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order, if he/she has not previously done so for a prior case in this District. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (jkda) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
October 7, 2021 Filing 177 NOTICE DISH NETWORK L.L.C.S NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR DAILY TRIAL TRANSCRIPTS AND REAL TIME REPORTING by DISH Network, L.L.C. (Caridis, Alyssa) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
October 7, 2021 Filing 176 Sealed Document: Exhibit 17 (Defendants' Motions in Limine) to [Proposed] Joint Pretrial Order of #175 Pretrial Disclosures,,,, by BROADBAND iTV, INC. (Kramer, Robert) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
October 7, 2021 Filing 175 Pretrial Disclosures [PROPOSED] JOINT PRETRIAL ORDER by BROADBAND iTV, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Plaintiff's Trial Exhibit List, #2 Exhibit 2-Defendants' Trial Exhibit List, #3 Exhibit 3-Joint Trial Exhibit List, #4 Exhibit 4-Plaintiff's Jury Trial Witness List, #5 Exhibit 5-Defendants' Jury Trial Witness List, #6 Exhibit 6-Plaintiff's Deposition Designations, #7 Exhibit 7-Defendants' Deposition Designations, #8 Exhibit 8-Agreed Requested Jury Charge, #9 Exhibit 9-Agreed Jury Charge and Interrogatories, #10 Exhibit 10-Plaintiff's Proposed Verdict Form, #11 Exhibit 11-Defendants' Proposed Verdict Form, #12 Exhibit 12-Plaintiff's Proposed Voir Dire, #13 Exhibit 13-Defendants' Proposed Voir Dire, #14 Exhibit 14-Defendants' Memorandum of Law on Section 101 Submission, #15 Exhibit 15-Plaintiff's Responsive Memorandum of Law on Section 101 Submission, #16 Exhibit 16-Plaintiff's Motions in Limine)(Kramer, Robert) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
October 7, 2021 Filing 174 Sealed Document: DECLARATION OF ALYSSA CARIDIS IN SUPPORT OF DISH NETWORK L.L.C.S OPPOSITION TO BROADBAND ITV, INC.s MOTIONS IN LIMINE of 173 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion by DISH Network, L.L.C. (Attachments: #1 Ex. 1, #2 Ex. 2, #3 Ex. 3, #4 Ex. 4, #5 Ex. 5, #6 Ex. 6, #7 Ex. 7, #8 Ex. 8) (Caridis, Alyssa) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
October 7, 2021 Filing 172 Sealed Document: Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motions in Limine of #164 Sealed Document by BROADBAND iTV, INC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Robert F. Kramer, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3) (Kramer, Robert) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
October 6, 2021 Filing 171 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Alyssa Caridis Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Abigail L. Colella ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15304593) by on behalf of DISH Network, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Caridis, Alyssa) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
October 6, 2021 Filing 170 Redacted Copy of #165 Sealed Document, by DISH Network, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exs. A-O, #2 Exs. P-W)(Caridis, Alyssa) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
October 6, 2021 Filing 169 Redacted Copy of #164 Sealed Document by DISH Network, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Caridis, Alyssa) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
October 6, 2021 Filing 168 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by BROADBAND iTV, INC., re #146 Sealed Motion DISH NETWORK L.L.C.S MOTION FOR FURTHER CONSTRUCTION OF THE WHEREIN LIMITATION by DISH Network, L.L.C. filed by Defendant DISH Network, L.L.C. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Robert F. Kramer, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3)(Kramer, Robert) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
October 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 167 ORDER, (Pretrial Conference set for 10/12/2021 08:30 AM before Judge Alan D Albright). Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (bot1) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
September 29, 2021 Filing 166 NOTICE JOINT NOTICE CONCERNING AN EXTENSION OF THE DUE DATE FOR FILING THE PRETRIAL ORDER, PRETRIAL SUBMISSIONS, AND OPPOSITIONS TO MOTIONS IN LIMINE by DISH Network, L.L.C. (Caridis, Alyssa) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
September 29, 2021 Filing 165 Sealed Document: DECLARATION OF ALYSSA CARIDIS IN SUPPORT OF DISH NETWORK L.L.C.'S MOTIONS IN LIMINE of #164 Sealed Document by DISH Network, L.L.C. (Attachments: #1 Exs A-L, #2 Ex M, #3 Ex N, #4 Ex O, #5 Ex P, #6 Ex Q, #7 Ex R, #8 Ex S, #9 Ex T, #10 Ex U, #11 Ex V, #12 Ex W) (Caridis, Alyssa) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
September 29, 2021 Filing 164 Sealed Document: DISH NETWORK L.L.C.'S MOTIONS IN LIMINE by DISH Network, L.L.C. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Caridis, Alyssa) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
September 29, 2021 Filing 163 Redacted Copy of 148 Sealed Motion In Limine by BROADBAND iTV, INC. by BROADBAND iTV, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Robert F. Kramer, #2 Exhibit 7, #3 Exhibit 9, #4 Exhibit 10, #5 Exhibit 11, #6 Exhibit 12, #7 Exhibit 13, #8 Exhibit 15, #9 Exhibit 16, #10 Exhibit 17, #11 Exhibit 18, #12 Exhibit 19, #13 Exhibit 20, #14 Proposed Order)(Kramer, Robert) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER GRANTING #161 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Elizabeth R. Moulton. Attorney added for DISH Network, L.L.C. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order, if he/she has not previously done so for a prior case in this District. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (jkda) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
September 27, 2021 Filing 161 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Alyssa Caridis Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Elizabeth R. Moulton ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15268242) by on behalf of DISH Network, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Caridis, Alyssa) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
September 25, 2021 Filing 160 Sealed Document: OMNIBUS DECLARATION OF ALYSSA CARIDIS IN SUPPORT OF DISH NETWORK L.L.C.S MOTIONS IN LIMINE NOS. 1 THROUGH 11 of #152 Sealed Document, #155 Sealed Document, #156 MOTION in Limine DISH NETWORK L.L.C.S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 8 TO EXCLUDE BROADBAND ITV, INC. FROM PRESENTING ARGUMENT OR EVIDENCE RELATED TO WILLFULNESS, #154 Sealed Document, #158 Sealed Document, #153 Sealed Document, #159 Sealed Document, #151 Sealed Document, #157 Sealed Document, #149 Sealed Document, #150 Sealed Document, by DISH Network, L.L.C. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-L, #2 Ex M, #3 Ex N, #4 Ex O, #5 Ex P, #6 Ex Q, #7 Ex R, #8 Ex S, #9 Ex T, #10 Ex U, #11 Ex V, #12 Ex W) (Caridis, Alyssa) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
September 24, 2021 Filing 159 Sealed Document: DISH NETWORK L.L.C.S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 11 THAT BBITV IS PROHIBITED FROM ARGUING THE GENERATED USING LIMITATION OF THE 026 PATENT MUST BE FOUND IN PRIOR ART by DISH Network, L.L.C. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Caridis, Alyssa) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
September 24, 2021 Filing 158 Sealed Document: DISH NETWORK L.L.C.S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 10 TO EXCLUDE BROADBAND ITV, INC. FROM RAISING EVIDENCE OR ARGUMENT REGARDING ITS LEGAL DISPUTES WITH DISHS COUNSEL by DISH Network, L.L.C. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Caridis, Alyssa) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
September 24, 2021 Filing 157 Sealed Document: DISH NETWORK L.L.C.S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 9 TO EXCLUDE REFERENCE TO THE TIVO-DISH 2011 SETTLEMENT AND RELATED PAYMENTS by DISH Network, L.L.C. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Caridis, Alyssa) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
September 24, 2021 Filing 156 MOTION in Limine DISH NETWORK L.L.C.S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 8 TO EXCLUDE BROADBAND ITV, INC. FROM PRESENTING ARGUMENT OR EVIDENCE RELATED TO WILLFULNESS by DISH Network, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Caridis, Alyssa) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
September 24, 2021 Filing 155 Sealed Document: DISH NETWORK L.L.C.S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 7 TO EXCLUDE THE OPENTV AGREEMENT by DISH Network, L.L.C. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Caridis, Alyssa) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
September 24, 2021 Filing 154 Sealed Document: DISH NETWORK L.L.C.S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 6 TO EXCLUDE REFERENCES TO DISHS TOTAL REVENUE by DISH Network, L.L.C. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Caridis, Alyssa) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
September 24, 2021 Filing 153 Sealed Document: DISH NETWORK L.L.C.S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 5 TO EXCLUDE REFERENCES TO BBiTVS INVESTMENTS IN ITS PATENTS AND PRODUCTS by DISH Network, L.L.C. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Caridis, Alyssa) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
September 24, 2021 Filing 152 Sealed Document: DISH NETWORK L.L.C.S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 4 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OR ARGUMENT RELATED TO THE DANY APP, FOR WHICH BBITV OFFERED NO INDEPENDENT DAMAGES THEORY by DISH Network, L.L.C. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Caridis, Alyssa) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
September 24, 2021 Filing 151 Sealed Document: DISH NETWORK L.L.C.S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 3 TO PRECLUDE BROADBAND ITV, INC. FROM PRESENTING ARGUMENT OR EVIDENCE RELATED TO ITS NONASSERTED PATENTS by DISH Network, L.L.C. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Caridis, Alyssa) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
September 24, 2021 Filing 150 Sealed Document: DISH NETWORK L.L.C.S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 2 TO EXCLUDE MILTON DIAZ FROM TESTIFYING REGARDING THE ALLEGED IMPORTANCE OF LICENSED PATENT RIGHTS TO OPENTV, INC. by DISH Network, L.L.C. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Caridis, Alyssa) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
September 24, 2021 Filing 149 Sealed Document: DISH NETWORK L.L.C.S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1 TO EXCLUDE CERTAIN OF BBITVs EVIDENCE AND TESTIMONY REGARDING SECONDARY CONSIDERATIONS by DISH Network, L.L.C. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Caridis, Alyssa) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
September 24, 2021 Filing 147 Redacted Copy of Response to Defendant's Notice of Supplemental Authority on Daubert Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony of Mr. Roy Weinstein of #145 Sealed Document, by BROADBAND iTV, INC.. (Kramer, Robert) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
September 23, 2021 Filing 146 Sealed Motion DISH NETWORK L.L.C.S MOTION FOR FURTHER CONSTRUCTION OF THE WHEREIN LIMITATION by DISH Network, L.L.C. (Attachments: #1 Caridis Decl) (Caridis, Alyssa) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
September 20, 2021 Filing 145 Sealed Document: Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Notice of Supplemental Authority on It's Daubert Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony of Mr. Roy Weinstein of #144 Notice (Other), by BROADBAND iTV, INC. (Kramer, Robert) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
September 17, 2021 Filing 144 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY ON DISH NETWORK L.L.C.S DAUBERT MOTION TO EXCLUDE EXPERT TESTIMONY OF MR. ROY WEINSTEIN by DISH Network, L.L.C. re #112 Sealed Motion Dish Network L.L.C.'s Daubert Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony of Mr. Roy Weinstein by DISH Network, L.L.C. (Caridis, Alyssa) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
September 13, 2021 Filing 143 Redacted Copy of #142 Sealed Document,, by DISH Network, L.L.C.. (Caridis, Alyssa) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
September 9, 2021 Filing 142 Sealed Document: Dish Network L.L.C.S Reply ISO Its Daubert Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony of Mr. Roy Weinstein; Decl. of Alyssa Caridis ISO of Reply; Exhibits 13 and 14 to Decl. of #112 Sealed Motion Dish Network L.L.C.'s Daubert Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony of Mr. Roy Weinstein by DISH Network, L.L.C. by DISH Network, L.L.C. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Alyssa Caridis ISO of Reply to Its Daubert Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony of Mr. Roy Weinstein, #2 Exhibit 13, #3 Exhibit 14) (Caridis, Alyssa) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
September 9, 2021 Filing 141 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by DISH Network, L.L.C., re #118 Sealed Motion DISH NETWORK L.L.C.S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NO INFRINGEMENT OF U.S. PATENT NO. 10,028,026 by DISH Network, L.L.C. filed by Defendant DISH Network, L.L.C. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Alyssa Caridis ISO Reply, #2 Exhibit H, #3 Exhibit I)(Caridis, Alyssa) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
September 9, 2021 Filing 140 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by DISH Network, L.L.C., re #115 Sealed Motion DISH Network L.L.C.s Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity Under 35 U.S.C. 101 by DISH Network, L.L.C. filed by Defendant DISH Network, L.L.C. (Attachments: #1 Decl of Alyssa Caridis)(Caridis, Alyssa) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
September 9, 2021 Filing 139 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by DISH Network, L.L.C., re #110 Sealed Motion DISH NETWORK, L.L.C.'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT THAT BROADBAND ITV'S DOCTRINE OF EQUIVALENTS INFRINGEMENT THEORY IS BARRED BY PROSECUTION HISTORY ESTOPPEL by DISH Network, L.L.C. filed by Defendant DISH Network, L.L.C. (Caridis, Alyssa) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
September 8, 2021 Filing 138 Redacted Copy Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment of No Infringement of U.S. Patent No. 10,028,026 of #133 Sealed Document,, by BROADBAND iTV, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Robert F. Kramer, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 14, #7 Exhibit 15, #8 Exhibit 16)(Kramer, Robert) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
September 8, 2021 Filing 137 Redacted Copy Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment that Plaintiff's Doctrine of Equivalents Infringement Theory is Barred By Prosecution History Estoppel of #132 Sealed Document,, by BROADBAND iTV, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Robert F. Kramer, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit G, #5 Exhibit H, #6 Exhibit I, #7 Exhibit J, #8 Exhibit K, #9 Exhibit L)(Kramer, Robert) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
September 8, 2021 Filing 136 Redacted Copy Oppositon to Defendant's Daubert Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony of Mr. Roy Weinstein of #131 Sealed Document, by BROADBAND iTV, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Robert F. Kramer, #2 Exhibit C, #3 Exhibit D, #4 Exhibit E, #5 Exhibit F, #6 Exhibit H)(Kramer, Robert) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
September 8, 2021 Filing 135 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by DISH Network, L.L.C., re #114 Sealed Motion DISH NETWORK L.L.C.S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGEMENT THAT U.S. PATENT NO. 10,026,026 IS NOT ENTITLED TO A 2004 PRIORITY DATE by DISH Network, L.L.C. filed by Defendant DISH Network, L.L.C. (Caridis, Alyssa) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER DENYING #121 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (bw) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
September 2, 2021 Filing 133 Sealed Document: Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment of No Infringement of U.S. Patent No. 10,028,026 of #118 Sealed Motion DISH NETWORK L.L.C.S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NO INFRINGEMENT OF U.S. PATENT NO. 10,028,026 by DISH Network, L.L.C. by BROADBAND iTV, INC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Robert F. Kramer, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Affidavit Dr. Hugh Smith) (Kramer, Robert) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
September 2, 2021 Filing 132 Sealed Document: Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment that Plaintiff's Doctrine of Equivalents Infringement Theory is Barred By Prosecution History Estoppel of #110 Sealed Motion DISH NETWORK, L.L.C.'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT THAT BROADBAND ITV'S DOCTRINE OF EQUIVALENTS INFRINGEMENT THEORY IS BARRED BY PROSECUTION HISTORY ESTOPPEL by DISH Network, L.L.C. by BROADBAND iTV, INC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Robert F. Kramer, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L) (Kramer, Robert) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
September 2, 2021 Filing 131 Sealed Document: Response in Opposition to Daubert Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony of Mr. Roy Weinstein of #112 Sealed Motion Dish Network L.L.C.'s Daubert Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony of Mr. Roy Weinstein by DISH Network, L.L.C. by BROADBAND iTV, INC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Robert F. Kramer, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H) (Kramer, Robert) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
September 2, 2021 Filing 130 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by BROADBAND iTV, INC., re #115 Sealed Motion DISH Network L.L.C.s Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity Under 35 U.S.C. 101 by DISH Network, L.L.C. filed by Defendant DISH Network, L.L.C. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Hong S. Lin, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11)(Kramer, Robert) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
September 1, 2021 Filing 129 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by BROADBAND iTV, INC., re #114 Sealed Motion DISH NETWORK L.L.C.S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGEMENT THAT U.S. PATENT NO. 10,026,026 IS NOT ENTITLED TO A 2004 PRIORITY DATE by DISH Network, L.L.C. filed by Defendant DISH Network, L.L.C. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Robert F. Kramer, #2 Exhibit A)(Kramer, Robert) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
August 26, 2021 Filing 128 Redacted Copy of #118 Sealed Motion DISH NETWORK L.L.C.S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NO INFRINGEMENT OF U.S. PATENT NO. 10,028,026 by DISH Network, L.L.C. by DISH Network, L.L.C.. (Caridis, Alyssa) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
August 26, 2021 Filing 127 Redacted Copy of #115 Sealed Motion DISH Network L.L.C.s Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity Under 35 U.S.C. 101 by DISH Network, L.L.C. by DISH Network, L.L.C.. (Caridis, Alyssa) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
August 26, 2021 Filing 126 Redacted Copy of #114 Sealed Motion DISH NETWORK L.L.C.S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGEMENT THAT U.S. PATENT NO. 10,026,026 IS NOT ENTITLED TO A 2004 PRIORITY DATE by DISH Network, L.L.C. by DISH Network, L.L.C.. (Caridis, Alyssa)[Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
August 26, 2021 Filing 125 Redacted Copy of #110 Sealed Motion DISH NETWORK, L.L.C.'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT THAT BROADBAND ITV'S DOCTRINE OF EQUIVALENTS INFRINGEMENT THEORY IS BARRED BY PROSECUTION HISTORY ESTOPPEL by DISH Network, L.L.C. by DISH Network, L.L.C.. (Caridis, Alyssa) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
August 26, 2021 Filing 124 Redacted Copy of #112 Sealed Motion Dish Network L.L.C.'s Daubert Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony of Mr. Roy Weinstein by DISH Network, L.L.C. by DISH Network, L.L.C.. (Caridis, Alyssa) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
August 20, 2021 Filing 123 Sealed Document: Declaration of Robert Kramer in Support of Supplemental Brief in Opposition to Motion to Transfer Venue of #122 Supplemental Memorandum by BROADBAND iTV, INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9) (Kramer, Robert) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
August 20, 2021 Filing 122 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM Supplemental Brief in Opposition to Motion to Transfer Venue by BROADBAND iTV, INC.. (Kramer, Robert) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
August 20, 2021 Filing 121 MOTION for Reconsideration -DISH's Supplemental Brief on Motion for Reconsideration by DISH Network, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Alyssa Caridis ISO Supplemental Brief on Motion for Reconsideration, #2 Exhibit A to Alyssa Caridis Decl., #3 Exhibit B to Alyssa Caridis Decl., #4 Exhibit C to Alyssa Caridis Decl., #5 Exhibit D to Alyssa Caridis Decl., #6 Affidavit of Charles Ealy ISO Supplemental Brief on Motion for Reconsideration, #7 Affidavit of Jeff Wicklein ISO Supplemental Brief on Motion for Reconsideration, #8 Affidavit John Milligan ISO Supplemental Brief on Motion for Reconsideration, #9 Affidavit of Keith Gerhards ISO Supplemental Brief on Motion for Reconsideration, #10 Affidavit of Max Gratton ISO Supplemental Brief on Motion for Reconsideration)(Roberts, Clement) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
August 20, 2021 Filing 120 STATUS REPORT Joint Report Regarding Case Narrowing by BROADBAND iTV, INC.. (Kramer, Robert) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
August 19, 2021 Filing 119 AFFIDAVIT in Support of #118 Sealed Motion DISH NETWORK L.L.C.S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NO INFRINGEMENT OF U.S. PATENT NO. 10,028,026 by DISH Network, L.L.C. DECLARATION OF ALYSSA CARIDIS IN SUPPORT OF DISH NETWORK L.L.C.S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NO INFRINGEMENT OF U.S. PATENT NO. 10,028,026; EXHIBITS 1-G; PROPOSED ORDER by DISH Network, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Errata E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Proposed Order)(Caridis, Alyssa) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
August 19, 2021 Filing 118 Sealed Motion DISH NETWORK L.L.C.S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NO INFRINGEMENT OF U.S. PATENT NO. 10,028,026 by DISH Network, L.L.C. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B, #2 Errata C, #3 Exhibit D, #4 Exhibit E, #5 Exhibit F, #6 Exhibit G) (Caridis, Alyssa) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
August 19, 2021 Filing 117 AFFIDAVIT in Support of #114 Sealed Motion DISH NETWORK L.L.C.S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGEMENT THAT U.S. PATENT NO. 10,026,026 IS NOT ENTITLED TO A 2004 PRIORITY DATE by DISH Network, L.L.C. DECLARATION OF ALYSSA CARIDIS DISH NETWORK L.L.C.S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGEMENT THAT U.S. PATENT NO. 10,026,026 IS NOT ENTITLED TO A 2004 PRIORITY DATE; EXHIBITS 1-9; PROPOSED ORDER by DISH Network, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Proposed Order)(Caridis, Alyssa) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
August 19, 2021 Filing 116 AFFIDAVIT in Support of #115 Sealed Motion DISH Network L.L.C.s Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity Under 35 U.S.C. 101 by DISH Network, L.L.C. by DISH Network, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Proposed Order)(Roberts, Clement) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
August 19, 2021 Filing 115 Sealed Motion DISH Network L.L.C.s Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity Under 35 U.S.C. 101 by DISH Network, L.L.C. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit E, #2 Exhibit F, #3 Exhibit H, #4 Exhibit I) (Roberts, Clement) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
August 19, 2021 Filing 114 Sealed Motion DISH NETWORK L.L.C.S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGEMENT THAT U.S. PATENT NO. 10,026,026 IS NOT ENTITLED TO A 2004 PRIORITY DATE by DISH Network, L.L.C. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 4, #2 Exhibit 6) (Caridis, Alyssa) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
August 19, 2021 Filing 113 AFFIDAVIT in Support of #112 Sealed Motion Dish Network L.L.C.'s Daubert Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony of Mr. Roy Weinstein by DISH Network, L.L.C. by DISH Network, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Proposed Order)(Roberts, Clement) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
August 19, 2021 Filing 112 Sealed Motion Dish Network L.L.C.'s Daubert Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony of Mr. Roy Weinstein by DISH Network, L.L.C. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2, #2 Exhibit 4, #3 Exhibit 5, #4 Exhibit 6, #5 Exhibit 7, #6 Exhibit 8, #7 Exhibit 9) (Roberts, Clement) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
August 19, 2021 Filing 111 AFFIDAVIT in Support of #110 Sealed Motion DISH NETWORK, L.L.C.'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT THAT BROADBAND ITV'S DOCTRINE OF EQUIVALENTS INFRINGEMENT THEORY IS BARRED BY PROSECUTION HISTORY ESTOPPEL by DISH Network, L.L.C. DECLARATION OF ALYSSA CARIDIS IN SUPPORT OF DISH NETWORK, L.L.C.'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT THAT BROADBAND ITV'S DOCTRINE OF EQUIVALENTS INFRINGEMENT THEORY IS BARRED BY PROSECUTION HISTORY ESTOPPEL; EXHIBIT 1-15; PROPOSED ORDER by DISH Network, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Proposed Order)(Caridis, Alyssa) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
August 19, 2021 Filing 110 Sealed Motion DISH NETWORK, L.L.C.'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT THAT BROADBAND ITV'S DOCTRINE OF EQUIVALENTS INFRINGEMENT THEORY IS BARRED BY PROSECUTION HISTORY ESTOPPEL by DISH Network, L.L.C. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 10, #2 Exhibit 11, #3 Exhibit 12, #4 Exhibit 13) (Caridis, Alyssa) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #109 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Kent Patrick Herman for DISH Network, L.L.C. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jc5) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
August 17, 2021 Filing 109 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John P. Palmer ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15126877) by on behalf of DISH Network, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Palmer, John) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION FOR PARTIAL DISMISSAL OF CERTAIN CLAIMS #105 Stipulation filed by DISH Network, L.L.C.. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (ir) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER APPOINTING TECHNICAL ADVISOR. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (jc5) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
August 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 106 COPY OF ORDER filed in United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit denying #2 Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed by DISH Network L.L.C. Concurrence filed by Circuit Judge Reyna. (Per Curiam). The district court will expeditiously reconsider this matter before resolving substantive issues in the case. Any new petition for mandamus from the district courts ruling on reconsideration will be considered on its own merit. (mc5) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
August 12, 2021 Filing 105 STIPULATION On Joint Motion to Dismiss Certain Claims by DISH Network, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on Partial Dismissal)(Palmer, John) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #103 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Margaret Abernathy for DISH Network, L.L.C.. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jc5) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #104 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Bas De Blank for DISH Network, L.L.C.. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jc5) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
July 28, 2021 Filing 104 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John P. Palmer ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15057919) by on behalf of DISH Network, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Palmer, John) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
July 28, 2021 Filing 103 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John P. Palmer ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15057874) by on behalf of DISH Network, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Palmer, John) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 102 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER:Dispositive and Daubert Motions due by 8/19/2021. Jury Selection set for 11/15/2021 before Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. Jury Trial set for 11/15/2021 before Judge Alan D Albright. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (ir) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #92 Motion to Withdraw entered by Judge Alan D Albright. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Withdraw Opposition to Plaintiff Broadband ITV, Inc.'s Motion to Amend Infringement Contentions (Dkt. No. 89) is GRANTED and Docket Number 89 is WITHDRAWN. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (re) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
July 4, 2021 Filing 101 Transcript filed of Proceedings held on 6-23-21, Proceedings Transcribed: Discovery Hearing (Zoom). Court Reporter/Transcriber: Kristie Davis, Telephone number: 254-340-6114. Parties are notified of their duty to review the transcript to ensure compliance with the FRCP 5.2(a)/FRCrP 49.1(a). A copy may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. If redaction is necessary, a Notice of Redaction Request must be filed within 21 days. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made available via PACER without redaction after 90 calendar days. The clerk will mail a copy of this notice to parties not electronically noticed Redaction Request due 7/26/2021, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/4/2021, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/4/2021, (kd) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
June 23, 2021 Filing 100 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Alan D Albright: Discovery Hearing held on 6/23/2021. Case called for Discovery Hearing for this and companion case. At issue was the defendant's problem with two depositions given by Mr. Macedo and Mr. Diaz. After listening to argument from both sides, the Court determined that the depositions should be rescheduled for a second try. One of the witnesses who is the investor of the patent shall be at the trial but the other witness is a lawyer, and may not be at the trial. (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.) (Court Reporter Kristie Davis.)(bw) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER RESETTING Zoom Discovery for 6/23/2021 03:00 PM before Judge Alan D Albright. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (bot3) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER Setting Zoom Discovery for 6/22/2021 10:30 AM before Judge Alan D Albright. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (bot1) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 97 Standing Order regarding Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
June 16, 2021 Filing 96 Transcript filed of Proceedings held on June 4, 2021, Proceedings Transcribed: Videoconference Discovery Hearing. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Lily I. Reznik, Telephone number: 512-391-8792 or Lily_Reznik@txwd.uscourts.gov. Parties are notified of their duty to review the transcript to ensure compliance with the FRCP 5.2(a)/FRCrP 49.1(a). A copy may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. If redaction is necessary, a Notice of Redaction Request must be filed within 21 days. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made available via PACER without redaction after 90 calendar days. The clerk will mail a copy of this notice to parties not electronically noticed Redaction Request due 7/7/2021, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/19/2021, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/14/2021, (lr) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
June 11, 2021 Filing 95 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Joint Motion to Amend Certain Scheduling Order Deadlines by BROADBAND iTV, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kramer, Robert) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
June 4, 2021 Filing 94 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Alan D Albright. Discovery Hearing held on 6/4/2021. Case called for Discovery Hearing by Aoom. Parties announce ready. Defts explain issue with getting complete or even ANY answers from the plaintiffs party. Defts give the court several examples of answers or failure to answer have taken place this morning during deposition (via the quick transcript). Court inquires from Plts counsel what is going on. Court then explains to the Pltfs that he will not direct the respondent to answer in any particular way but informs the Pltf that if the defts come back to the court with a transcript of the deposition and it contains responses such as have already been presented to the court, that the court will DIRECT that another deposition will take place in Waco, most likely in the courthouse, where the judge can come in periodically and ensure that the deposition is proceeding properly. No other issues remain. Hearing Concluded. (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.) (Court Reporter Lily Reznik.)(bw) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
June 3, 2021 Filing 93 Redacted Copy of Reply in Support of Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions of #90 Sealed Document, by BROADBAND iTV, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Robert F. Kramer, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit D)(Kramer, Robert) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
June 3, 2021 Filing 92 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw 89 Response in Opposition to Motion,, by DISH Network, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Palmer, John) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
June 2, 2021 Filing 91 STIPULATION by DISH Network, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Palmer, John) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
May 28, 2021 Filing 90 Sealed Document: Reply in Support of Motion to Amend Infringement Contentions of #84 Sealed Motion to Amend Infringement Contentions by BROADBAND iTV, INC. by BROADBAND iTV, INC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Robert F. Kramer, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D) (Kramer, Robert) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
May 21, 2021 Filing 88 Sealed Document: DEFENDANT DISH NETWORK L.L.C.S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF BROADBAND ITV, INC.S MOTION TO AMEND INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS of #84 Sealed Motion to Amend Infringement Contentions by BROADBAND iTV, INC. by DISH Network, L.L.C. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8) (Caridis, Alyssa) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #85 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Parth Sagdeo for DISH Network, L.L.C. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ab4) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #86 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Lillian J Mao for DISH Network, L.L.C. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ab4) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
May 19, 2021 Filing 87 Redacted Copy of #84 Sealed Motion to Amend Infringement Contentions by BROADBAND iTV, INC. by BROADBAND iTV, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Robert F. Kramer, #2 Exhibit 5, #3 Exhibit 7, #4 Exhibit 9, #5 Exhibit 11, #6 Exhibit 13, #7 Exhibit 14, #8 Proposed Order)(Kramer, Robert) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
May 19, 2021 Filing 86 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John P. Palmer ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14821091) by on behalf of DISH Network, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Palmer, John) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
May 19, 2021 Filing 85 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John P. Palmer ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14821058) by on behalf of DISH Network, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Palmer, John) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
May 14, 2021 Filing 84 Sealed Motion to Amend Infringement Contentions by BROADBAND iTV, INC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Robert F. Kramer, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Proposed Order) (Kramer, Robert) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
April 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ***VACATED by #190 *** ORDER DENYING #37 Motion to Transfer Case. The Court DENIES DISHs Motion to Transfer to the District of Colorado. The Court also DENIES WITHOUT PREDJUDICE DISHs alternative Motion to Transfer to the Austin Division of the Western District of Texas. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (bw) Modified on 10/21/2021 (lad). [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
April 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #82 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Sven Raz for BROADBAND iTV, INC. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mm6) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
April 8, 2021 Filing 82 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Andrea L. Fair on Behalf of Sven Raz ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14676349) by on behalf of BROADBAND iTV, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Fair, Andrea) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order MOOTING #35 Motion to Transfer Case entered by Judge Alan D Albright. This Motion is declared MOOT since Defendant filed corrected Motion to Transfer. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ep4) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #66 Motion to Withdraw entered by Judge Alan D Albright. After considering the motion, the Court finds that the Motion is GRANTED. The Clerk is ordered to strike ECF Nos. 58 and 63 from the docket. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (re) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
March 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #81 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney David A. Makman for BROADBAND iTV, INC. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mm6) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
March 1, 2021 Filing 81 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jack Wesley Hill on behalf of D. Makman ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14538207) by on behalf of BROADBAND iTV, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hill, Jack) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 80 Standing Order Regarding Filing Documents Under Seal and Redacted Pleadings in Patent Cases. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. as of 2/12/2021. (bot1) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
February 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #79 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Ryan Dooley for BROADBAND iTV, INC. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mm6) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
February 1, 2021 Filing 79 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jack Wesley Hill on Behalf of Ryan Dooley ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14436984) by on behalf of BROADBAND iTV, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hill, Jack) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
December 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 78 AMENDED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (bw) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
December 24, 2020 Filing 77 Joint MOTION for Amended Protective Order by BROADBAND iTV, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Amended Protective Order)(Armstrong, Jeremiah) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
December 15, 2020 Filing 76 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Lawrence Gordon McDonough on behalf of BROADBAND iTV, INC. (McDonough, Lawrence) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #75 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Andrew Hamill for BROADBAND iTV, INC. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mm6) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
December 14, 2020 Filing 75 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jack Wesley Hill on Behalf of Andrew Hamill ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14281824) by on behalf of BROADBAND iTV, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hill, Jack) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 74 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION ORDER. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (am) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
November 28, 2020 Filing 73 Transcript filed of Proceedings held on November 13, 2020, Proceedings Transcribed: Videoconference Markman Hearing. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Lily I. Reznik, Telephone number: 512-391-8792 or Lily_Reznik@txwd.uscourts.gov. Parties are notified of their duty to review the transcript to ensure compliance with the FRCP 5.2(a)/FRCrP 49.1(a). A copy may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. If redaction is necessary, a Notice of Redaction Request must be filed within 21 days. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made available via PACER without redaction after 90 calendar days. The clerk will mail a copy of this notice to parties not electronically noticed Redaction Request due 12/21/2020, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/29/2020, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/26/2021, (lr) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
November 13, 2020 Filing 72 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Alan D Albright: Markman Hearing held on 11/13/2020. Case called for Markman Hearing for this and companion case. There were six claim terms addressed in the Markman Hearing. The Court heard argument regarding each and made a ruling. There will be an Order issued within a month. The stay is lifted and discovery can now start in this case. The Court confirmed that the Jury Trial date is November 15, 2021. (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter Lily Reznik.)(lad) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER RESETTING MARKMAN HEARING by Zoom for 11/13/2020 09:00 AM before Judge Alan D Albright. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (lad) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #70 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (hs) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
November 10, 2020 Filing 70 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John P. Palmer ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14169983) by on behalf of DISH Network, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Palmer, John) (Main Document 70 replaced on 11/10/2020) (am).[Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
November 5, 2020 Filing 69 NOTICE of Filing Joint Claim Construction Statement by BROADBAND iTV, INC. (Kramer, Robert) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
October 29, 2020 Filing 68 BRIEF by DISH Network, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 37, #2 Exhibit 38, #3 Exhibit 39)(Roberts, Clement) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
October 29, 2020 Filing 67 BRIEF by BROADBAND iTV, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Jeremiah Armstrong, #2 Exhibit 37, #3 Exhibit 38, #4 Exhibit 39)(Kramer, Robert) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
October 9, 2020 Filing 66 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw 63 Brief, 58 Brief,,,,, Claim Construction Briefs by BROADBAND iTV, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Fair, Andrea) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
October 8, 2020 Filing 65 Corrected BRIEF by BROADBAND iTV, INC. (correcting an error in 63 ). (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Jeremiah Armstrong, #2 Exhibit 31, #3 Exhibit 32, #4 Exhibit 33, #5 Exhibit 34, #6 Exhibit 35, #7 Exhibit 36)(Kramer, Robert) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
October 8, 2020 Filing 64 BRIEF by DISH Network, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 24, #2 Exhibit 25, #3 Exhibit 26, #4 Exhibit 27, #5 Exhibit 28, #6 Exhibit 29, #7 Exhibit 30, #8 Exhibit 31, #9 Exhibit 32, #10 Exhibit 33, #11 Exhibit 34, #12 Exhibit 35, #13 Exhibit 36)(Roberts, Clement) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #60 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Russell S. Tonkovich for BROADBAND iTV, INC. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (sm3) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #61 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Aidan Brewster for BROADBAND iTV, INC.. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (sm3) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
September 18, 2020 Filing 62 BRIEF by BROADBAND iTV, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21, #23 Exhibit 22, #24 Exhibit 23, #25 Exhibit 24, #26 Exhibit 25, #27 Exhibit 26, #28 Exhibit 27, #29 Exhibit 28, #30 Exhibit 29, #31 Exhibit 30, #32 Proposed Order)(Fair, Andrea) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
September 18, 2020 Filing 61 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jack Wesley Hill on behalf of Aidan Brewster ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-13982645) by on behalf of BROADBAND iTV, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hill, Jack) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
September 15, 2020 Filing 60 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jack Wesley Hill on Behalf of Russell S. Tonkovich ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-13966623) by on behalf of BROADBAND iTV, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hill, Jack) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
September 11, 2020 Filing 59 Pro Hac Vice Letter to Russell S. Tonkovich for BROADBAND iTV, INC.. (am) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
September 10, 2020 Filing 57 Transcript filed of Proceedings held on 6-25-20, Proceedings Transcribed: Telephonic Discovery Hearing. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Kristie Davis, Telephone number: 254-340-6114. Parties are notified of their duty to review the transcript to ensure compliance with the FRCP 5.2(a)/FRCrP 49.1(a). A copy may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. If redaction is necessary, a Notice of Redaction Request must be filed within 21 days. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made available via PACER without redaction after 90 calendar days. The clerk will mail a copy of this notice to parties not electronically noticed Redaction Request due 10/1/2020, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/12/2020, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/9/2020, (kd) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
September 10, 2020 Filing 56 BRIEF by DISH Network, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23)(Roberts, Clement) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
September 9, 2020 Filing 55 Transcript filed of Proceedings held on August 31, 2020, Proceedings Transcribed: Telephonic Discovery Hearing. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Lily I. Reznik, Telephone number: 512-391-8792 or Lily_Reznik@txwd.uscourts.gov. Parties are notified of their duty to review the transcript to ensure compliance with the FRCP 5.2(a)/FRCrP 49.1(a). A copy may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. If redaction is necessary, a Notice of Redaction Request must be filed within 21 days. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made available via PACER without redaction after 90 calendar days. The clerk will mail a copy of this notice to parties not electronically noticed Redaction Request due 9/30/2020, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/12/2020, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/8/2020, (lr) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
August 31, 2020 Filing 54 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Alan D Albright: Discovery Hearing held on 8/31/2020. Case called for telephonic discovery hearing. An issue is the number of claims -- after hearing argument, the court will not reduce claim terms. It is possible that there may be a second Markman to handle all of the terms however it will not effect the jury trial date. The Court is assigning a trial date of November 15, 2021. (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter Lily Reznik.)(am) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER SETTING TELEPHONIC CONFERENCE, Telephone Conference set for 8/31/2020 03:30 PM before Judge Alan D Albright. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (am) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
August 10, 2020 Filing 52 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by DISH Network, L.L.C..(Palmer, John) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
August 7, 2020 Filing 51 NOTICE of Inter Partes Review Petitions by BROADBAND iTV, INC. (Kramer, Robert) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
July 29, 2020 Filing 50 ATTACHMENT (Page 3) to #49 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jack Wesley Hill on Behalf of Robert Y. Xie ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-13806277) by BROADBAND iTV, INC.. (Hill, Jack) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
July 29, 2020 Filing 49 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jack Wesley Hill on Behalf of Robert Y. Xie ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-13806277) by on behalf of BROADBAND iTV, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hill, Jack) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #49 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Robert Y. Xie for BROADBAND iTV, INC. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (sm3) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
July 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order DENYING #17 Motion to Dismiss entered by Judge Alan D Albright. In light of the Court's order in Slyce Acquisition Inc. v. Syte Visual Conception Ltd., No. 6:19-cv-257-ADA, 2020 WL 278481 (W.D. Tex. Jan. 10, 2020), the Court does not believe this is one of the rare cases where it is appropriate to resolve the Section 101 eligibility of the patents-in-suit as a Rule 12(b) motion to dismiss. It is therefore ORDERED that Defendants' motion is denied WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Defendants may refile their motion after the opening of fact discovery. Should Defendants elect to refile their motion at that time, the Court orders Defendants to brief the patent ineligibility of each asserted claim, i.e., not just representative claims. The Court will grant any reasonable request to extend the page limits for such a motion.To be clear, the Court takes no position on whether claim construction is necessary for any of the asserted claims. See MyMail, Ltd. v. ooVoo, LLC, 934 F.3d 1373, 1379 (Fed. Cir. 2019). Furthermore, the Court takes no position on whether there are any factual disputes that preclude dismissal at the pleadings stage. See Aatrix Software, Inc. v. Green Shades Software, Inc., 882 F.3 d 1121, 1128-30 (Fed. Cir. 2018). (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
July 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 48 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (lad) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
July 2, 2020 Filing 47 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by BROADBAND iTV, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Confidentiality and Protective Order)(Armstrong, Jeremiah) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
June 25, 2020 Filing 46 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Alan D Albright: Telephone Conference held on 6/25/2020. Case called for telephonic discovery hearing. The issue from the plaintiff is the scope of the prosecution bar. The Court is basically okay with what the plaintiff is proposing however he would like the parties to get together and see if they can reach any small changes that are agreed. If so they can submit the new proposal - if not each can submit to the law clerk and have another hearing for the Court to decide. (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter Kristie Davis.)(am) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER SETTING TELEPHONIC DISCOVERY HEARING, Telephone Conference set for 6/25/2020 10:00 AM before Judge Alan D Albright. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (am) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #44 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document entered by Judge Alan D Albright. Before the Court is DISH's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal a Declaration in Support of its Reply Motion to Transfer to the District of Colorado. The Court GRANTS the motion. The Clerk's Office is directed to file Exhibit A attached hereto under seal. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
May 28, 2020 Filing 44 Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: #1 Sealed Document Declaration, #2 Proposed Order) (Palmer, John) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
May 28, 2020 Filing 43 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by DISH Network, L.L.C., re #39 Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document filed by Plaintiff BROADBAND iTV, INC. DISH'S REPLY ISO MOTION TO TRANSFER (Palmer, John) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/1/2020: #1 Declaration in Support) (lad). [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
May 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #39 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document entered by Judge Alan D Albright. Before the Court is Plaintiff Broadband iTV, Inc.'s Unopposed Motion to for Leave to File Under Seal BBiTV's Opposition to Defendant DISH Network, L.L.C's Motion to Transfer. The Court GRANTS the motion. The Clerk's Office is directed to file Plaintiff's opposition under seal. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
May 22, 2020 Filing 41 NOTICE of Corrected Exhibit 15 to Armstrong Declaration in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion to Transfer by BROADBAND iTV, INC. re #40 Affidavit in Support,, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Corrected Exhibit 15)(Armstrong, Jeremiah) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
May 21, 2020 Filing 40 AFFIDAVIT in Support of #39 Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Declaration of Jeremiah A. Armstrong in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Dish Network, L.L.C.'s Motion to Transfer) by BROADBAND iTV, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24)(Kramer, Robert) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
May 21, 2020 Filing 39 Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: #1 Sealed Document Ex A - Opposition to Motion to Transfer, #2 Proposed Order) (Kramer, Robert) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
May 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #36 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document entered by Judge Alan D Albright. Before the Court is DISH's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal a Declaration in Support of Motion to Transfer to the District of Colorado. The Court GRANTS the motion. The Clerk's Office is directed to file the declaration attached to this motion under seal. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
May 7, 2020 Filing 37 CORRECTED MOTION to Transfer Case by DISH Network, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Proposed Order)(Palmer, John) Modified on 10/21/2021 pursuant to #190 (lad). [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
May 7, 2020 Filing 36 Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: #1 Sealed Document Exhibit A Declaration, #2 Proposed Order) (Palmer, John) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
May 7, 2020 Filing 35 MOTION to Transfer Case by DISH Network, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Proposed Order)(Palmer, John) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
April 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 SCHEDULING ORDER: Markman Hearing set for 11/13/2020 09:00 AM before Judge Alan D Albright. Joinder of Parties due by 12/28/2020. Amended Pleadings due by 2/4/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 8/19/2021. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (bw) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
April 9, 2020 Filing 33 Agreed MOTION for Scheduling Order by BROADBAND iTV, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Scheduling Order)(Armstrong, Jeremiah) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
April 6, 2020 Filing 32 RESPONSE in Support, filed by DISH Network, L.L.C., re #17 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendant DISH Network, L.L.C. (Palmer, John) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
April 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER GRANTING AGREED MOTION TO MODIFY SCHEDULING ORDER, Markman Hearing set for 11/13/2020 09:00 AM before Judge Alan D Albright. Motions terminated: #30 MOTION to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines filed by DISH Network, L.L.C.. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (am) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
April 2, 2020 Filing 30 MOTION to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines by DISH Network, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Palmer, John) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
March 31, 2020 Filing 29 Transcript filed of Proceedings held on 3-26-2020, Proceedings Transcribed: Telephonic Scheduling Conference. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Kristie Davis, Telephone number: 254-340-6114. Parties are notified of their duty to review the transcript to ensure compliance with the FRCP 5.2(a)/FRCrP 49.1(a). A copy may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. If redaction is necessary, a Notice of Redaction Request must be filed within 21 days. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made available via PACER without redaction after 90 calendar days. The clerk will mail a copy of this notice to parties not electronically noticed Redaction Request due 4/21/2020, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/1/2020, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/29/2020, (kd) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
March 30, 2020 Filing 28 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by BROADBAND iTV, INC., re #17 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendant DISH Network, L.L.C. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Hong Lin, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J)(Kramer, Robert) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
March 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER SETTING MARKMAN HEARING, Markman Hearing set for 10/16/2020 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, on the Sixth Floor, United States Courthouse, 501 West Fifth Street, Austin, TX, before Judge Alan D Albright. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (am) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
March 26, 2020 Filing 26 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Alan D Albright: Case called for telephonic scheduling conference. Parties have an agreed Markman Hearing date of 10/16/20 at 9:00 a.m. Parties discussed motions to transfer - some to Austin and some to Colorado. There was also discussion regarding the consolidation. The parties also discussed their current issues with the Court. The Court discussed his normal Markman Hearing procedures. (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter Kristie Davis.)(am) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
March 24, 2020 Filing 25 STANDING ORDER from U.S. District Judge Alan D. Albright regarding scheduled civil hearings. (tada) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
March 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER SETTING MARKMAN HEARING. Markman Hearing set for 10/16/2020 09:00 AM in Austin before Judge Alan D Albright. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (bw) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
February 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #20 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
February 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #21 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
February 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #22 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply entered by Judge Alan D Albright. Before the Court is Plaintiff Broadband iTV, Inc.'s unopposed motion to extend the time for BBiTV to file its Opposition to Defendant DISH Network, L.L.C.'s Motion to Dismiss. The Court GRANTS the motion. It is therefore ORDERED that BBiTV's Opposition to DISH's Motion to Dismiss is hereby due March 30, 2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
February 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER GOVERNING PROCEEDINGS PATENT CASE. Case is SET for a telephonic Rule 16 Case Management Conference on Thursday, March 26, 2020 at 3:30 p.m. before Judge Alan D Albright. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (bw) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
February 26, 2020 Filing 22 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply To Defendant's Motion to Dismiss [Dkt. 17] by BROADBAND iTV, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Armstrong, Jeremiah) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
February 26, 2020 Filing 21 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John P. Palmer ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-13258319) by on behalf of DISH Network, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Palmer, John) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
February 26, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John P. Palmer ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-13258213) by on behalf of DISH Network, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Palmer, John) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
February 25, 2020 Filing 19 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by DISH Network, L.L.C.. (Palmer, John) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
February 24, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Readiness for Initial Case Management Conference by BROADBAND iTV, INC. (Armstrong, Jeremiah) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
February 24, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss by DISH Network, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Palmer, John) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
January 10, 2020 Reset Answer Deadlines: DISH Network, L.L.C. answer due 2/24/2020. (bw) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #16 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Alan D Albright. Came on for consideration is Defendant's Motion. Noting that it is unopposed, the Court GRANTS the Motion. Defendant shall have up to and including February 24, 2020 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
January 9, 2020 Filing 16 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by DISH Network, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Palmer, John) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
January 8, 2020 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by BROADBAND iTV, INC.. DISH Network, L.L.C. served on 12/19/2019, answer due 1/9/2020. (Henry, Claire) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
January 7, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Claire Abernathy Henry on behalf of BROADBAND iTV, INC.. Attorney Claire Abernathy Henry added to party BROADBAND iTV, INC.(pty:pla) (Henry, Claire) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall apply for admission to the bar of this court in compliance with Local Rule AT-1(f)(1). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall apply for admission to the bar of this court in compliance with Local Rule AT-1(f)(1). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall apply for admission to the bar of this court in compliance with Local Rule AT-1(f)(1). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall apply for admission to the bar of this court in compliance with Local Rule AT-1(f)(1). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall apply for admission to the bar of this court in compliance with Local Rule AT-1(f)(1). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall apply for admission to the bar of this court in compliance with Local Rule AT-1(f)(1). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall apply for admission to the bar of this court in compliance with Local Rule AT-1(f)(1). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
December 19, 2019 Filing 13 Summons Issued as to DISH Network, L.L.C.. (bw) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
December 19, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jack Wesley Hill On Behalf of Sal Lim ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12989484) by on behalf of BROADBAND iTV, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hill, Jack) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
December 19, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jack Wesley Hill On Behalf of Robert F. Kramer ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12989475) by on behalf of BROADBAND iTV, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hill, Jack) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
December 19, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jack Wesley Hill On Behalf of Hong Lin ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12989462) by on behalf of BROADBAND iTV, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hill, Jack) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
December 19, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jack Wesley Hill on Behalf of Margaret Elizabeth Day ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12989454) by on behalf of BROADBAND iTV, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hill, Jack) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
December 19, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jack Wesley Hill on Behalf of Marc Belloli ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12989449) by on behalf of BROADBAND iTV, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hill, Jack) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
December 19, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jack Wesley Hill on Behalf of Jeremiah A. Armstrong ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12989439) by on behalf of BROADBAND iTV, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hill, Jack) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
December 19, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jack Wesley Hill on Behalf of David Alberti ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12989415) by on behalf of BROADBAND iTV, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hill, Jack) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
December 19, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrea L. Fair on behalf of BROADBAND iTV, INC.. Attorney Andrea L. Fair added to party BROADBAND iTV, INC.(pty:pla) (Fair, Andrea) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
December 19, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by BROADBAND iTV, INC.. (Hill, Jack) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
December 19, 2019 Filing 3 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by BROADBAND iTV, INC.. (Hill, Jack) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
December 19, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Hill, Jack) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
December 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DISH Network, L.L.C. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-12988675), filed by BROADBAND iTV, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A-Patent No. '026, #3 Exhibit B-Patent No. '269, #4 Exhibit C-Patent No. '791, #5 Exhibit D-Patent No. ' 388, #6 Exhibit E-User Guide, #7 Exhibit F-VOD, #8 Exhibit G-VOD Overview)(Hill, Jack) (Main Document 1 replaced on 12/19/2019 to add file mark to page 1) (bw). [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]
December 19, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (bw) [Transferred from Texas Western on 10/25/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Broadband iTV, Inc. v. Dish Network, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Broadband iTV, Inc.
Represented By: M. Elizabeth Day
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dish Network Llc
Represented By: Alyssa M. Caridis
Represented By: Clement S. Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darryl J. Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?