Johnson v. Boyd et al
Plaintiff: Jabari J. Johnson
Defendant: Kathleen Boyd, Richard Xlodge, Thomas LIttle and Donald Nunez
Case Number: 1:2021cv02886
Filed: October 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 27, 2021 Filing 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry. (jsalz, )
October 27, 2021 Filing 4 Case transferred in from District of Maryland; Case Number 1:21-cv-02473. File, transfer order and docket sheet received
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER transferring this case to the United States District Court for the District of Colorado for all further proceedings as may be deemed appropriate by that Court. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 10/27/2021. (c/m 10/27/2021 jj2, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 10/27/2021.]
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 9/29/2021. (c/m 9/29/2021 - dg3s, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 10/27/2021.]
September 28, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kathleen Boyd, Thomas Little, Donald Nunez, Richard Xlodge, filed by Jabari J. Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jj2, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 10/27/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Boyd et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jabari J. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathleen Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Xlodge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas LIttle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Nunez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?