PopSockets LLC v. Flygrip, Inc.
Plaintiff: PopSockets LLC
Defendant: Flygrip, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv02900
Filed: October 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Scott T Varholak
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 24, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION to Stay pending Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. 11) by Defendant Flygrip, Inc.. (Katz, Robert)
December 23, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the alternative, to Transfer by Defendant Flygrip, Inc.. (Katz, Robert)
November 16, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by PopSockets LLC. Flygrip, Inc. served on 11/2/2021, answer due 12/23/2021. (Sayres, Joel)
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond until 12/23/2021, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 11/12/2021. Text Only Entry(stvlc1, )
November 12, 2021 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Katz, Robert)
November 12, 2021 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint,, by Defendant Flygrip, Inc.. (Katz, Robert)
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER SETTING DEADLINE FOR FILING ELECTION CONCERNING CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO MAGISTRATE JURISDICTION FORM AND SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 29 October 2021. Consent Form due by 1/4/2022. Proposed Scheduling Order due 1/11/2022. Scheduling Conference set for 1/18/2022 09:45 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. (cmadr, )
October 28, 2021 Filing 5 Report re Patent/Trademark: Report on the filing of an action emailed (NEF) to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (cpomm, )
October 28, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (cpomm, )
October 28, 2021 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Text Only Entry (cpomm, )
October 28, 2021 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Sayres, Joel)
October 28, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment of Non-Infringement of U.S. Patent Nos. 8,844,098, 10,406,671, 10,800,024, and 10,953,535 against Flygrip, Inc. (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number ACODC-8150935)Attorney Joel David Sayres added to party PopSockets LLC(pty:pla), filed by PopSockets LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Civil Cover Sheet, #14 Summons)(Sayres, Joel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PopSockets LLC v. Flygrip, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PopSockets LLC
Represented By: Joel David Sayres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flygrip, Inc.
Represented By: Robert David Katz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?