Marez et al v. Polis et al
Plaintiff: JOHN DOE, JANE DOE, DEMETRIUS MAREZ, CHASE AUBREY ROUBIDEAUX, WAYNE SMITH, JR, NATIVE AMERICAN GUARDIAN'S ASSOCIATION, Donald Wayne Smith, Jr. and Native American Guardian's Association, The
Defendant: Jared Polis, Dave Young, Katy Anthes, Phil Weiser, Kathryn Redhorse and Georgina Owen
Case Number: 1:2021cv02941
Filed: November 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Regina M Rodriguez
Referring Judge: Nina Y Wang
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2021 Filing 33 LETTER TO USCA and all counsel certifying the record is complete as to #25 Notice of Appeal, filed by Donald Wayne Smith, Jr., Demetrius Marez, Chase Aubrey Roubideaux, Native American Guardian's Association, The. A transcript order form was filed stating that a transcript is not necessary. ( Appeal No. 21-1421) Text Only Entry (angar, )
December 20, 2021 Filing 32 TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM by Plaintiffs Demetrius Marez, Native American Guardian's Association, The, Chase Aubrey Roubideaux, Donald Wayne Smith, Jr. Transcript is not necessary re #25 Notice of Appeal,. (angar, )
December 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER SETTING RULE 16(b) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 12/13/2021. Proposed Scheduling Order due 1/20/2022. Scheduling Conference set for 1/27/2022 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang, via telephone conference. All participants shall use the following dial-in information: 888-363-4749, Access Code: 5738976#. (alave, )
December 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of Local Civ. R. 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions, and (5) pursuant to Local Civ. R. 16.6 and at the discretion of the Magistrate Judge, convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. SO ORDERED by Judge Regina M Rodriguez on 12/8/2021. Text Only Entry (rmrja)
December 7, 2021 Filing 29 USCA Case Number 21-1421 for #25 Notice of Appeal, filed by Donald Wayne Smith, Jr., Demetrius Marez, Chase Aubrey Roubideaux, Native American Guardian's Association, The. (angar, )
December 3, 2021 Filing 28 LETTER Transmitting Notice of Appeal to all counsel advising of the transmittal of the #25 Notice of Appeal, filed by Donald Wayne Smith, Jr., Demetrius Marez, Chase Aubrey Roubideaux, Native American Guardian's Association, The to the U.S. Court of Appeals. ( Retained Counsel, Fee paid,) (Attachments: #1 Preliminary Record and Docket Sheet)(angar, )
December 2, 2021 Filing 27 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Scott D. Jones on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Scott D. Jones added to party Demetrius Marez(pty:pla), Attorney Scott D. Jones added to party Native American Guardian's Association, The(pty:pla), Attorney Scott D. Jones added to party Chase Aubrey Roubideaux(pty:pla), Attorney Scott D. Jones added to party Donald Wayne Smith, Jr(pty:pla) (Jones, Scott)
December 2, 2021 Filing 26 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Scott D. Cousins on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Scott D. Cousins added to party Demetrius Marez(pty:pla), Attorney Scott D. Cousins added to party Native American Guardian's Association, The(pty:pla), Attorney Scott D. Cousins added to party Chase Aubrey Roubideaux(pty:pla), Attorney Scott D. Cousins added to party Donald Wayne Smith, Jr(pty:pla) (Cousins, Scott)
December 2, 2021 Filing 25 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #24 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiffs Demetrius Marez, Native American Guardian's Association, The, Chase Aubrey Roubideaux, Donald Wayne Smith, Jr (Filing fee $ 505, Receipt Number ACODC-8204176) (Trachman, William)
December 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER denying #4 Emergency Motion for Preliminary Injunction. By Judge Regina M Rodriguez on 12/1/2021.(rmrja)
November 30, 2021 Filing 23 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Joseph A. Bingham on behalf of Demetrius Marez, Native American Guardian's Association, The, Chase Aubrey Roubideaux, Donald Wayne Smith, JrAttorney Joseph A. Bingham added to party Demetrius Marez(pty:pla), Attorney Joseph A. Bingham added to party Native American Guardian's Association, The(pty:pla), Attorney Joseph A. Bingham added to party Chase Aubrey Roubideaux(pty:pla), Attorney Joseph A. Bingham added to party Donald Wayne Smith, Jr(pty:pla) (Bingham, Joseph)
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER denying Plaintiffs' request for an expedited oral argument. Pursuant to the Court's 16 November 12, 2021 Order, the Court has reviewed the parties' briefings and DENIES Plaintiffs' request for an expedited oral argument. Upon review of the briefings, the Court finds that oral argument on Plaintiffs' #4 Emergency Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Request for Expedited Hearing is unnecessary. The Court will issue its ruling on the briefings. SO ORDERED by Judge Regina M Rodriguez on 11/29/2021. Text Only Entry (rmrja)
November 26, 2021 Filing 21 REPLY to Response to #4 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Request for Expedited Hearing filed by Plaintiffs Demetrius Marez, Native American Guardian's Association, The, Chase Aubrey Roubideaux, Donald Wayne Smith, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Eunice Davidson Declaration)(Trachman, William)
November 23, 2021 Filing 20 BRIEF in Opposition to #4 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Request for Expedited Hearing filed by Defendants Katy Anthes, Georgina Owen, Jared Polis, Kathryn Redhorse, Phil Weiser, Dave Young. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Kotlarczyk, Michael)
November 15, 2021 Filing 19 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Native American Guardian's Association, The, Demetrius Marez, Chase Aubrey Roubideaux, Donald Wayne Smith, Jr. Georgina Owen waiver sent on 11/10/2021, answer due 1/9/2022. (Erhardt, Erin)
November 15, 2021 Filing 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Native American Guardian's Association, The, Demetrius Marez, Chase Aubrey Roubideaux, Donald Wayne Smith, Jr. Katy Anthes waiver sent on 11/10/2021, answer due 1/9/2022. (Erhardt, Erin)
November 15, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Colleen Ann O'Laughlin on behalf of Katy Anthes, Georgina OwenAttorney Colleen Ann O'Laughlin added to party Katy Anthes(pty:dft), Attorney Colleen Ann O'Laughlin added to party Georgina Owen(pty:dft) (O'Laughlin, Colleen)
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting in part #9 Stipulated Scheduling Proposal. The Court GRANTS the parties' stipulated proposed briefing schedule as follows: Defendants shall file any Response to Plaintiffs' pending #4 Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Tuesday, 11/23/2021. Plaintiffs shall file any Reply to Defendants' Response by Friday, 11/26/2021.The Court TAKES UNDER ADVISEMENT Plaintiffs' opposed request for an expedited oral argument. The Court is currently scheduled for trial the week of 11/29/2021. The Court will determine the need and timing of a hearing once it has had an opportunity to review the briefing. SO ORDERED by Judge Regina M Rodriguez on 11/12/2021. Text Only Entry (rmrja)
November 12, 2021 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Native American Guardian's Association, The, Demetrius Marez, Chase Aubrey Roubideaux, Donald Wayne Smith, Jr. Dave Young waiver sent on 11/10/2021, answer due 1/9/2022. (Erhardt, Erin)
November 12, 2021 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Native American Guardian's Association, The, Demetrius Marez, Chase Aubrey Roubideaux, Donald Wayne Smith, Jr. Kathryn Redhorse waiver sent on 11/10/2021, answer due 1/9/2022. (Erhardt, Erin)
November 12, 2021 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Native American Guardian's Association, The, Demetrius Marez, Chase Aubrey Roubideaux, Donald Wayne Smith, Jr. Phil Weiser waiver sent on 11/10/2021, answer due 1/9/2022. (Erhardt, Erin)
November 12, 2021 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Native American Guardian's Association, The, Demetrius Marez, Chase Aubrey Roubideaux, Donald Wayne Smith, Jr. Jared Polis waiver sent on 11/10/2021, answer due 1/9/2022. (Erhardt, Erin)
November 12, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Julie C. Tolleson on behalf of Katy Anthes, Georgina OwenAttorney Julie C. Tolleson added to party Katy Anthes(pty:dft), Attorney Julie C. Tolleson added to party Georgina Owen(pty:dft) (Tolleson, Julie)
November 12, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Erin Marie Erhardt on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Erhardt, Erin)
November 12, 2021 Filing 9 Proposed Scheduling Order Stipulated Scheduling Proposal by Plaintiffs Demetrius Marez, Native American Guardian's Association, The, Chase Aubrey Roubideaux, Donald Wayne Smith, Jr. (Erhardt, Erin)
November 12, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Michael T. Kotlarczyk on behalf of Jared Polis, Kathryn Redhorse, Phil Weiser, Dave YoungAttorney Michael T. Kotlarczyk added to party Jared Polis(pty:dft), Attorney Michael T. Kotlarczyk added to party Kathryn Redhorse(pty:dft), Attorney Michael T. Kotlarczyk added to party Phil Weiser(pty:dft), Attorney Michael T. Kotlarczyk added to party Dave Young(pty:dft) (Kotlarczyk, Michael)
November 12, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by LeeAnn Morrill on behalf of Jared Polis, Kathryn Redhorse, Phil Weiser, Dave YoungAttorney LeeAnn Morrill added to party Jared Polis(pty:dft), Attorney LeeAnn Morrill added to party Kathryn Redhorse(pty:dft), Attorney LeeAnn Morrill added to party Phil Weiser(pty:dft), Attorney LeeAnn Morrill added to party Dave Young(pty:dft) (Morrill, LeeAnn)
November 8, 2021 Filing 6 CASE REASSIGNED. Pursuant to #5 Minute Order this case is randomly reassigned to Judge Regina M Rodriguez. All future pleadings should be designated as 21-cv-02941-RMR. (Text Only Entry). (alave, )
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 11/08/2021. IT IS ORDERED that: The Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to REDRAW this action to a District Judge for further proceedings. (alave, )
November 5, 2021 Filing 4 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Request for Expedited Hearing by Plaintiffs Demetrius Marez, Native American Guardian's Association, The, Chase Aubrey Roubideaux, Donald Wayne Smith, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Jefferson Declaration, #2 Exhibit 2 - Marez Declaration, #3 Exhibit 3 - DOE, John Declaration, #4 Exhibit 4 - DOE, Jane Declaration, #5 Exhibit 5 - Roubideaux Declaration, #6 Exhibit 6 - Smith Declaration, #7 Exhibit 7 - Davidson Declaration, #8 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Trachman, William)
November 3, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (jsalz, )
November 2, 2021 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Text Only Entry. (jsalz, )
November 2, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number ACODC-8158205)Attorney William Edward Trachman added to party JANE DOE(pty:pla), Attorney William Edward Trachman added to party JOHN DOE(pty:pla), Attorney William Edward Trachman added to party DEMETRIUS MAREZ(pty:pla), Attorney William Edward Trachman added to party NATIVE AMERICAN GUARDIAN'S ASSOCIATION(pty:pla), Attorney William Edward Trachman added to party CHASE AUBREY ROUBIDEAUX(pty:pla), Attorney William Edward Trachman added to party WAYNE SMITH, JR(pty:pla), filed by NATIVE AMERICAN GUARDIAN'S ASSOCIATION, CHASE AUBREY ROUBIDEAUX, JOHN DOE, DEMETRIUS MAREZ, JANE DOE, WAYNE SMITH, JR. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Jared Polis, #3 Summons Dave Young, #4 Summons Katy Anthes, #5 Summons Phil Weiser, #6 Summons Kathryn Redhorse, #7 Summons Georgina Owen)(Trachman, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marez et al v. Polis et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN DOE
Represented By: William Edward Trachman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JANE DOE
Represented By: William Edward Trachman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEMETRIUS MAREZ
Represented By: William Edward Trachman
Represented By: Erin Marie Erhardt
Represented By: Joseph A. Bingham
Represented By: Scott D. Cousins
Represented By: Scott D. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHASE AUBREY ROUBIDEAUX
Represented By: William Edward Trachman
Represented By: Erin Marie Erhardt
Represented By: Joseph A. Bingham
Represented By: Scott D. Cousins
Represented By: Scott D. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WAYNE SMITH, JR
Represented By: William Edward Trachman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NATIVE AMERICAN GUARDIAN'S ASSOCIATION
Represented By: William Edward Trachman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Wayne Smith, Jr.
Represented By: Erin Marie Erhardt
Represented By: Joseph A. Bingham
Represented By: Scott D. Cousins
Represented By: Scott D. Jones
Represented By: William Edward Trachman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Native American Guardian's Association, The
Represented By: Erin Marie Erhardt
Represented By: Joseph A. Bingham
Represented By: Scott D. Cousins
Represented By: Scott D. Jones
Represented By: William Edward Trachman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jared Polis
Represented By: LeeAnn Morrill
Represented By: Michael T. Kotlarczyk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dave Young
Represented By: LeeAnn Morrill
Represented By: Michael T. Kotlarczyk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katy Anthes
Represented By: Colleen Ann O'Laughlin
Represented By: Julie C. Tolleson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phil Weiser
Represented By: LeeAnn Morrill
Represented By: Michael T. Kotlarczyk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathryn Redhorse
Represented By: LeeAnn Morrill
Represented By: Michael T. Kotlarczyk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Georgina Owen
Represented By: Colleen Ann O'Laughlin
Represented By: Julie C. Tolleson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?