McLaughlin v. Hughes et al
Plaintiff: Tracy McLaughlin
Defendant: Gary Hughes, Lori Hughes, Hughes Family Revocable Trust and 777 Club, LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv03026
Filed: November 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Philip A Brimmer
Referring Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 8, 2021 Filing 30 ANSWER to #15 Amended Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Gary Hughes, Lori Hughes, Hughes Family Revocable Trust.(Schindler, Michelle)
December 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #27 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond re #27 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #15 Amended Complaint All Defendants. by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 12/7/21. Text Only Entry(GPG)
December 7, 2021 Filing 28 MEMORANDUM regarding #27 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #15 Amended Complaint filed by Lori Hughes, Gary Hughes, Hughes Family Revocable Trust. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher, by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 12/07/2021. Text Only Entry (pabsec, )
December 6, 2021 Filing 27 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #15 Amended Complaint by Defendants Gary Hughes, Lori Hughes, Hughes Family Revocable Trust. (Schindler, Michelle)
November 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER: Due to the re-assignment, Scheduling Conference which had been set for 2/9/2022 10:15 AM with USMJ Varholak is hereby Vacated and Scheduling Conference is re-set for 2/2/2022 10:00 AM in Room 323 (Grand Junction) before Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Proposed Scheduling Order due one week prior. At the time of the hearing, parties are to call 888-363-4749, Access 3136546#. By Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on November 30, 2021. Text Only Entry (gpgsec, )
November 29, 2021 Filing 25 REASSIGNING MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Pursuant to 24 Order, this action is directly reassigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. All future pleadings should be designated as 21-cv-03026-PAB-GPG.(Text Only Entry) (sphil, )
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 11/29/2021. This matter has its factual nexus in Pitkin County. According to the Court's Revised Jury Plan for Random Jury Selection, this case is therefore properly designated for Jury Division 3. Because the jury will be drawn from that Division, it is appropriate that the case be managed, for pretrial purposes, by Magistrate Judge Gallagher in Grand Junction. Accordingly, pursuant to D.C. Colo. L. Civ. R. 40.1(a), the undersigned directs that the Clerk of the Court reassign this action to Magistrate Judge Gallagher as the referral judge. All further pleadings in this case shall reflect the case number of 21-cv-03026-PAB-GPG. Text Only Entry (pabsec, )
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 29 November 2021. Proposed Scheduling Order due 2/2/2022. Scheduling Conference set for 2/9/2022 10:15 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. (cmadr, )
November 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak for non-dispositive matters. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, and (4) conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding, by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 11/24/2021. Text Only Entry (pabsec, )
November 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER that Plaintiff McLaughlin has failed to demonstrate that it will suffer irreparable harm if an injunction is not issued. Therefore, the Motion for a Preliminary Injunction (Doc. #9 ] is DENIED, by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 11/24/2021.(evana, )
November 23, 2021 Filing 20 MEMORANDUM regarding #9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Tracy McLaughlin. Motion referred to Judge Christine M. Arguello by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 11/23/2021 due to Chief Judge Brimmer's unavailability. Text Only Entry (pabsec)
November 22, 2021 Filing 19 RESPONSE to #9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Attorney Michelle Kramer Schindler added to party Hughes Family Revocable Trust(pty:dft) filed by Defendants Gary Hughes, Lori Hughes, Hughes Family Revocable Trust. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Hughes Declaration in Support of Response to Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - January 26, 2020 Photographs, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - February 26, 2020 Hass Email, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3 - Title Objection letter (743 Cemetery Lane), #5 Exhibit Exhibit 4 - March 6, 2020 Krabacher Email to Hass, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 5 - March 6, 2020 Title Objection Withdrawal)(Schindler, Michelle)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MINUTE ORDER by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 11/19/2021, re: #17 Response to Order to Show Cause filed by Tracy McLaughlin. ORDERED that the Order to Show Cause [Docket No. 14] is hereby DISCHARGED. ORDERED that, on or before November 22, 2021 defendant Hughes FamilyRevocable Trust shall file a response to plaintiffs motion seeking a preliminary injunction. (sphil, )
November 18, 2021 Filing 17 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #14 by Plaintiff Tracy McLaughlin. (Seo, Byeongsook)
November 18, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Filing Amended Pleading re #15 Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Tracy McLaughlin (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Notice of Amended Pleading)(Seo, Byeongsook)
November 18, 2021 Filing 15 AMENDED COMPLAINT against 777 Club, LLC, Gary Hughes, Lori Hughes, Hughes Family Revocable Trust, filed by Tracy McLaughlin.(Seo, Byeongsook)
November 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 11/17/2021. ORDERED that, on or before November 24, 2021, plaintiff shall show cause why this case should not be dismissed due to the Courts lack of subject matter jurisdiction. (sphil, )
November 16, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Ciera Alyse Gonzalez on behalf of Tracy McLaughlinAttorney Ciera Alyse Gonzalez added to party Tracy McLaughlin(pty:pla) (Gonzalez, Ciera)
November 16, 2021 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE by Senior Judge Blackburn. This case is randomly reassigned to Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer and drawn to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. All future pleadings should be designated as 21-cv-03026-PAB. (athom, )
November 16, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Michelle K. Schindler by Michelle Kramer Schindler on behalf of Gary Hughes, Lori HughesAttorney Michelle Kramer Schindler added to party Gary Hughes(pty:dft), Attorney Michelle Kramer Schindler added to party Lori Hughes(pty:dft) (Schindler, Michelle)
November 16, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Matthew C. Ferguson by Matthew C. Ferguson on behalf of Gary Hughes, Lori HughesAttorney Matthew C. Ferguson added to party Gary Hughes(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew C. Ferguson added to party Lori Hughes(pty:dft) (Ferguson, Matthew)
November 15, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff Tracy McLaughlin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 , #2 Exhibit 2 , #3 Exhibit 3 , #4 Exhibit 4 , #5 Exhibit 5 , #6 Exhibit 6 , #7 Exhibit 7 , #8 Exhibit 8 , #9 Exhibit 9 , #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11 , #12 Exhibit 12 , #13 Exhibit 13 , #14 Exhibit 14 , #15 Exhibit 15 , #16 Exhibit 16 , #17 Exhibit 17 , #18 Exhibit 18 )(Seo, Byeongsook)
November 15, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tracy McLaughlin. Lori Hughes served on 11/14/2021, answer due 12/5/2021. (Seo, Byeongsook)
November 15, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tracy McLaughlin. Gary Hughes served on 11/14/2021, answer due 12/5/2021; Hughes Family Revocable Trust served on 11/14/2021, answer due 12/5/2021. (Seo, Byeongsook)
November 12, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Kenneth E. Citron on behalf of 777 Club, LLCAttorney Kenneth E. Citron added to party 777 Club, LLC(pty:dft) (Citron, Kenneth)
November 10, 2021 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Tracy McLaughlin. 777 Club, LLC waiver sent on 11/10/2021, answer due 1/9/2022. (Seo, Byeongsook)
November 10, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF CASE ASSOCIATION PLAINTIFF'S D.C.COLO.LCivR 3.2 NOTICE OF RELATED CASES by Byeongsook Seo on behalf of Tracy McLaughlin (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to PLAINTIFF'S D.C.COLO.LCivR 3.2 NOTICE OF RELATED CASES, #2 Exhibit 2 to PLAINTIFF'S D.C.COLO.LCivR 3.2 NOTICE OF RELATED CASES)(Seo, Byeongsook)
November 9, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (cpomm, )
November 9, 2021 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn and drawn to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Text Only Entry (cpomm, )
November 9, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against 777 Club, LLC, Gary Hughes, Lori Hughes, Hughes Family Revocable Trust (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number ACODC-8169480)Attorney Byeongsook Seo added to party Tracy McLaughlin(pty:pla), filed by Tracy McLaughlin. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet U.S.D.C. Colorado Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons to Gary Hughes, #3 Summons Summons to Lori Hughes, #4 Summons Summons to 777 Club, LLC)(Seo, Byeongsook)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McLaughlin v. Hughes et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracy McLaughlin
Represented By: Byeongsook Seo
Represented By: Ciera Alyse Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Hughes
Represented By: Matthew C. Ferguson
Represented By: Michelle Kramer Schindler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lori Hughes
Represented By: Matthew C. Ferguson
Represented By: Michelle Kramer Schindler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hughes Family Revocable Trust
Represented By: Michelle Kramer Schindler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 777 Club, LLC
Represented By: Kenneth E. Citron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?