Roberts v. Benson
Plaintiff: Craig H. Roberts
Defendant: Doug Benson
Case Number: 1:2021cv03029
Filed: November 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Christine M Arguello
Referring Judge: N Reid Neureiter
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Libel,Assault,Slander
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 15, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 15 March 2022. (cmadr, )
March 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 15 March 2022. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties' Joint Motion to Enter Stipulated Protective Order (Dkt. #19 ) is GRANTED finding good cause shown. The proposed Stipulated Protective Order (Dkt. #19-1) is APPROVED and made an Order of Court. PLEASE READ ATTACHED MINUTE ORDER. (cmadr, )
March 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MEMORANDUM regarding #19 Joint MOTION for Protective Order filed by Craig H. Roberts. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 3/15/2022. Text Only Entry (cmasec)
March 14, 2022 Filing 19 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Plaintiff Craig H. Roberts. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Stipulated Protective Order)(McAdam, Kevin)
February 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on February 23, 2022. (rvill, )
February 23, 2022 Filing 17 CORUTROOM MINUTES for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 2/23/2022. Discovery due by 8/15/2022. Dispositive Motions due by 9/15/2022. Joint Status Report due by 6/8/2022. A Telephonic Final Pretrial Conference is set for 11/10/2022 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom C203 before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. The parties are directed to call the conference line as a participant at (888) 398-2342, Access Code 5755390# at the scheduled time. FTR: Courtroom C203. (rvill, )
February 15, 2022 Filing 16 Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Craig H. Roberts. (Katz, Nicholas)
January 13, 2022 Filing 15 REPLY to Response to #6 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendant Doug Benson. (Hertzke, Billy-George)
January 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Magistrate Judge Neureiter is designated to conduct NDISPO proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b). Court-sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. The Magistrate Judge, at his/her discretion, may convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. SO ORDERED by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 1/12/2022. Text Only Entry (cmasec)
January 12, 2022 Filing 13 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #12 Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Christine M. Arguello and drawn to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. All future pleadings should be designated as 21-cv-03029-CMA. (Text Only Entry) (cmadr, )
January 12, 2022 Filing 12 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Craig H. Roberts All parties do not consent.. (McAdam, Kevin)
January 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 6 January 2022. It is hereby ORDERED that Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss (Dkt. #10 ) is GRANTED. Defendant's reply is due on or before January 13, 2022. It is further ORDERED that the deadline to complete and file the Consent/Non-Consent Form (see Dkt. #3-1) is VACATED and RESET to January 13, 2022. PLEASE READ ATTACHED MINUTE ORDER. (cmadr, )
January 6, 2022 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #6 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Doug Benson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Hertzke, Billy-George)
January 6, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by John Scarola on behalf of Craig H. Roberts (Scarola, John)
December 23, 2021 Filing 8 RESPONSE to #6 MOTION to Dismiss Attorney John Scarola added to party Craig H. Roberts(pty:pla) filed by Plaintiff Craig H. Roberts. (Scarola, John)
December 7, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Nicholas W. Katz on behalf of Craig H. RobertsAttorney Nicholas W. Katz added to party Craig H. Roberts(pty:pla) (Katz, Nicholas)
December 7, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Doug Benson. (Hertzke, Billy-George)
November 23, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Craig H. Roberts. Doug Benson served on 11/16/2021, answer due 12/7/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Service)(McAdam, Kevin)
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Setting Scheduling/Planning Conference and Setting Deadline for Filing of Consent/Non-Consent Form. Consent Form due by 2/9/2022. A Telephonic Scheduling/Planning Conference is set for 2/23/2022 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom C203 before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. The parties are directed to call the conference line as a participant at (888) 398-2342, Access Code 5755390# at the scheduled time. By Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on November 12, 2021. (rvill, )
November 10, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (jtorr, )
November 10, 2021 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Text Only Entry. (jtorr, )
November 10, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Doug Benson (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number ACODC-8170707)Attorney Kevin Christopher McAdam added to party Craig H Roberts(pty:pla), filed by Craig H Roberts. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Summons)(McAdam, Kevin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roberts v. Benson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Craig H. Roberts
Represented By: Kevin Christopher McAdam
Represented By: John Scarola
Represented By: Nicholas W. Katz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doug Benson
Represented By: Billy-George Hertzke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?