Dole et al v. Greene et al
Plaintiff: Ira B. Dole and Sarah M. Dole
Defendant: Joe Greene, Greene MR Land Development, LLC, Randy Kelly, Anthony Gordon Gisoldi, Terrance O'Brien and Kevin O'Brien
Case Number: 1:2021cv03047
Filed: November 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Referring Judge: William J Martinez
2 Judge: Nina Y Wang
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 nr
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MINUTE ORDER: In light of the reassignment of this case to the Honorable Gordon P. Gallagher, see [Doc. 31], the Scheduling Conference set for 1/12/2022 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang is VACATED, to be re-set by Magistrate Judge Gallagher. By Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 01/07/2022. Text Only Entry (nywlc2, )
January 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER: This matter has its factual nexus in Delta County. According to the Court's Revised Jury Plan for Random Jury Selection, this case is therefore properly designated for Jury Division 3. Because the jury will be drawn from that Division, it is appropriate that the case be managed, for pretrial purposes, by Magistrate Judge Gallagher in Grand Junction. Accordingly, pursuant to D.C. Colo. L. Civ. R. 40.1(a), and as approved by the Chief Judge of the Court, the undersigned directs that the Clerk of the Court reassign this action to Magistrate Judge Gallagher as the referral judge. All further pleadings in this case shall reflect the case number of 21-cv-3047-WJM-GPG. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 1/6/2022. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
January 5, 2022 Filing 30 Proposed Scheduling Order by Defendants Anthony Gordon Gisoldi, Joe Greene, Greene MR Land Development, LLC, Randy Kelly, Kevin O'Brien, Terrance O'Brien. (Tisdale, Douglas)
January 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER: Counsel for the parties and all counsel who may later enter an appearance shall review and familiarize themselves with the undersigned's Revised Practice Standards (as most recently revised effective December 1, 2021 and as they may be amended from time to time), which may be downloaded #here. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 1/ 5/2022. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
January 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Magistrate Judge Wang, or such other Magistrate Judge who may in the future be reassigned this case, is designated to conduct NDISPO proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 72(a) and (b). Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the Magistrate Judge or on the request of the parties by motion, the court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 1/5/2022. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
December 30, 2021 Filing 27 CASE REASSIGNED. Pursuant to #26 Order. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge William J. Martinez. All future pleadings should be designated as 21-cv-03047 WJM. (Text Only Entry) (evana, )
December 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER Exercising my prerogative as a senior judge, I request that this case be reassigned, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 12/30/2021. (evana, )
December 30, 2021 Filing 25 CASE REASSIGNED. All parties do not consent pursuant to #24 Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Lewis T. Babcock, and drawn to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. All future pleadings should be designated as 21-cv-03047-LTB. (Text Only Entry) (agarc, )
December 29, 2021 Filing 24 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendants Anthony Gordon Gisoldi, Joe Greene, Greene MR Land Development, LLC, Randy Kelly, Kevin O'Brien, Terrance O'Brien All parties do not consent.. (Tisdale, Douglas)
December 15, 2021 Filing 23 NOTICE of Deposition of Sharron Klasseen by Plaintiffs Ira B. Dole, Sarah M. Dole (Gower, Nicholas)
December 15, 2021 Filing 22 NOTICE of Deposition of Billie White by Plaintiffs Ira B. Dole, Sarah M. Dole (Gower, Nicholas)
December 1, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE of Filing of State Court Docket Sheet by Defendants Anthony Gordon Gisoldi, Joe Greene, Greene MR Land Development, LLC, Randy Kelly, Kevin O'Brien, Terrance O'Brien (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet State Court Register of Actions)(Tisdale, Douglas)
November 15, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Nicholas Harris Gower on behalf of Ira B. Dole, Sarah M. DoleAttorney Nicholas Harris Gower added to party Ira B. Dole(pty:pla), Attorney Nicholas Harris Gower added to party Sarah M. Dole(pty:pla) (Gower, Nicholas)
November 15, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by David A. Price on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney David A. Price added to party Ira B. Dole(pty:pla), Attorney David A. Price added to party Sarah M. Dole(pty:pla) (Price, David)
November 15, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE re #16 Order, by Defendants Anthony Gordon Gisoldi, Joe Greene, Greene MR Land Development, LLC, Randy Kelly, Kevin O'Brien, Terrance O'Brien (Tisdale, Douglas)
November 15, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Douglas Michael Tisdale, Sr on behalf of All Defendants (Tisdale, Douglas)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE AND SETTING DEADLINE FOR FILING OF CONSENT/NONCONSENT FORM by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 15 November 2021. Consent Form due by 12/29/2021. Proposed Scheduling Order due1/5/2022 Scheduling Conference set for 1/12/2022 10:30 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. All participants shall use the following dial-in information: 888-363-4749, Access Code: 5738976. (cmadr, )
November 12, 2021 Filing 15 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (jtorr, )
November 12, 2021 Filing 14 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Text Only Entry. (jtorr, )
November 12, 2021 Filing 13 ANSWER and Counterclaim of the Named Defendants to #12 Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint by Anthony Gordon Gisoldi, Joe Greene, Greene MR Land Development, LLC, Randy Kelly, Kevin O'Brien, Terrance O'Brien.(jtorr, )
November 12, 2021 Filing 12 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Anthony Gordon Gisoldi, Joe Greene, Greene MR Land Development, LLC, Randy Kelly, Kevin O'Brien, Terrance O'Brien, filed by Sarah M. Dole, Ira B. Dole.(jtorr, )
November 12, 2021 Filing 11 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (jtorr, )
November 12, 2021 Filing 10 STATE COURT ORDER Setting Case Management Conference, filed by Defendants Anthony Gordon Gisoldi, Green MR Land Development LLC, Joe Greene, Randi Kelley, Kevin O'Brien, Terrence O'Brien. (Tisdale, Douglas)
November 12, 2021 Filing 9 STATE COURT ORDER Granting Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint, filed by Defendants Anthony Gordon Gisoldi, Green MR Land Development LLC, Joe Greene, Randi Kelley, Kevin O'Brien, Terrence O'Brien. (Tisdale, Douglas)
November 12, 2021 Filing 8 STATE COURT ORDER Resetting Preliminary Injunction Hearing, filed by Defendants Anthony Gordon Gisoldi, Green MR Land Development LLC, Joe Greene, Randi Kelley, Kevin O'Brien, Terrence O'Brien. (Tisdale, Douglas)
November 12, 2021 Filing 7 STATE COURT ORDER Resetting Preliminary Injunction Hearing, filed by Defendants Anthony Gordon Gisoldi, Green MR Land Development LLC, Joe Greene, Randi Kelley, Kevin O'Brien, Terrence O'Brien. (Tisdale, Douglas)
November 12, 2021 Filing 6 STATE COURT ORDER Vacating and Rescheduling Preliminary Injunction Hearing, filed by Defendants Anthony Gordon Gisoldi, Green MR Land Development LLC, Joe Greene, Randi Kelley, Kevin O'Brien, Terrence O'Brien. (Tisdale, Douglas)
November 12, 2021 Filing 5 STATE COURT ORDER for Temporary Restraining Order, filed by Defendants Anthony Gordon Gisoldi, Green MR Land Development LLC, Joe Greene, Randi Kelley, Kevin O'Brien, Terrence O'Brien. (Tisdale, Douglas)
November 12, 2021 Filing 4 Exhibits in Support of #1 Notice of Removal, by Defendants Anthony Gordon Gisoldi, Green MR Land Development LLC, Joe Greene, Randi Kelley, Kevin O'Brien, Terrence O'Brien. (Tisdale, Douglas)
November 12, 2021 Filing 3 Exhibits in Support of #1 Notice of Removal, by Defendants Anthony Gordon Gisoldi, Green MR Land Development LLC, Joe Greene, Randi Kelley, Kevin O'Brien, Terrence O'Brien. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amended Complaint)(Tisdale, Douglas)
November 12, 2021 Filing 2 Exhibits in Support of #1 Notice of Removal, by Defendants Anthony Gordon Gisoldi, Green MR Land Development LLC, Joe Greene, Randi Kelley, Kevin O'Brien, Terrence O'Brien. (Attachments: #1 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet)(Tisdale, Douglas)
November 12, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Joe Greene, Anthony Gordon Gisoldi, Randi Kelley, Green MR Land Development LLC, Terrence O'Brien, Kevin O'Brien from Delta County District Court, Case Number 2021CV30048. (Filing fee $ 402, Receipt Number ACODC-8173270), filed by Joe Greene, Anthony Gordon Gisoldi, Randi Kelley, Green MR Land Development LLC, Terrence O'Brien, Kevin O'Brien.(Tisdale, Douglas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dole et al v. Greene et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ira B. Dole
Represented By: David A. Price
Represented By: Nicholas Harris Gower
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah M. Dole
Represented By: David A. Price
Represented By: Nicholas Harris Gower
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Greene
Represented By: Douglas Michael Tisdale, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greene MR Land Development, LLC
Represented By: Douglas Michael Tisdale, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy Kelly
Represented By: Douglas Michael Tisdale, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Gordon Gisoldi
Represented By: Douglas Michael Tisdale, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terrance O'Brien
Represented By: Douglas Michael Tisdale, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin O'Brien
Represented By: Douglas Michael Tisdale, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?