PacOptic Networks, LLC v. Earthnet Inc. et al
Plaintiff: PacOptic Networks, LLC
Defendant: Earthnet Inc., 4735 Walnut, Inc., Sheri Valentiner, LLC a Colorado limited liability company doing business as Valentiner and Associates and Bahman Shahid
Case Number: 1:2021cv03349
Filed: December 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Christine M Arguello
Referring Judge: Scott T Varholak
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #19 Motion to Vacate Scheduling Conference. The Scheduling Conference set for 3/2/2022 is VACATED and RESET for 4/13/2022 09:15 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Proposed Scheduling Order due 4/6/2022. SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 2/3/2022. Text Only Entry(stvlc2, )
February 3, 2022 Filing 20 MEMORANDUM regarding #19 Unopposed MOTION to Vacate /Reset The Scheduling Conference filed by Earthnet Inc.. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 2/3/2022. Text Only Entry (cmasec)
February 3, 2022 Filing 19 Unopposed MOTION to Vacate /Reset The Scheduling Conference by Defendant Earthnet Inc.. (Strachan, David)
January 31, 2022 Filing 18 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Attorney Jesse Howard Witt added to party 4735 Walnut, Inc.(pty:dft), CROSSCLAIM against Bahman Shahid by 4735 Walnut, Inc..(Witt, Jesse)
January 28, 2022 Filing 17 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Carl Taylor Smith on behalf of PacOptic Networks, LLCAttorney Carl Taylor Smith added to party PacOptic Networks, LLC(pty:pla) (Smith, Carl)
January 22, 2022 Filing 16 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Cherami L. Ball Costigan on behalf of Sheri Valentiner, LLC (Ball Costigan, Cherami)
January 22, 2022 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Attorney Cherami L. Ball Costigan added to party Sheri Valentiner, LLC(pty:dft) by Sheri Valentiner, LLC.(Ball Costigan, Cherami)
January 14, 2022 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by PacOptic Networks, LLC. Sheri Valentiner, LLC served on 1/6/2022, answer due 1/27/2022. (Bowser, Joseph)
January 14, 2022 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by PacOptic Networks, LLC. 4735 Walnut, Inc. served on 1/6/2022, answer due 1/27/2022. (Bowser, Joseph)
January 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 6 January 2022. Proposed Scheduling Order due 2/23/2022. Scheduling Conference set for 3/2/2022 11:15 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. (cmadr, )
January 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER The Court finds #10 Response to Order to Show Cause sufficient at this stage of the proceedings to satisfy the Court of its subject matter jurisdiction over this lawsuit. Accordingly, #7 Order to Show Cause is DISCHARGED. SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 1/6/2022. Text Only Entry (stvlc2, )
January 6, 2022 Filing 10 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #7 by Plaintiff PacOptic Networks, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Joseph P. Bowser)(Bowser, Joseph)
December 23, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by David Matthew Strachan on behalf of Earthnet Inc.Attorney David Matthew Strachan added to party Earthnet Inc.(pty:dft) (Strachan, David)
December 23, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Douglas Adam Stevens on behalf of Earthnet Inc.Attorney Douglas Adam Stevens added to party Earthnet Inc.(pty:dft) (Stevens, Douglas)
December 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 DISCHARGED . ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 17 December 2021. Accordingly, it is ORDERED that, on or before January 7, 2022, Plaintiff shall show cause, if any there be, in writing, why this case should not be dismissed due to the Court's lack of subject matter jurisdiction. (cmadr, ) Modified pursuant to ECF 11 on 1/6/2022 (cmadr, ).
December 17, 2021 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by PacOptic Networks, LLC. Earthnet Inc. waiver sent on 12/17/2021, answer due 2/15/2022. (Bowser, Joseph)
December 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Magistrate Judge Varholak is designated to conduct NDISPO proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b). Court-sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. The Magistrate Judge, at his/her discretion, may convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. SO ORDERED by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 12/14/2021. Text Only Entry (cmasec)
December 14, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (norlin, )
December 14, 2021 Filing 3 Case assigned to Judge Christine M. Arguello and drawn to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Text Only Entry (norlin, )
December 14, 2021 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent 385 Inc. for PacOptic Networks, LLC. (Bowser, Joseph)
December 14, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number ACODC-8224468)Attorney Joseph P. Bowser added to party PacOptic Networks, LLC(pty:pla), filed by PacOptic Networks, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons)(Bowser, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PacOptic Networks, LLC v. Earthnet Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PacOptic Networks, LLC
Represented By: Joseph P. Bowser
Represented By: Carl Taylor Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Earthnet Inc.
Represented By: David Matthew Strachan
Represented By: Douglas Adam Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 4735 Walnut, Inc.
Represented By: Jesse Howard Witt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheri Valentiner, LLC a Colorado limited liability company doing business as Valentiner and Associates
Represented By: Cherami L. Ball Costigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bahman Shahid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?