Coomer v. Make Your Life Epic LLC et al
Plaintiff: Eric Coomer
Defendant: Make Your Life Epic LLC dba ThriveTime Show, Clayton Thomas Clark and Make Your Life Epic LLC doing business as ThriveTime Show
Case Number: 1:2021cv03440
Filed: December 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Kristen L Mix
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 18, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 18, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Heath Aaron Novosad on behalf of All Defendants Attorney Heath Aaron Novosad added to party Clayton Thomas Clark(pty:dft), Attorney Heath Aaron Novosad added to party Make Your Life Epic LLC(pty:dft) (Novosad, Heath)
February 18, 2022 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Eric Coomer. All Defendants. (Cain, Charles)
February 18, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Douglas A. Daniels on behalf of All Defendants Attorney Douglas A. Daniels added to party Clayton Thomas Clark(pty:dft), Attorney Douglas A. Daniels added to party Make Your Life Epic LLC(pty:dft) (Daniels, Douglas)
February 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 02/15/2022. Proposed Scheduling Order due 4/15/2022. Scheduling/Planning Conference set for 4/22/2022 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. (Attachments: #1 Continuation of Main Document, #2 Continuation of Main Document) (alave, )
February 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER. Pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(c)(4), the deadline to file the Consent/Non-Consent to United States Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form [#4] is April 8, 2022. by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 2/15/2022. Text Only Entry (klmlc2, )
January 5, 2022 Filing 7 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (agarc, )
January 3, 2022 Filing 6 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Clayton Thomas Clark re #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Eric Coomer. (Cain, Charles)
January 3, 2022 Filing 5 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Make Your Lift Epic, LLC dba ThriveTime Show re #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Eric Coomer. (Cain, Charles)
December 22, 2021 Filing 4 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. No Summons Issued. (jcharl, )
December 22, 2021 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix Text Only Entry. (jcharl, )
December 22, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Related Cases by Plaintiff Eric Coomer (Cain, Charles)
December 22, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Eric Coomer (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number ACODC-8239680)Attorney Charles Joseph Cain added to party Eric Coomer(pty:pla), filed by Eric Coomer. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cain, Charles)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coomer v. Make Your Life Epic LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Coomer
Represented By: Charles Joseph Cain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Make Your Life Epic LLC dba ThriveTime Show
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clayton Thomas Clark
Represented By: Douglas A. Daniels
Represented By: Heath Aaron Novosad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Make Your Life Epic LLC doing business as ThriveTime Show
Represented By: Douglas A. Daniels
Represented By: Heath Aaron Novosad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?