Little v. United Airlines, Inc.
Plaintiff: Mary Little
Defendant: United Airlines, Inc. and United Airlines Holdings, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv03463
Filed: December 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Philip A Brimmer
Referring Judge: Kristen L Mix
2 Judge: Nina Y Wang
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 49 U.S.C. ยง 40105
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 24, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang for non-dispositive matters. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, and (4) conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding, by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 2/24/2022. Text Only Entry (pabsec, )
February 23, 2022 Filing 22 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #21 Minute Order. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer. All future pleadings should be designated as 21-cv-03463-PAB. (Text Only Entry). (alave, )
February 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MINUTE ORDER re: #19 Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge filed by United Airlines Holdings, Inc., United Airlines, Inc. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this case shall be assigned to a District Judge under D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(c)(8) and D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(a) by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 02/23/2022. (alave, )
February 23, 2022 Filing 20 Proposed Scheduling Order by Defendants United Airlines Holdings, Inc., United Airlines, Inc.. (Clouatre, Mark)
February 23, 2022 Filing 19 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendants United Airlines Holdings, Inc., United Airlines, Inc. All parties do not consent.. (Clouatre, Mark)
February 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 PRE-SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 02/23/2022. (alave, )
February 14, 2022 Filing 17 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Brian J. Lampert on behalf of Mary LittleAttorney Brian J. Lampert added to party Mary Little(pty:pla) (Lampert, Brian)
February 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 02/09/2022. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Stipulation #15 is APPROVED, and Defendant United Airlines Holdings, Inc. is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, with the parties to bear their own legal fees and costs. Defendant United Airlines Holdings, Inc. shall hereafter be removed from the caption. The case remains pending against United Airlines, Inc. (alave, )
February 7, 2022 Filing 15 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Party United Airlines Holdings Inc. by Defendants United Airlines Holdings, Inc., United Airlines, Inc.. (Clouatre, Mark)
January 3, 2022 Filing 14 ANSWER to #8 Complaint by United Airlines Holdings, Inc., United Airlines, Inc..(Clouatre, Mark)
December 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Setting Scheduling/Planning Conference. A Scheduling/Planning Conference pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) shall be held on March 9, 2022, commencing at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom A-401, Fourth Floor, Alfred A. Arraj United States Courthouse, 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado. The Proposed Scheduling Order due 3/2/2022, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 12/29/2021. (Attachments: #1 Instructions for Preparation of Scheduling Order, #2 Proposed Scheduling Order) (agarc, )
December 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER. Pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(c)(4), the deadline to file the Consent/Non-Consent to United States Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form [#11] is March 9, 2022. by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 12/29/2021. Text Only Entry (klmlc2, )
December 28, 2021 Filing 11 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (jtorr, )
December 28, 2021 Filing 10 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Text Only Entry. (jtorr, )
December 28, 2021 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Complaint & JD, CCCS, and Summons upon United Airlines Holdings, Inc. on 12/2/2021. (jtorr, )
December 28, 2021 Filing 8 Plaintiff's COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against United Airlines Holdings, Inc., United Airlines, Inc., filed by Mary Little.(jtorr, )
December 28, 2021 Filing 7 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (jtorr, )
December 28, 2021 Filing 6 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES re: #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Notice of Entry of Appearance, #4 Corporate Disclosure Statement, and #5 Corporate Disclosure Statement, filed by attorney Mark Clouatre. The s/signatures did not match the filer's name on the account for which the login and password are registered. DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - future documents must be filed pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 4.3(c) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases).(Text Only Entry) (jtorr, )
December 28, 2021 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Carry, Christopher)
December 28, 2021 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent United Airlines Holdings, Inc. for United Airlines, Inc.. (Carry, Christopher)
December 28, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance for Christopher T. Carry by Christopher T. Carry on behalf of United Airlines Holdings, Inc., United Airlines, Inc. (Carry, Christopher)
December 28, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance for Mark T. Clouatre by Christopher T. Carry on behalf of United Airlines Holdings, Inc., United Airlines, Inc. (Carry, Christopher)
December 28, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by United Airlines, Inc., United Airlines Holdings, Inc. from District Court, City and County of Denver, Case Number 2021cv33516. (Filing fee $ 402, Receipt Number ACODC-8243161), filed by United Airlines, Inc., United Airlines Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A-1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A-2, #4 Exhibit Exhibit A-3, #5 Exhibit Exhibit A-4, #6 Exhibit Exhibit A-5, #7 Exhibit Exhibit B, #8 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Carry, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Little v. United Airlines, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Little
Represented By: Brian J. Lampert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Airlines, Inc.
Represented By: Mark Thomas Clouatre
Represented By: Christopher T. Carry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Airlines Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Mark Thomas Clouatre
Represented By: Christopher T. Carry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?