Lange v. Matthews-Vu Medical Group, P.C. et al
Plaintiff: Douglas K. Lange
Defendant: Matthews-Vu Medical Group, P.C., Anneliese Hale and Mark
Case Number: 1:2022cv00086
Filed: January 12, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: S Kato Crews
Referring Judge: Regina M Rodriguez
2 Judge: Kathleen M Tafoya
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Medical Malpractice
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 17, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 17, 2022 Filing 19 SUMMONSES issued by Clerk on 2/17/2022 (angar, )
February 16, 2022 Filing 18 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Matthews-Vu Medical Group, P.C. & Anneliese Hale, P.A. by Plaintiff Douglas K. Lange. (Attachments: #1 Summons Request)(Astuno, John)
February 16, 2022 Filing 17 AMENDED COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Anneliese Hale, Matthews-Vu Medical Group, P.C., filed by Douglas K. Lange.(Astuno, John)
February 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER re #14 Motion for Leave. Having reviewed the Motion, the proposed amended pleading, and Plaintiff's responses to the Order to Show Cause, the Court GRANTS Plaintiff's Motion to Amend. On or before the close of business on 2/16/2022, Plaintiff shall docket a clean copy of the Amended Complaint. By Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 2/15/2022. Text Only Entry (skclc1)
February 3, 2022 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM regarding #14 MOTION for Leave to Amend Complaint to Comply with FED.R.CIV.P. 15(a)(2) and D.C.COLO.LCIVR 15.1(b) filed by Douglas K. Lange. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. By Judge Regina M. Rodriguez on 2/3/2022. Text Only Entry (rmrja)
February 3, 2022 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to Amend Complaint to Comply with FED.R.CIV.P. 15(a)(2) and D.C.COLO.LCIVR 15.1(b) by Plaintiff Douglas K. Lange. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed First Amended Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Astuno, John)
February 2, 2022 Filing 13 REASSIGNING MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Due to Magistrate Judge Tafoya's retirement, this case is reassigned to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews as the referral judge. All future pleadings should reference Magistrate Judge Crews at the end of the civil action number (such as 22-cv-00086-RMR-SKC). Unless otherwise ordered, the dates and times for all scheduled matters will be maintained. (Text only entry) (agarc, )
January 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: The #11 Notice of Filing First Amended Complaint and Jury Demand is STRICKEN for failure to comply with Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a)(1) and D.C.COLO.LCivR 15.1(a). Given that Plaintiff has already amended once as a matter of course, he must instead file a motion to amend, in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a)(2) and D.C.COLO.LCivR 15.1(b). Further, Plaintiff has still not provided the court with sufficient factual allegations to show that the amount in controversy exceeds the jurisdictional threshold for diversity jurisdiction. 28 U.S.C. 1332(a). The court will give Plaintiff one more opportunity to set forth additional facts concerning the amount in controversy. Therefore, Plaintiff shall have until February 4, 2022 within which to file a motion to amend, which complies with Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a)(2) and D.C.COLO.LCivR 15.1, and which sets forth sufficient facts to show that the amount in controversy exceeds $75,000, excluding interest and costs. Plaintiff is hereby forewarned that, should he fail to comply with this Order, the #4 Order to Show Cause will be made absolute, and the court will recommend the dismissal of this action without further notice. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 01/27/22. Text Only Entry (kmtlc2)
January 27, 2022 Filing 11 STRICKEN NOTICE of Filing Amended Pleading Notice of Filing Proposed First Amended Complaint and Jury Demand by Plaintiff Douglas K. Lange (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed First Amended Complaint)(Astuno, John) Modified on 1/28/2022 (csarr, ).
January 27, 2022 Filing 10 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Plaintiff's Renewed Response to the Order to Show Cause re #4 by Plaintiff Douglas K. Lange. (Astuno, John)
January 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of Local Civ. R. 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions, and (5) pursuant to Local Civ. R. 16.6 and at the discretion of the Magistrate Judge, convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. SO ORDERED by Judge Regina M. Rodriguez on 1/27/2022. Text Only Entry (rmrja)
January 27, 2022 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE by Senior Judge Blackburn. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Regina M. Rodriguez and drawn to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. All future pleadings should be designated as 22-cv-00086-RMR. (athom, )
January 19, 2022 Filing 7 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to the deficiencies in the response to #4 Order to Show Cause. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn and drawn to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. All future pleadings should be designated as 22-cv-00086-REB. (Text Only Entry) (csarr, )
January 17, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Filing Amended Pleading Amended Complaint and Jury Demand by Plaintiff Douglas K. Lange (Astuno, John)
January 17, 2022 Filing 5 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #4 by Plaintiff Douglas K. Lange. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Secretary of State Summary, #2 Exhibit Defendant Hale Web Profile, #3 Exhibit El Paso County Assessor Report, #4 Exhibit Plaintiff Lange's Arizona Driver License, #5 Exhibit Dr. Hepworth's Report, #6 Exhibit Dr. Hepworth's CV)(Astuno, John)
January 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on January 13, 2022. Accordingly, because the allegations are presently insufficient for the court to ensure that it possesses subject matter jurisdiction over this case, it is ORDERED that, on or before January 27, 2022, Plaintiff shall show cause, in writing, as to why this case should not be dismissed, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(1), for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. If Plaintiff fails to comply with this Order to Show Cause, the court will recommend the dismissal of this action without further notice. (csarr, )
January 12, 2022 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. No summons issued. (jtorr, )
January 12, 2022 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Text Only Entry. (jtorr, )
January 12, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Douglas K. Lange against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number ACODC-8265217)Attorney John J. Astuno, Jr added to party Douglas K Lange(pty:pla), filed by Douglas K Lange. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Astuno, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lange v. Matthews-Vu Medical Group, P.C. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas K. Lange
Represented By: John J. Astuno, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthews-Vu Medical Group, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anneliese Hale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?