DISH Purchasing Corporation v. Suncraft Technologies, Inc.
Plaintiff: DISH Purchasing Corporation
Defendant: Suncraft Technologie Inc. and Suncraft Technologies, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2022cv00127
Filed: January 18, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Kristen L Mix
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 18, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of Related Cases Filed by Defendant Suncraft Technologies, Inc. (Taylor, Lauren)
March 18, 2022 Filing 10 MOTION to Transfer Case /Venue Filed by Defendant Suncraft Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Taylor, Lauren)
March 18, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint or, in the Alternative, to Stay Pending the Outcome of Parallel Litigation by Defendant Suncraft Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Taylor, Lauren)
March 8, 2022 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint, Filed by Defendant Suncraft Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Taylor, Lauren)
February 16, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Evan Bennett Stephenson on behalf of Suncraft Technologies, Inc.Attorney Evan Bennett Stephenson added to party Suncraft Technologies, Inc.(pty:dft) (Stephenson, Evan)
February 15, 2022 Filing 6 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to the Complaint by Defendant Suncraft Technologies, Inc.. Suncraft Technologies, Inc. answer due 3/11/2022. (Taylor, Lauren)
February 2, 2022 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by DISH Purchasing Corporation. (Davis, Mark)
February 2, 2022 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by DISH Purchasing Corporation. Suncraft Technologies, Inc. served on 1/28/2022, answer due 2/18/2022. (Davis, Mark)
January 19, 2022 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (jsalz, )
January 18, 2022 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Text Only Entry. (jsalz, )
January 18, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Suncraft Technologie Inc. (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number ACODC-8272207)Attorney Mark Rodman Davis added to party DISH Purchasing Corporation(pty:pla), filed by DISH Purchasing Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet CIVIL COVER SHEET, #2 Summons SUMMONS, #3 Exhibit EXHIBIT A)(Davis, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DISH Purchasing Corporation v. Suncraft Technologies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DISH Purchasing Corporation
Represented By: Mark Rodman Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suncraft Technologie Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suncraft Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Evan Bennett Stephenson
Represented By: Lauren Anne Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?