Winandy et al v. 67 Bachelor Gulch Rd LLC
Plaintiff: Erec Winandy and Giulia Winandy
Defendant: 67 Bachelor Gulch Rd LLC
Case Number: 1:2022cv00171
Filed: January 21, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Christine M Arguello
Referring Judge: S Kato Crews
2 Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 16, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 37 SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 16 March 2022. Designation of Affirmative Experts due 8/15/2022. Discovery due by 9/1/2022. Dispositive Motions due by 9/15/2022. Designation of Rebuttal Experts due 7/15/2022. (cmadr, )
March 16, 2022 Filing 36 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher: Scheduling Conference held on 3/16/2022. After discussion, Scheduling Order entered. The Court Further Orders that a joint, written discovery status update be filed thirty days prior to the close of discovery. Appearances all via telephone: For Plaintiffs, Brett Charhon; For Defendant, Nate Osborn. FTR: Grand Junction. (gpgsec, ) Text Only Entry
March 9, 2022 Filing 35 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant 67 Bachelor Gulch Rd LLC All parties do not consent.. (Osborn, Nathan)
March 9, 2022 Filing 34 Proposed Scheduling Order by Defendant 67 Bachelor Gulch Rd LLC. (Osborn, Nathan)
March 1, 2022 Filing 33 ANSWER to #7 Amended Complaint, by 67 Bachelor Gulch Rd LLC.(Osborn, Nathan)
February 28, 2022 Filing 32 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Warren N. Eckloff, III on behalf of 67 Bachelor Gulch Rd LLCAttorney Warren N. Eckloff, III added to party 67 Bachelor Gulch Rd LLC(pty:dft) (Eckloff, Warren)
February 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER: Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 3/16/2022 at 9:45 AM in Room 323 (Grand Junction) before Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Proposed Scheduling Order due one week prior. The number to call at the time of the hearing is 888-363-4749, Access 3136546#. By Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on February 28, 2022. Text Only Entry (gpgsec, )
February 17, 2022 Filing 30 PAYMENT RECEIVED from Erec Winandy in the amount of $ 5,000; Receipt Number cox102185. (sphil, )
February 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER: Denying as #8 Motion for TRO and Preliminary Injunction pursuant to #22 Agreed Motion to Enter Agreed Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction. SO ORDERED by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 2/16/2022. Text Only Entry(cmasec)
February 16, 2022 Filing 28 BOND for Preliminary Injunction posted by Plaintiffs Erec Winandy, Giulia Winandy. (Charhon, Brett)
February 16, 2022 Filing 27 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Nathan G. Osborn on behalf of 67 Bachelor Gulch Rd LLCAttorney Nathan G. Osborn added to party 67 Bachelor Gulch Rd LLC(pty:dft) (Osborn, Nathan)
February 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER finding as moot #9 Motion to Expedite. In light if the Parties agreement as to the preliminary injunction, expedited discovery on the matter is no longer necessary. Therefore, this motion is MOOT. Within thirty (30)days, the Parties SHALL jointly contact the Court's Clerk in Grand Junction to set a scheduling conference. The hearing before the Magistrate Judge on 2/16/22 is also vacated. by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 2/15/22. Text Only Entry(GPG)
February 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER : The Telephonic Status Conference which had been set for 2-16-2022 at 10:30 am in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews is hereby VACATED. This was regarding Plaintiff's Motion for Expedited Discovery [#9.] By Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on February 15, 2022. Text Only Entry (gpgsec, )
February 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER: Pursuant to #23 Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction, the VTC TRO Hearing set for 2/17/2022, at 3:00 PM is VACATED. SO ORDERED by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 2/15/2022. Text Only Entry (cmasec)
February 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 2/15/2022, re: #22 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Agreed Motion to Enter Agreed Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction) filed by Giulia Winandy, Erec Winandy is GRANTED... (sphil, )
February 15, 2022 Filing 22 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Agreed Motion to Enter Agreed Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction) by Plaintiffs Erec Winandy, Giulia Winandy. (Attachments: #1 Agreed Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction)(Charhon, Brett)
February 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER: Discharging 12 Order to Show Cause pursuant to the filing of #13 Response to Order to Show Cause. SO ORDERED by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 2/10/2022. Text Only Entry (cmasec)
February 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER taking under advisement #9 Motion to Expedite. A response to this motion SHALL be filed no later than NOON on 2/15/2022. by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 2/10/22. Text Only Entry(GPG)
February 9, 2022 Filing 19 REASSIGNING MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Pursuant to 18 Order, this action is directly reassigned Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher All future pleadings should be designated as 22-cv-00171-CMA-GPG.(Text Only Entry). (sphil, )
February 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: This matter has its factual nexus in Eagle County. According to the Court's Revised Jury Plan for Random Jury Selection, this case is therefore properly designated for Jury Division 3. Because the jury will be drawn from that Division, it is appropriate that the case be managed, for pretrial purposes, by Magistrate Judge Gallagher in Grand Junction. Accordingly, pursuant to D.C. Colo. L. Civ. R. 40.1(a), and as approved by the Chief Judge of the Court, the undersigned directs that the Clerk of the Court reassign this action to Magistrate Judge Gallagher as the referral judge. All further pleadings in this case shall reflect the case number of 22-cv-00171-CMA-GPG. SO ORDERED by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 2/9/2022. Text Only Entry (cmasec)
February 9, 2022 Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT/RETURN of Service of Dkt Nos. 7, 8, 9 and 14 upon Wendell Porterfield as Registered Agent for 67 Bachelor Gulch Rd LLC on 02/08/2022, filed by Plaintiffs Erec Winandy, Giulia Winandy (Charhon, Brett)
February 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER Setting Telephonic Status Conference. A Telephonic Status Conference is set for 2-16-2022 at 10:30 am in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. The purpose of this Telephonic Status Conference is to discuss Plaintiff's Motion for Expedited Discovery [#9.] Dial in instructions for the Telephonic Status Conference are as follows: CONFERENCE CALL LINE: (888) 251-2909ACCESS CODE: 5662814# SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 2-8-2022. Text Only Entry (skclc2).
February 7, 2022 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM regarding #9 MOTION to Expedite (Motion for Limited Expedited Discovery) filed by Giulia Winandy, Erec Winandy. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 2/7/2022. Text Only Entry (cmasec)
February 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER re #8 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction: The Court will hear Plaintiffs' Petition for TRO only after notice has been properly provided to Defendant. A VTC TRO Hearing is set for 2/17/2022, at 3:00 PM before Judge Christine M. Arguello. Counsel are directed to contact Chambers not less than three days before the Hearing for instructions on how to proceed with the VTC/Telephone. Plaintiffs must personally serve Defendant with notice of the Complaint, request for injunctive relief, and a copy of this Order NO LATER THAN NOON ON THURSDAY, 2/10/2022, and provide this Court with confirmation of service. Failure to serve these documents will result in said hearing being vacated. Defendant shall file its Response on or before 2/15/2022. SO ORDERED by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 2/7/2022. Text Only Entry (cmasec)
February 7, 2022 Filing 13 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re 12 by Plaintiffs Erec Winandy, Giulia Winandy. (Charhon, Brett)
February 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #8 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction. Plaintiffs shall show cause, in writing, on or before 2/10/2022, as to why a TRO/Injunction is needed when the Plaintiffs could file a Notice of Lis Pendens, which under Colorado law gives constructive notice to the world that litigation is pending and title to the property is subject to the outcome of the pending litigation. SO ORDERED by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 2/7/2022. Text Only Entry (cmasec)
February 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Magistrate Judge Crews is designated to conduct NDISPO proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b). Court-sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. The Magistrate Judge, at his/her discretion, may convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. SO ORDERED by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 2/7/2022. Text Only Entry (cmasec)
February 7, 2022 Filing 10 CASE REASSIGNED. Pursuant to the filing of #8 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Christine M. Arguello and drawn to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. All future pleadings should be designated as 22-cv-00171-CMA. (Text Only Entry) (csarr, )
February 4, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION to Expedite (Motion for Limited Expedited Discovery) by Plaintiffs Erec Winandy, Giulia Winandy. (Charhon, Brett)
February 4, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and, MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiffs Erec Winandy, Giulia Winandy. (Attachments: #1 Charhon Declaration, #2 Winandy Declaration, #3 Cassada Declaration, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C, #7 Exhibit D, #8 Exhibit E, #9 Exhibit F, #10 Exhibit G, #11 Exhibit H, #12 Proposed Order)(Charhon, Brett)
February 4, 2022 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against 67 Bachelor Gulch Rd LLC, filed by Erec Winandy, Giulia Winandy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Charhon, Brett)
January 28, 2022 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Erec Winandy, Giulia Winandy. 67 Bachelor Gulch Rd LLC served on 1/24/2022, answer due 2/14/2022. (Charhon, Brett)
January 21, 2022 Filing 5 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (jtorr, )
January 21, 2022 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Text Only Entry. (jtorr, )
January 21, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Steven Chase Callahan on behalf of Erec Winandy, Giulia WinandyAttorney Steven Chase Callahan added to party Erec Winandy(pty:pla), Attorney Steven Chase Callahan added to party Giulia Winandy(pty:pla) (Callahan, Steven)
January 21, 2022 Filing 2 SUMMONS REQUEST as to 67 Bachelor Gulch Rd LLC re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiffs Erec Winandy, Giulia Winandy. (Charhon, Brett)
January 21, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against 67 Bachelor Gulch Rd LLC (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number ACODC-8278666)Attorney Brett Maurice Charhon added to party Erec Winandy(pty:pla), Attorney Brett Maurice Charhon added to party Giulia Winandy(pty:pla), filed by Erec Winandy, Giulia Winandy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Charhon, Brett)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Winandy et al v. 67 Bachelor Gulch Rd LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erec Winandy
Represented By: Steven Chase Callahan
Represented By: Brett Maurice Charhon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Giulia Winandy
Represented By: Steven Chase Callahan
Represented By: Brett Maurice Charhon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 67 Bachelor Gulch Rd LLC
Represented By: Nathan G. Osborn
Represented By: Warren N. Eckloff, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?