Professional Bull Riders, LLC v. RTPR, LLC
Plaintiff: Professional Bull Riders, LLC
Defendant: RTPR, LLC
Case Number: 1:2022cv00190
Filed: January 24, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Michael E Hegarty
Referring Judge: Raymond P Moore
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 15, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 16, 2022 Filing 23 MEMORANDUM regarding #16 MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaims (Doc. 10) filed by Professional Bull Riders, LLC. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. By Judge Raymond P. Moore on 3/16/2022. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
March 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MINUTE ORDER: With the assignment of this matter, the parties are advised that throughout this case they are expected to be familiar and comply with not only the Local Rules of this District, but also Judge Raymond P. Moore's Civil Practice Standards, which may be found at: http://www.cod.uscourts.gov/JudicialOfficers/ActiveArticleIIIJudges/HonRaymondPMoore.aspx. SO ORDERED by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 3/16/2022. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
March 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order, and (5) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. By Judge Raymond P. Moore on 3/16/2022. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
March 16, 2022 Filing 20 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE by Senior Judge Blackburn. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Raymond P. Moore and drawn to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. All future pleadings should be designated as 22-cv-00190-RM. (athom, )
March 16, 2022 Filing 19 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #18 Order. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn and drawn to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. All future pleadings should be designated as 22-cv-00190-REB. (Text Only Entry) (cmadr, )
March 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 16 March 2022. Pursuant to the form declining consent under D.C. Colo. LCivR 40.1(c) at ECF #15 , the Court directs the Clerk of Court to reassign this case under D.C. Colo. LCivR 40.1(a). This Court may continue on the case to hear matters referred by the district judge under 28 U.S.C. 636(b), Fed. R. Civ. P. 72 and D.C. Colo. LCivR 72.1(c). (cmadr, )
March 15, 2022 Filing 17 Plaintiff's ANSWER/REPLY to #10 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by Professional Bull Riders, LLC.(Hess, Stephen)
March 15, 2022 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaims (Doc. 10) by Plaintiff Professional Bull Riders, LLC. (Hess, Stephen)
March 15, 2022 Filing 15 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Professional Bull Riders, LLC All parties do not consent.. (Hess, Stephen)
February 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. For good cause shown, the deadline for Plaintiff to Answer or Otherwise Respond to #10 Counterclaim is extended to 3/15/2022. by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 02/23/2022. Text Only Entry(mehlc1, )
February 22, 2022 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #10 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by Plaintiff Professional Bull Riders, LLC. (Hess, Stephen)
February 2, 2022 Filing 12 REASSIGNING MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Due to Magistrate Judge Tafoya's retirement, this case is reassigned to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty as the presiding judge. All future pleadings should reference Magistrate Judge Hegarty at the beginning of the civil action number (such as 22-cv-00190-MEH). Unless otherwise ordered, the dates and times for all scheduled matters will be maintained. (Text only entry) (agarc, )
February 2, 2022 Filing 11 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #7 by Defendant RTPR, LLC. (Schuessler, Erik)
January 31, 2022 Filing 10 ANSWER to #4 Amended Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM and Jury Demand against Professional Bull Riders, LLC by RTPR, LLC.(Schuessler, Erik)
January 28, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Erik Karl Schuessler on behalf of RTPR, LLC (Schuessler, Erik)
January 27, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Stephen Andrew Hess on behalf of Professional Bull Riders, LLCAttorney Stephen Andrew Hess added to party Professional Bull Riders, LLC(pty:pla) (Hess, Stephen)
January 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on January 26, 2022. Accordingly, because the allegations are presently insufficient for the court to ensure that it possesses subject matter jurisdiction over this case, it is ORDERED that, on or before February 9, 2022, Defendant shall show cause, in writing, as to why this case should not be remanded, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(1), for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. If Defendant fails to comply with this Order to Show Cause, the court will recommend the remand of this action to the District Court for Pueblo County without further notice. (csarr, )
January 24, 2022 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (jtorr, )
January 24, 2022 Filing 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Text Only Entry. (jtorr, )
January 24, 2022 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against RTPR, LLC, filed by Professional Bull Riders, LLC.(jtorr, )
January 24, 2022 Filing 3 COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against RTPR, LLC, filed by Professional Bull Riders, LLC.(jtorr, )
January 24, 2022 Filing 2 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (jtorr, )
January 24, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by RTPR, LLC from Pueblo County District Court, Case Number 2021CV30451. (Filing fee $ 402, Receipt Number ACODC-8281405), filed by RTPR, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Complaint and Jury Demand, #2 Exhibit State Court Amended Complaint and Jury Demand, #3 Exhibit State Court Acceptance and Waiver of Service, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Schuessler, Erik)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Professional Bull Riders, LLC v. RTPR, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Professional Bull Riders, LLC
Represented By: Stephen Andrew Hess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RTPR, LLC
Represented By: Erik Karl Schuessler
Represented By: Jennifer Marie Kinkade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?