Lopez et al v. Griswold et al
Plaintiff: Greg Lopez, Rodney Pelton and Steven House
Defendant: Jena Griswold and Judd Choate
Amicus Curiae: Colorado Common Cause, Common Cause and Campaign Legal Center
Case Number: 1:2022cv00247
Filed: January 28, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: S Kato Crews
Referring Judge: John L Kane
Nature of Suit: Constitutionality of State Statutes
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 18, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 USCA Case Number 22-1082 for #27 Notice of Appeal filed by Steven House, Rodney Pelton, Greg Lopez. (trvo, )
March 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 LETTER Transmitting Notice of Appeal to all counsel advising of the transmittal of the #27 Notice of Appeal filed by Steven House, Rodney Pelton, Greg Lopez to the U.S. Court of Appeals. ( Retained Counsel, Fee paid,) (Attachments: #1 Preliminary Record and Docket Sheet)(angar, )
March 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #26 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiffs Steven House, Greg Lopez, Rodney Pelton (Filing fee $ 505, Receipt Number ACODC-8368701) (Yeates, Owen)
March 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Memorandum and Opinion & Order on Motion For Preliminary Injunction. For the reasons provided in this Order, Plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Injunction (ECF No. #8 ) is DENIED. ORDERED by Judge John L. Kane on 3/10/2022.(angar, )
March 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MINUTE ENTRY for In Court Hearing - PI Day-2 proceedings held before Judge John L. Kane on 3/10/2022. Taking under advisement #8 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Court Reporter: Mary George. (babia)
March 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MINUTE ENTRY for In Court Hearing - PI, day-1 proceedings held before Judge John L. Kane on 3/9/2022. ORDERED: Todays hearing shall continue tomorrow morning at 9:00 a.m. Court Reporter: Mary George. (babia)
February 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #22 Unopposed Motion to Reschedule Preliminary Injunction Hearing or Decide Motion on Briefs. The Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for Thursday, March 3, 2022, at 10:00 AM before Judge John L. Kane is VACATED AND RESET TO WEDNESDAY, MARCH 9, 2022, AT 10:00 AM in Courtroom A802, Alfred A. Arraj U.S. Courthouse, 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado. Out-of-state counsel may appear via video teleconference, but at least one attorney representing each party must be physically present in the courtroom. Counsel wishing to appear remotely shall email kane_chambers@cod.uscourts.gov for further instructions. Parties, counsel, and others in attendance must abide by all additional protocols relating to the COVID-19 pandemic. Those protocols can be found on the District Court website, www.cod.uscourts.gov. Individuals who wish to monitor the hearing via the public access line are directed to call the Court's conference line as a participant Toll Free: 877-336-1831, Access Code 6747227#, five minutes before the scheduled time. Ordered by Judge John L. Kane on 2/28/2022. Text Only Entry(jlksec)
February 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Unopposed MOTION to Continue Preliminary Injunction Hearing or Decide Motion on Briefs by Plaintiffs Steven House, Greg Lopez, Rodney Pelton. (Burrows, Daniel)
February 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 REPLY to Response to #8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , responding to Defendants' Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Injunction (ECF No. 14), and in support of Plaintiffs' Motion (ECF No. 8), filed by Plaintiffs Steven House, Greg Lopez, Rodney Pelton. (Yeates, Owen)
February 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Exhibit List for Preliminary Injunction Hearing by Plaintiffs Steven House, Greg Lopez, Rodney Pelton. (Burrows, Daniel)
February 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Witness List for Preliminary Injunction Hearing by Defendants Judd Choate, Jena Griswold. (Baumann, Peter)
February 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Witness List for Preliminary Injunction Hearing by Plaintiffs Steven House, Greg Lopez, Rodney Pelton. (Burrows, Daniel)
February 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER. A Preliminary Injunction Hearing is set for Thursday, March 3, 2022, at 10:00 AM before Judge John L. Kane in Courtroom A802, Alfred A. Arraj U.S. Courthouse, 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado. Out-of-state counsel may appear via video teleconference, but at least one attorney representing each party must be physically present in the courtroom. Counsel wishing to appear remotely shall email kane_chambers@cod.uscourts.gov for further instructions. Parties, counsel, and others in attendance must abide by all additional protocols relating to the COVID-19 pandemic. Those protocols can be found on the District Court website, www.cod.uscourts.gov. Individuals who wish to monitor the hearing via the public access line are directed to call the Court's conference line as a participant Toll Free: 877-336-1831, Access Code 6747227#, five minutes before the scheduled time. Any filings, including witness lists and exhibits, must be filed by close of business on February 24, 2022. A reply brief, if any, should also be filed by that time. The Motion of Colorado Common Cause, Common Cause and Campaign Legal Center for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief No. #15 is GRANTED. Ordered by Judge John L. Kane on 2/22/2022. Text Only Entry(jlksec)
February 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 2/22/2022. Based on my unavailability due to a criminal trial starting February 22, 2022 andending March 29, 2022, it is ORDERED that, pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(a), this case is transferred to Senior Judge John L. Kane. (sphil, )
February 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION to File Amicus Brief by Amicus Parties Colorado Common Cause, Common Cause, Campaign Legal Center. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Document Amicus Brief of Colorado Common Cause, Common Cause and Campaign Legal Center in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction)(Tierney, Martha)
February 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 BRIEF in Opposition to #8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Defendants Judd Choate, Jena Griswold. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Kotlarczyk, Michael)
February 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ERRATA re #8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Ex. 2 by Plaintiffs Steven House, Greg Lopez, Rodney Pelton. (Burrows, Daniel)
February 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 2/16/2022, re: #11 Unopposed Motion to Exceed the Page Limit is GRANTED. Defendants may file a response of not more than 25 pages. Pursuant to III.A of the Court's practice standards, this "page limitation[] include[s] the cover page, jurisdictional statement, statement of facts, procedural history, argument, authority, closing, signature block, and all other matters, except the certificate of service." Text Only Entry.(sphil, )
February 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Defendants Judd Choate, Jena Griswold. (Baumann, Peter)
February 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 02/08/2022 re: #8 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Defendants shall respond to #8 Motion for Preliminary Injunction on or before February 17, 2022. Text Only Entry (pabsec, )
February 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CASE REASSIGNED. Pursuant to the filing of #8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . This case is randomly reassigned to Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer and drawn to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. All future pleadings should be designated as 22-cv-00247-PAB. (Text Only Entry) (csarr, )
February 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiffs Steven House, Greg Lopez, Rodney Pelton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Lopez Decl., #2 Exhibit Pelton Decl., #3 Exhibit House Decl., #4 Exhibit Ganahl Sept. Candidate Aff., #5 Exhibit Ganahl Jan. Candidate Aff., #6 Exhibit Ganahl Excess Contributions, #7 Exhibit Polis Financial Summ., #8 Exhibit Taheri Decl., #9 Exhibit Masket Decl., #10 Exhibit Candidate Financial Summaries, #11 Exhibit Durango Airbnb Search, #12 Exhibit Party-to-Candidate Contributions 2019-20, #13 Exhibit Colo. Dem Party Neutrality Policy, #14 Exhibit Colo. GOP Bylaws, #15 Exhibit 2002 Blue Book Extracts)(Burrows, Daniel)
February 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Owen Dennis Yeates on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Owen Dennis Yeates added to party Steven House(pty:pla), Attorney Owen Dennis Yeates added to party Greg Lopez(pty:pla), Attorney Owen Dennis Yeates added to party Rodney Pelton(pty:pla) (Yeates, Owen)
February 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Greg Lopez, Steven House, Rodney Pelton. Judd Choate waiver sent on 1/29/2022, answer due 3/30/2022; Jena Griswold waiver sent on 1/29/2022, answer due 3/30/2022. (Burrows, Daniel)
February 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Peter G. Baumann on behalf of All Defendants Attorney Peter G. Baumann added to party Judd Choate(pty:dft), Attorney Peter G. Baumann added to party Jena Griswold(pty:dft) (Baumann, Peter)
February 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Michael T. Kotlarczyk on behalf of All Defendants Attorney Michael T. Kotlarczyk added to party Judd Choate(pty:dft), Attorney Michael T. Kotlarczyk added to party Jena Griswold(pty:dft) (Kotlarczyk, Michael)
January 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (jcharl, )
January 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews Text Only Entry. (jcharl, )
January 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Judd Choate, Jena Griswold (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number ACODC-8289144)Attorney Daniel E. Burrows added to party Steven House(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel E. Burrows added to party Greg Lopez(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel E. Burrows added to party Rodney Pelton(pty:pla), filed by Greg Lopez, Steven House, Rodney Pelton. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Burrows, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lopez et al v. Griswold et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Greg Lopez
Represented By: Daniel E. Burrows
Represented By: Owen Dennis Yeates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodney Pelton
Represented By: Daniel E. Burrows
Represented By: Owen Dennis Yeates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven House
Represented By: Daniel E. Burrows
Represented By: Owen Dennis Yeates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jena Griswold
Represented By: Michael T. Kotlarczyk
Represented By: Peter G. Baumann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judd Choate
Represented By: Michael T. Kotlarczyk
Represented By: Peter G. Baumann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Colorado Common Cause
Represented By: Martha M. Tierney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Common Cause
Represented By: Martha M. Tierney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Campaign Legal Center
Represented By: Martha M. Tierney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?