Warming Trends LLC v. Flame Designz LLC
Plaintiff: Warming Trends LLC
Defendant: Flame Designz LLC
Case Number: 1:2022cv00252
Filed: January 28, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Philip A Brimmer
Referring Judge: Scott T Varholak
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 0001 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 2, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 2 February 2022. Proposed Scheduling Order due 4/19/2022. Scheduling Conference set for 4/26/2022 10:30 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. (cmadr, )
February 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak for non-dispositive matters. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, and (4) conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding, by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 2/01/2022. Text Only Entry (pabsec, )
February 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 2/1/2022, re: 226 NOTICE Of Related Cases. ORDERED that, pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(a), Civil Action No. 22-cv-00252-KLM is REASSIGNED to Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer and Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak for all purposes. (sphil, )
January 31, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE re #1 Complaint, Of Related Cases by Plaintiff Warming Trends LLC (Rozier, Carey)
January 28, 2022 Filing 7 Report re Patent/Trademark: Report on the filing of an action emailed (NEF) to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (jcharl, )
January 28, 2022 Filing 6 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (jcharl, )
January 28, 2022 Filing 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix Text Only Entry. (jcharl, )
January 28, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE Civil Cover Sheet by Plaintiff Warming Trends LLC (Attachments: #1 Form AO120)(Rozier, Carey)
January 28, 2022 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Rozier, Carey)
January 28, 2022 Filing 2 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Flame DesignZ LLC by Plaintiff Warming Trends LLC. (Rozier, Carey)
January 28, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Flame Designz LLC (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number ACODC-8289532)Attorney Carey Matthew Rozier added to party Warming Trends LLC(pty:pla), filed by Warming Trends LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Rozier, Carey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Warming Trends LLC v. Flame Designz LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Warming Trends LLC
Represented By: Carey Matthew Rozier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flame Designz LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?