M.C. et al v. Girardeau et al
Plaintiff: M. C., Tim Cali, Kristen Cali and M.C.
Defendant: Susan L Girardeau, Sharon Boyer, Dana Neel, Arapahoe Park Pediatrics, P.C. and Susan L. Girardeau
Case Number: 1:2022cv00464
Filed: February 23, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Michael E Hegarty
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Medical Malpractice
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 13, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 13, 2022 Filing 17 ANSWER to #2 Complaint,, Affirmative Defenses and Jury Demand by Arapahoe Park Pediatrics, P.C., Sharon Boyer, Dana Neel.(Cook-Olson, Amy)
April 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. For good cause shown, the deadline for Defendants Arapahoe Park Pediatrics, P.C., Sharon Boyer, and Dana Neel to Answer or Otherwise Respond to #2 Complaint is extended to 04/13/2022. by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 04/04/2022. Text Only Entry(mehlc1, )
April 4, 2022 Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #2 Complaint,, by Defendants Arapahoe Park Pediatrics, P.C., Sharon Boyer, Dana Neel. (Cook-Olson, Amy)
April 4, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Angela Lund Klein on behalf of Arapahoe Park Pediatrics, P.C., Sharon Boyer, Dana NeelAttorney Angela Lund Klein added to party Arapahoe Park Pediatrics, P.C.(pty:dft), Attorney Angela Lund Klein added to party Sharon Boyer(pty:dft), Attorney Angela Lund Klein added to party Dana Neel(pty:dft) (Klein, Angela)
April 4, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Amy E. Cook-Olson on behalf of Arapahoe Park Pediatrics, P.C., Sharon Boyer, Dana NeelAttorney Amy E. Cook-Olson added to party Arapahoe Park Pediatrics, P.C.(pty:dft), Attorney Amy E. Cook-Olson added to party Sharon Boyer(pty:dft), Attorney Amy E. Cook-Olson added to party Dana Neel(pty:dft) (Cook-Olson, Amy)
March 24, 2022 Filing 12 Defendant Girardeau's ANSWER to #2 Complaint,, Attorney Paul Andrew Faraci added to party Susan L. Girardeau(pty:dft) by Susan L. Girardeau.(Faraci, Paul)
March 23, 2022 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by M.C., Kristen Cali, Tim Cali. Arapahoe Park Pediatrics, P.C. served on 3/3/2022, answer due 3/24/2022; Sharon Boyer served on 3/14/2022, answer due 4/4/2022; Susan L. Girardeau served on 3/3/2022, answer due 3/24/2022; Dana Neel served on 3/16/2022, answer due 4/6/2022. (Attachments: #1 Summons Return of Service - Girardeau, #2 Summons Return of Service - Neel, #3 Summons Return of Service - Boyer)(Leventhal, Sean)
March 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 18 March 2022. This matter comes before the Court sua sponte. Due to a conflict in the Court's calendar, the Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) Scheduling Conference currently set for April 27, 2022 is reset to June 29, 2022 at 10:15 a.m. in Courtroom A-501, on the fifth floor of the Alfred A. Arraj United States Courthouse located at 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado. The parties shall complete and file the Magistrate Judge Consent Form (ECF 5-4) on or before June 22, 2022. (cmadr, )
February 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on February 25, 2022. The parties shall complete and file the Magistrate Judge Consent Form (ECF 5-4) on or before April 20, 2022. It is ORDERED that the Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) Scheduling Conference shall be held on April 27, 2022 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom A-501, on the fifth floor of the Alfred A. Arraj United States Courthouse located at 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado. It is further ORDERED that counsel for the parties and any unrepresented non-prisoner parties in this case are to hold a meeting in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) on or before April 19, 2022 and jointly prepare a proposed Scheduling Order. The parties shall file the proposed Scheduling Order with the Clerk's Office, and in accordance with District of Colorado Electronic Case Filing ("ECF") Procedures, no later thanfive business days prior to the scheduling conference. (alave, )
February 25, 2022 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE by Senior Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 2/25/2022. This case is randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. All future pleadings should be designated as 22-cv-00464-MEH. (trvo, )
February 24, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance on Behalf of Plaintiffs by Sean Bradley Leventhal on behalf of Kristen Cali, Tim Cali (Leventhal, Sean)
February 24, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance on Behalf of Plaintiffs by Nicholas William Temming on behalf of Kristen Cali, Tim CaliAttorney Nicholas William Temming added to party Kristen Cali(pty:pla), Attorney Nicholas William Temming added to party Tim Cali(pty:pla) (Temming, Nicholas)
February 24, 2022 Filing 5 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (jcharl, )
February 24, 2022 Filing 4 Case assigned to Judge Lewis T. Babcock and drawn to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Text Only Entry. (jcharl, )
February 24, 2022 Filing 3 Administrative Notice: Duplicate filing fee received. Financial notified and a refund is pending. (Text Only Entry) (jcharl, )
February 24, 2022 Filing 2 COMPLAINT PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES, JURY DEMAND, AND CERTIFICATE OF REVIEW against Arapahoe Park Pediatrics, P.C., Sharon Boyer, Susan L Girardeau, Dana Neel (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number ACODC-8334053)Attorney Sean Bradley Leventhal added to party M. C.(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Bradley Leventhal added to party Kristen Cali(pty:pla), Attorney Sean Bradley Leventhal added to party Tim Cali(pty:pla), filed by M. C., Kristen Cali, Tim Cali. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Girardeau - Summons re Cali, #3 Summons Boyer- Summons re Cali, #4 Summons Neel - Summons re Cali, #5 Summons Arapahoe Park Pediatrics - Summons re Cali)(Leventhal, Sean)
February 24, 2022 Filing 1 Administrative Notice: No initiating document. Attorney contacted with instructions to file the initiating document within 24 hours. (Text Only Entry) (jtorr, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: M.C. et al v. Girardeau et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M. C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tim Cali
Represented By: Nicholas William Temming
Represented By: Sean Bradley Leventhal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristen Cali
Represented By: Nicholas William Temming
Represented By: Sean Bradley Leventhal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M.C.
Represented By: Nicholas William Temming
Represented By: Sean Bradley Leventhal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan L Girardeau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharon Boyer
Represented By: Amy E. Cook-Olson
Represented By: Angela Lund Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dana Neel
Represented By: Amy E. Cook-Olson
Represented By: Angela Lund Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arapahoe Park Pediatrics, P.C.
Represented By: Amy E. Cook-Olson
Represented By: Angela Lund Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan L. Girardeau
Represented By: Paul Andrew Faraci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?