Delgado v. Emericare, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Sheryl Delgado,
Defendant: Emericare, Inc. d/b/a Brookdale Green Mountain, Emeritus Corporation d/b/a Brookdale Green Mountain-ALR, Brookdale Senior Living, Inc., GenGreenMountain LLC d/b/a Montage Ridge, Generations, LLC a/k/a Generations-CO, LLC, Generations, LLC, Emericare, Inc. doing business as Brookdale Green Mountain, Emeritus Corporation doing business as Brookdale Green Mountain-ALR, GenGreenMountain LLC doing business as Montage Ridge and Generations-CO, LLC
Case Number: 1:2022cv00499
Filed: February 28, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: N Reid Neureiter
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 22, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 28 April 2022. It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Additional Time to Respond to Defendants' Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Litigation (Dkt. #23 ) is GRANTED. Plaintiff's response to Defendants' Joint Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Litigation (Dkt. #21 ) is due on or before May 8, 2022, and Defendants' reply is due on or before May 15, 2022. PLEASE READ ATTACHED MINUTE ORDER.(cmadr, )
April 28, 2022 Filing 23 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #21 Joint MOTION to Compel and Stay Litigation by Plaintiff Sheryl Delgado,. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Rhoden, Garry)
April 12, 2022 Filing 22 STIPULATION for Extension of Time for Plaintiff's Response by Plaintiff Sheryl Delgado,. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Rhoden, Garry)
March 24, 2022 Filing 21 Joint MOTION to Compel and Stay Litigation by Defendants Brookdale Senior Living, Inc., Emericare, Inc., Emeritus Corporation, GenGreenMountain LLC, Generations, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Admission Agreement, #2 Exhibit B-Declaration of Kathy LeVee)(Gwinn Pabon, Heather)
March 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 17 March 2022. It is hereby ORDERED that Defendants' Unopposed Motion Requesting an Extension of Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint (Dkt. #19 ) is GRANTED. Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint (Dkt. #5 ) on or before March 25, 2022. PLEASE READ ATTACHED MINUTE ORDER. (cmadr, )
March 14, 2022 Filing 19 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond by Defendants Brookdale Senior Living, Inc., Emericare, Inc., Emeritus Corporation, GenGreenMountain LLC, Generations, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) to Defendants' Unopposed Motion Requesting an Extension of Time to Answer Complaint)(Gwinn Pabon, Heather)
March 9, 2022 Filing 18 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Garry James Rhoden on behalf of Sheryl Delgado, Attorney Garry James Rhoden added to party Sheryl Delgado, (pty:pla) (Rhoden, Garry)
March 7, 2022 Filing 17 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to the Complaint by Defendants Generations, LLC, Brookdale Senior Living, Inc., Emeritus Corporation, Emericare, Inc., GenGreenMountain LLC. All Defendants. (Gwinn Pabon, Heather)
March 3, 2022 Filing 16 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Kelly Marie Telfeyan on behalf of Brookdale Senior Living, Inc., Emericare, Inc., Emeritus Corporation, GenGreenMountain LLC, Generations, LLC (Telfeyan, Kelly)
March 3, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Heather Marie Gwinn Pabon on behalf of All Defendants Attorney Heather Marie Gwinn Pabon added to party Brookdale Senior Living, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Heather Marie Gwinn Pabon added to party Emericare, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Heather Marie Gwinn Pabon added to party Emeritus Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Heather Marie Gwinn Pabon added to party GenGreenMountain LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Heather Marie Gwinn Pabon added to party Generations, LLC(pty:dft) (Gwinn Pabon, Heather)
March 3, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Thomas Baker Quinn on behalf of All Defendants Attorney Thomas Baker Quinn added to party Brookdale Senior Living, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Thomas Baker Quinn added to party Emericare, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Thomas Baker Quinn added to party Emeritus Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Thomas Baker Quinn added to party GenGreenMountain LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Thomas Baker Quinn added to party Generations, LLC(pty:dft) (Quinn, Thomas)
March 1, 2022 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE of Service by mail by Clerk of Court re #12 Order to Garry J. Rhoden, c/o Ramos Law, 10190 Bannock Street, Suite 200, Northglenn, Colorado 80260. Text Only Entry (cmadr, )
March 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE AND SETTING DEADLINE FOR FILING OF CONSENT/NON-CONSENT FORM by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 1 March 2022. Consent Form due by 5/5/2022. Proposed Scheduling Order due 5/12/2022. Scheduling Conference set for 5/19/2022 11:00 AM in Courtroom C203 before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. The Scheduling Conference will be conducted via telephone. The parties are directed to call the conference line as a participant at (888) 398-2342, Access Code 5755390# at the scheduled time. (cmadr, )
February 28, 2022 Filing 11 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (norlin, )
February 28, 2022 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT/RETURN of Service of District Court Civil Summons, Complaint and Jury Demand, District Court Civil Case Cover Sheet upon Generations, LLC on 1/28/2022 (norlin, )
February 28, 2022 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT/RETURN of Service of District Court Civil Summons, Complaint and Jury Demand, District Court Civil Case Cover Sheet upon GenGreenMountain LLC on 1/28/2022 (norlin, )
February 28, 2022 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT/RETURN of Service of District Court Civil Summons, Complaint and Jury Demand, District Court Civil Case Cover Sheet upon Brookdale Senior Living, Inc. on 1/28/2022 (norlin, )
February 28, 2022 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT/RETURN of Service of District Court Civil Summons, Complaint and Jury Demand, District Court Civil Case Cover Sheet upon Emeritus Corporation on 1/28/2022 (norlin, )
February 28, 2022 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT/RETURN of Service of District Court Civil Summons, Complaint and Jury Demand, District Court Civil Case Cover Sheet upon Emericare, Inc on 1/28/2022 (norlin, )
February 28, 2022 Filing 5 COMPLAINT and JURY DEMAND against Brookdale Senior Living, Inc., Emericare, Inc., Emeritus Corporation, GenGreenMountain LLC, Generations, LLC, filed by Sheryl Delgado,.(norlin, )
February 28, 2022 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Text Only Entry (norlin, )
February 28, 2022 Filing 3 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES: Kelly Marie Telfeyan. DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - counsel must submit a change of contact request through the Manage my Account tab at the PACER website at https://www.pacer.gov/, pursuant to D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(c) and 3.5 of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases).(Text Only Entry) (norlin, )
February 28, 2022 Filing 2 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (norlin, )
February 28, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Generations, LLC a/k/a Generations-CO, LLC, Brookdale Senior Living, Inc., Emeritus Corporation d/b/a Brookdale Green Mountain-ALR, Emericare, Inc. d/b/a Brookdale Green Mountain, GenGreenMountain LLC d/b/a Montage Ridge from Jefferson County District Court, State of Colorado, Case Number 2022CV30089. (Filing fee $ 402, Receipt Number ACODC-8340069), filed by Generations, LLC a/k/a Generations-CO, LLC, Brookdale Senior Living, Inc., Emeritus Corporation d/b/a Brookdale Green Mountain-ALR, Emericare, Inc. d/b/a Brookdale Green Mountain, GenGreenMountain LLC d/b/a Montage Ridge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Complaint and Jury Demand, #2 Exhibit B-ROS Emericare, INc., #3 Exhibit C-ROS Emeritus Corp, #4 Exhibit D-ROS Brookdale Senior Living, #5 Exhibit E-ROS GenGreenMountain LLC, #6 Exhibit F-ROS Generations, LLC, #7 Exhibit G-Notice of Filing of Defendants' Joint Notice of Removal (state court), #8 Exhibit H-Summary SOS-Emericare, #9 Exhibit I-Summary SOS-Emeritus Corp, #10 Exhibit J-Sec of State - TN, #11 Exhibit K-State Civil Cover Sheet, #12 Exhibit L-Civil Procedure Order, #13 Docket Sheet State Court Docket Sheet, #14 Civil Cover Sheet, #15 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet)(Telfeyan, Kelly)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Delgado v. Emericare, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheryl Delgado,
Represented By: Garry James Rhoden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emericare, Inc. d/b/a Brookdale Green Mountain
Represented By: Kelly Marie Telfeyan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emeritus Corporation d/b/a Brookdale Green Mountain-ALR
Represented By: Kelly Marie Telfeyan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brookdale Senior Living, Inc.
Represented By: Kelly Marie Telfeyan
Represented By: Heather Marie Gwinn Pabon
Represented By: Thomas Baker Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GenGreenMountain LLC d/b/a Montage Ridge
Represented By: Kelly Marie Telfeyan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Generations, LLC a/k/a Generations-CO, LLC
Represented By: Kelly Marie Telfeyan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Generations, LLC
Represented By: Heather Marie Gwinn Pabon
Represented By: Thomas Baker Quinn
Represented By: Kelly Marie Telfeyan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emericare, Inc. doing business as Brookdale Green Mountain
Represented By: Heather Marie Gwinn Pabon
Represented By: Thomas Baker Quinn
Represented By: Kelly Marie Telfeyan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emeritus Corporation doing business as Brookdale Green Mountain-ALR
Represented By: Heather Marie Gwinn Pabon
Represented By: Thomas Baker Quinn
Represented By: Kelly Marie Telfeyan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GenGreenMountain LLC doing business as Montage Ridge
Represented By: Heather Marie Gwinn Pabon
Represented By: Thomas Baker Quinn
Represented By: Kelly Marie Telfeyan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Generations-CO, LLC
Represented By: Heather Marie Gwinn Pabon
Represented By: Thomas Baker Quinn
Represented By: Kelly Marie Telfeyan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?