Colorado Montana Wyoming State Area Conference of the NAACP et al v. United States Election Integrity Plan et al
Plaintiff: Colorado Montana Wyoming State Area Conference of the NAACP, League of Women Voters of Colorado and Mi Familia Vota
Defendant: United States Election Integrity Plan, Shawn Smith, Ashley Epp and Holly Kasun
Case Number: 1:2022cv00581
Filed: March 9, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Philip A Brimmer
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1985 Conspiracy to Interfere with Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 31, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 5/6/2022, re: #40 plaintiffs' Motion for Limited Expedited Discovery is DENIED. (sphil, )
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 43 RESPONSE to #40 MOTION to Expedite Limited MOTION for Discovery filed by Defendants Ashley Epp, Holly Kasun, Shawn Smith, United States Election Integrity Plan. (Hays, Jessica)
April 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 42 MINUTE ORDER by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 4/29/2022, re: #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order. ORDERED that the Court will hold a full-day preliminary injunction hearing on June 2, 2022 at 8:30 a.m. ORDERED that the parties shall exchange exhibits, and submit to the Court electronically, on or before May 23, 2022 at 5:00 p.m. (sphil, )
April 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 41 MINUTE ORDER by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 04/29/2022 re #40 Motion for Limited Expedited Discovery. Defendants shall respond to plaintiffs' motion for expedited discovery on or before Wednesday, May 4, 2022 at 5:00 p.m. Text Only Entry (pabsec, )
April 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 40 MOTION to Expedite Limited, MOTION for Discovery by Plaintiffs Colorado Montana Wyoming State Area Conference of the NAACP, League of Women Voters of Colorado, Mi Familia Vota. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Erickson, Amy)
April 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 04/28/2022. Defendants' Motion to Dismiss [Docket No. #27 ] is DENIED. (athom, )
April 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 38 Witness List for Preliminary Injunction Hearing by Defendants Ashley Epp, Holly Kasun, Shawn Smith, United States Election Integrity Plan. (Hays, Jessica)
April 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 37 REPLY to Response to #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction against all defendants filed by Plaintiffs Colorado Montana Wyoming State Area Conference of the NAACP, League of Women Voters of Colorado, Mi Familia Vota. (Erickson, Amy)
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 36 REPLY to Response to #27 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Defendants Ashley Epp, Holly Kasun, Shawn Smith, United States Election Integrity Plan. (Hays, Jessica)
April 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 35 RESPONSE to #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction against all defendants filed by Defendants Ashley Epp, Holly Kasun, Shawn Smith, United States Election Integrity Plan. (Hays, Jessica)
April 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 34 Witness List by Plaintiffs Colorado Montana Wyoming State Area Conference of the NAACP, League of Women Voters of Colorado, Mi Familia Vota. (Erickson, Amy)
April 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 33 RESPONSE to #27 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Plaintiffs Colorado Montana Wyoming State Area Conference of the NAACP, League of Women Voters of Colorado, Mi Familia Vota. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Erickson, Amy)
April 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 32 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by John C. Bonifaz on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney John C. Bonifaz added to party Colorado Montana Wyoming State Area Conference of the NAACP(pty:pla), Attorney John C. Bonifaz added to party League of Women Voters of Colorado(pty:pla), Attorney John C. Bonifaz added to party Mi Familia Vota(pty:pla) (Bonifaz, John)
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MINUTE ORDER by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 4/08/2022. It is ORDERED that plaintiffs shall file a witness list by April 20, 2022 using the form found at http://www.cod.uscourts.gov/JudicialOfficers/Active/ArticleIIIJudges/HonPhilipABrimmer.aspx, indicating the witnesses it intends to call at the preliminary injunction hearing and the length of its direct examinations. It is further ORDERED that defendants shall file by April 27, 2022, a witness list for the preliminary injunction hearing, using the same form, which shall include estimates of the time required for cross-examining plaintiffs' witnesses and estimates of time for conducting the direct examinations of defendants witnesses. It is further ORDERED that counsel shall jointly contact Chambers via conference call (303-335-2794) on April 29, 2022 to schedule a preliminary injunction hearing. It is further ORDERED that defendants shall respond to the portion of plaintiffs' Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction [Docket No. 5] requesting a preliminary injunction on or before April 20, 2022, and plaintiffs may reply on or before April 25, 2022. It is further ORDERED that plaintiffs shall respond to defendants' Motion to Dismiss [Docket No. 27] on or before April 18, 2022, and defendants may reply on or before April 22, 2022. (pabsec, )
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 4/8/2022. ORDERED that the portion of plaintiffs' Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction [Docket No. #5 ] that requests issuance of a temporary restraining order is DENIED. ORDERED that the portion of plaintiffs' Motion for Expedited Hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Defendants' Motion to Dismiss [Docket No. #29 ] that requests an expedited TRO hearing is DENIED as moot. (trvo, )
April 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MOTION to Expedite , MOTION for Hearing/Conference re #27 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction against all defendants by Plaintiffs Colorado Montana Wyoming State Area Conference of the NAACP, League of Women Voters of Colorado, Mi Familia Vota. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Erickson, Amy)
April 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jessica Lynn Hays on behalf of All Defendants Attorney Jessica Lynn Hays added to party Ashley Epp(pty:dft), Attorney Jessica Lynn Hays added to party Holly Kasun(pty:dft), Attorney Jessica Lynn Hays added to party Shawn Smith(pty:dft), Attorney Jessica Lynn Hays added to party United States Election Integrity Plan(pty:dft) (Hays, Jessica)
April 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendants Ashley Epp, Holly Kasun, Shawn Smith, United States Election Integrity Plan. (Reisch, R.)
April 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by R. Scott Reisch on behalf of All Defendants Attorney R. Scott Reisch added to party Ashley Epp(pty:dft), Attorney R. Scott Reisch added to party Holly Kasun(pty:dft), Attorney R. Scott Reisch added to party Shawn Smith(pty:dft), Attorney R. Scott Reisch added to party United States Election Integrity Plan(pty:dft) (Reisch, R.)
March 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Courtney Marie Hostetler on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Courtney Marie Hostetler added to party Colorado Montana Wyoming State Area Conference of the NAACP(pty:pla), Attorney Courtney Marie Hostetler added to party League of Women Voters of Colorado(pty:pla), Attorney Courtney Marie Hostetler added to party Mi Familia Vota(pty:pla) (Hostetler, Courtney)
March 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Casey Carlton Breese on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Casey Carlton Breese added to party Colorado Montana Wyoming State Area Conference of the NAACP(pty:pla), Attorney Casey Carlton Breese added to party League of Women Voters of Colorado(pty:pla), Attorney Casey Carlton Breese added to party Mi Familia Vota(pty:pla) (Breese, Casey)
March 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Ronald Andrew Fein on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Ronald Andrew Fein added to party Colorado Montana Wyoming State Area Conference of the NAACP(pty:pla), Attorney Ronald Andrew Fein added to party League of Women Voters of Colorado(pty:pla), Attorney Ronald Andrew Fein added to party Mi Familia Vota(pty:pla) (Fein, Ronald)
March 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Holly Kasun served on 3/23/2022, answer due 4/13/2022. (Erickson, Amy)
March 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Ben Clements on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Ben Clements added to party Colorado Montana Wyoming State Area Conference of the NAACP(pty:pla), Attorney Ben Clements added to party League of Women Voters of Colorado(pty:pla), Attorney Ben Clements added to party Mi Familia Vota(pty:pla) (Clements, Ben)
March 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jean Paul Bradshaw on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Jean Paul Bradshaw added to party Colorado Montana Wyoming State Area Conference of the NAACP(pty:pla), Attorney Jean Paul Bradshaw added to party League of Women Voters of Colorado(pty:pla), Attorney Jean Paul Bradshaw added to party Mi Familia Vota(pty:pla) (Bradshaw, Jean)
March 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Brian Andrew Dillon on behalf of Colorado Montana Wyoming State Area Conference of the NAACP, League of Women Voters of Colorado, Mi Familia VotaAttorney Brian Andrew Dillon added to party Colorado Montana Wyoming State Area Conference of the NAACP(pty:pla), Attorney Brian Andrew Dillon added to party League of Women Voters of Colorado(pty:pla), Attorney Brian Andrew Dillon added to party Mi Familia Vota(pty:pla) (Dillon, Brian)
March 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Reid Kelly Day on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Reid Kelly Day added to party Colorado Montana Wyoming State Area Conference of the NAACP(pty:pla), Attorney Reid Kelly Day added to party League of Women Voters of Colorado(pty:pla), Attorney Reid Kelly Day added to party Mi Familia Vota(pty:pla) (Day, Reid)
March 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Amy Elizabeth Erickson on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Erickson, Amy)
March 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Shawn Smith served on 3/14/2022, answer due 4/4/2022. (Erickson, Amy)
March 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Ashley Epp served on 3/14/2022, answer due 4/4/2022. (Erickson, Amy)
March 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE by Senior Judge Blackburn. This case is randomly reassigned to Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer and drawn to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. All future pleadings should be designated as 22-cv-00581-PAB. (athom, )
March 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #12 Minute Order. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn. All future pleadings should be designated as 22-cv-00581-REB. (Text Only Entry). (alave, )
March 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 03/09/2022. IT IS ORDERED that: The Clerk of the Court shall REDRAW this action to a District Judge for further proceedings. (alave, )
March 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Proposed Order to #5 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiffs Colorado Montana Wyoming State Area Conference of the NAACP, League of Women Voters of Colorado, Mi Familia Vota. (Erickson, Amy) Modified on 3/9/2022 to correct event text and create linkage (athom, ).
March 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 DECLARATION of Salvador Hernandez regarding MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction against all defendants #5 by Plaintiffs Colorado Montana Wyoming State Area Conference of the NAACP, League of Women Voters of Colorado, Mi Familia Vota. (Erickson, Amy)
March 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 DECLARATION of Portia Prescott regarding MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction against all defendants #5 by Plaintiffs Colorado Montana Wyoming State Area Conference of the NAACP, League of Women Voters of Colorado, Mi Familia Vota. (Erickson, Amy)
March 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 DECLARATION of Beth Hendrix regarding MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction against all defendants #5 by Plaintiffs Colorado Montana Wyoming State Area Conference of the NAACP, League of Women Voters of Colorado, Mi Familia Vota. (Erickson, Amy)
March 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 DECLARATION of Casey Breese regarding MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction against all defendants #5 by Plaintiffs Colorado Montana Wyoming State Area Conference of the NAACP, League of Women Voters of Colorado, Mi Familia Vota. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Erickson, Amy)
March 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 BRIEF in Support of #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction against all defendants filed by Plaintiffs Colorado Montana Wyoming State Area Conference of the NAACP, League of Women Voters of Colorado, Mi Familia Vota. (Erickson, Amy)
March 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , MOTION for Preliminary Injunction against all defendants by Plaintiffs Colorado Montana Wyoming State Area Conference of the NAACP, League of Women Voters of Colorado, Mi Familia Vota. (Erickson, Amy)
March 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (norlin, )
March 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Text Only Entry (norlin, )
March 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES:Amy Elizabeth Erickson. DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - counsel must submit a change of contact request through the Manage my Account tab at the PACER website at https://www.pacer.gov/, pursuant to D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(c) and 3.5 of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases).(Text Only Entry) (norlin, )
March 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number ACODC-8355042)Attorney Amy Elizabeth Erickson added to party Colorado Montana Wyoming State Area Conference of the NAACP(pty:pla), Attorney Amy Elizabeth Erickson added to party League of Women Voters of Colorado(pty:pla), Attorney Amy Elizabeth Erickson added to party Mi Familia Vota(pty:pla), filed by Colorado Montana Wyoming State Area Conference of the NAACP, Mi Familia Vota, League of Women Voters of Colorado. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Ashley Epp, #3 Summons Holly Kasun, #4 Summons Shawn Smith)(Erickson, Amy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Colorado Montana Wyoming State Area Conference of the NAACP et al v. United States Election Integrity Plan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Colorado Montana Wyoming State Area Conference of the NAACP
Represented By: Amy Elizabeth Erickson
Represented By: Ben Clements
Represented By: Brian Andrew Dillon
Represented By: Casey Carlton Breese
Represented By: Courtney Marie Hostetler
Represented By: Jean Paul Bradshaw
Represented By: John C. Bonifaz
Represented By: Reid Kelly Day
Represented By: Ronald Andrew Fein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: League of Women Voters of Colorado
Represented By: Amy Elizabeth Erickson
Represented By: Ben Clements
Represented By: Brian Andrew Dillon
Represented By: Casey Carlton Breese
Represented By: Courtney Marie Hostetler
Represented By: Jean Paul Bradshaw
Represented By: John C. Bonifaz
Represented By: Reid Kelly Day
Represented By: Ronald Andrew Fein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mi Familia Vota
Represented By: Amy Elizabeth Erickson
Represented By: Ben Clements
Represented By: Brian Andrew Dillon
Represented By: Casey Carlton Breese
Represented By: Courtney Marie Hostetler
Represented By: Jean Paul Bradshaw
Represented By: John C. Bonifaz
Represented By: Reid Kelly Day
Represented By: Ronald Andrew Fein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Election Integrity Plan
Represented By: Jessica Lynn Hays
Represented By: R. Scott Reisch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shawn Smith
Represented By: Jessica Lynn Hays
Represented By: R. Scott Reisch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ashley Epp
Represented By: Jessica Lynn Hays
Represented By: R. Scott Reisch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Holly Kasun
Represented By: Jessica Lynn Hays
Represented By: R. Scott Reisch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?