Mezzacapo v. Takeda Pharmaceuticals America, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Kailey Mezzacapo
Defendant: Takeda Pharmaceuticals America, Inc. d/b/a BioLife Plasma Services, Takeda Pharmaceuticals U.S.A., Inc. d/b/a BioLife Plasma Services, Takeda Pharmaceuticals America, Inc. doing business as BioLife Plasma Services, Takeda Pharmaceuticals U.S.A., Inc. doing business as BioLife Plasma Services and BioLife Plasma Services, L.P.
Case Number: 1:2022cv01304
Filed: May 25, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Scott T Varholak
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 13, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 7/13/2022. (morti, )
July 13, 2022 Filing 20 MINUTE ENTRY for Scheduling Conference held before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 7/13/2022. Discovery due by 6/5/2023. Dispositive Motions due by 9/2/2023. Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/8/2023 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. FTR: 402. (morti, )
July 6, 2022 Filing 19 Proposed Scheduling Order by Defendant BioLife Plasma Services, L.P.. (Taylor, Jacob)
June 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER OF REFERENCE. Pursuant to the consent of the parties to the jurisdiction of the magistrate judge #17 , this case is referred to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak for all purposes pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 6/28/2022. Text Only Entry (pabsec, )
June 28, 2022 Filing 17 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant BioLife Plasma Services, L.P. All parties consent.. (Taylor, Jacob)
June 23, 2022 Filing 16 ANSWER to #15 Amended Complaint by BioLife Plasma Services, L.P..(Taylor, Jacob)
June 13, 2022 Filing 15 PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND against BioLife Plasma Services, L.P., filed by Kailey Mezzacapo. (Entered pursuant to ECF 14)(cmadr, )
June 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER This matter is before the Court on #12 Notice of Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint. The Clerk of Court is directed to enter Dkt No. 12-2 as the operative complaint and to amend the case caption to reflect the current parties to the matter. SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 6/13/22. Text Only Entry (stvlc3, Andrew)
June 9, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of James H. Chalat by James H. Chalat on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney James H. Chalat added to party Kailey Mezzacapo(pty:pla) (Chalat, James)
June 9, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of Filing Amended Pleading re #6 Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Kailey Mezzacapo (Attachments: #1 Proposed Document District Court Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint and Jury Demand, #2 Proposed Document Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint and Jury Demand)(Hatten, Russell)
June 3, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Michele On-Ja Choe on behalf of Takeda Pharmaceuticals America, Inc., Takeda Pharmaceuticals U.S.A., Inc. Attorney Michele On-Ja Choe added to party Takeda Pharmaceuticals America, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Michele On-Ja Choe added to party Takeda Pharmaceuticals U.S.A., Inc. (pty:dft) (Choe, Michele)
June 2, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Russell R. Hatten by Russell Ray Hatten on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Russell Ray Hatten added to party Kailey Mezzacapo(pty:pla) (Hatten, Russell)
May 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER SETTING DEADLINE FOR FILING ELECTION CONCERNING CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO MAGISTRATE JURISDICTION FORM AND SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 26 May 2022. Consent Form due by 6/29/2022. Proposed Scheduling Order due 7/6/2022. Scheduling Conference set for 7/13/2022 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. (cmadr, )
May 25, 2022 Filing 8 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (sapod, ) Modified on 5/31/2022 to correct text (sapod, ).
May 25, 2022 Filing 7 RETURN of Service of Summons, Complaint and Jury Demand upon Defendant/Respondent on 4/25/2022 (sapod, ) Modified on 5/26/2022 to correct text and to correct PDF (sapod, ).
May 25, 2022 Filing 6 Complaint and Jury Demand against Takeda Pharmaceuticals America, Inc., Takeda Pharmaceuticals U.S.A., Inc., filed by Kailey Mezzacapo.(sapod, ) Modified to correct PDF on 5/26/2022 (sapod, ).
May 25, 2022 Filing 5 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (sapod, )
May 25, 2022 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Text Only Entry. (sapod, )
May 25, 2022 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint by Takeda Pharmaceuticals America, Inc., Takeda Pharmaceuticals U.S.A., Inc..(Taylor, Jacob)
May 25, 2022 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Takeda Pharmaceuticals Company Limited for Takeda Pharmaceuticals U.S.A., Inc. ; Corporate Parent Takeda Pharmaceuticals U.S.A., Inc. for Takeda Pharmaceuticals America, Inc.. (Taylor, Jacob)
May 25, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Takeda Pharmaceuticals U.S.A., Inc., Takeda Pharmaceuticals America, Inc. from District Court of Boulder County, Colorado, Case Number 2022CV30239. (Filing fee $ 402, Receipt Number ACODC-8476440), filed by Takeda Pharmaceuticals U.S.A., Inc., Takeda Pharmaceuticals America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Mezzacapo Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Return of Service, #3 Exhibit C - Redacted Colorado Secretary of State, #4 Exhibit D - Civil Case Cover Sheet, #5 Exhibit E - State Court Docket and Filings, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Taylor, Jacob)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mezzacapo v. Takeda Pharmaceuticals America, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kailey Mezzacapo
Represented By: James H. Chalat
Represented By: Russell Ray Hatten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Takeda Pharmaceuticals America, Inc. d/b/a BioLife Plasma Services
Represented By: Jacob Daniel Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Takeda Pharmaceuticals U.S.A., Inc. d/b/a BioLife Plasma Services
Represented By: Jacob Daniel Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Takeda Pharmaceuticals America, Inc. doing business as BioLife Plasma Services
Represented By: Michele On-Ja Choe
Represented By: Jacob Daniel Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Takeda Pharmaceuticals U.S.A., Inc. doing business as BioLife Plasma Services
Represented By: Michele On-Ja Choe
Represented By: Jacob Daniel Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BioLife Plasma Services, L.P.
Represented By: Michele On-Ja Choe
Represented By: Jacob Daniel Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?