Southwest Airlines Co v. Scott Moss et al
Plaintiff: Southwest Airlines Co
Defendant: Scott Moss Official Capacity as Director of Division of Labor Standards, Scott Moss and Philip J. Weiser
Intervenor Defendant: Transport Workers Union, Local 556
Case Number: 1:2022cv01342
Filed: May 27, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: William J Martinez
Referring Judge: N Reid Neureiter
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201 Declaratory Judgment
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 30, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 76 Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 30 May 2023. It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Stay Case (Dkt. #74 ) is GRANTED. This case is STAYED for 30 days. The parties shall file a Status Report or dismissal papers on or before June 29, 2023. PLEASE READ ATTACHED MINUTE ORDER. (cmadr, )
May 30, 2023 Filing 75 MEMORANDUM regarding #74 Unopposed MOTION to Stay Case filed by Southwest Airlines Co. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter by Judge William J. Martinez on 5/30/2023. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
May 26, 2023 Filing 74 Unopposed MOTION to Stay Case by Plaintiff Southwest Airlines Co. (McClelland, Jeffrey)
May 22, 2023 Filing 73 BRIEF in Opposition to #68 Amended MOTION to Intervene Southwest Airline Co.'s Opposition to Transport Workers Union Local 556'S Motion to Intervene as Defendant filed by Plaintiff Southwest Airlines Co. (KohSweeney, Adam)
May 15, 2023 Filing 72 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jared Benjamin Make on behalf of Transport Workers Union, Local 556Attorney Jared Benjamin Make added to party Transport Workers Union, Local 556(pty:intvd) (Make, Jared)
May 12, 2023 Filing 71 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES re: #70 Notice of Entry of Appearance filed by attorney Katherine Greenberg. Attorney has used an incorrect signature format in violation of D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 4.3(a) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases). DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. In the future, the filer must affix an electronic s/signature to all future documents.(Text Only Entry) (trvo, )
May 12, 2023 Filing 70 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Katherine A. Greenberg on behalf of Transport Workers Union, Local 556Attorney Katherine A. Greenberg added to party Transport Workers Union, Local 556(pty:intvd) (Greenberg, Katherine)
May 5, 2023 Filing 69 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Andrew H. Turner on behalf of Transport Workers Union, Local 556Attorney Andrew H. Turner added to party Transport Workers Union, Local 556(pty:intvd) (Turner, Andrew)
May 1, 2023 Filing 68 Amended MOTION to Intervene by Intervenor Defendant Transport Workers Union, Local 556. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration in support of intervention, #2 Exhibit Proposed answer and counterclaim)(Collins, Valerie)
May 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER striking Transport Workers Union Local 556's ("TWU Local 556") Motion to Intervene as Defendant and Counterclaimant and Supporting Memorandum of Law #65 . The Motion is STRICKEN for failure to comply with this Court's Revised Practice Standard III.C.1. This Court's Revised Practice Standard III.C.1 states that the page limits for "ALL OTHER motions... Motion and Response [shall be]: 15 pages; Reply: 10 pages". TWU Local 556 is GRANTED leave to file an Amended Motion to Intervene which complies in all respects with this Court's Revised Practice Standards on or before May 5, 2023. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 5/1/2023. Text Only Entry(wjmsec, )
May 1, 2023 Filing 66 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES re: #64 Notice of Entry of Appearance filed by attorney Valerie L. Collins. DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - counsel must submit a change of contact request through the Manage my Account tab at the PACER website at https://www.pacer.gov/, pursuant to D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(c) and 3.5 of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases).(Text Only Entry) (trvo, )
April 28, 2023 Filing 65 First MOTION to Intervene by Intervenor Defendant Transport Workers Union, Local 556. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration in support of intervention, #2 Proposed Document Proposed answer and counterclaim)(Collins, Valerie)
April 28, 2023 Filing 64 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Valerie Lisa Collins on behalf of Transport Workers Union, Local 556Attorney Valerie Lisa Collins added to party Transport Workers Union, Local 556(pty:intvd) (Collins, Valerie)
April 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 63 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 18 April 2023. (cmadr, )
April 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 62 Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 18 April 2023. It is hereby ORDERED that the Joint Motion for Entry of Stipulated Protective Order (Dkt. #60 ) is GRANTED. The proposed Stipulated Protective Order is APPROVED with the modifications at paragraph 11 and made an Order of Court.(cmadr, )
April 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 61 MEMORANDUM regarding #60 Joint MOTION for Protective Order (also filed on behalf of Defendant) filed by Southwest Airlines Co. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter by Judge William J. Martinez on 4/17/2023. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
April 17, 2023 Filing 60 Joint MOTION for Protective Order (also filed on behalf of Defendant) by Plaintiff Southwest Airlines Co. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Stipulated Protective Order)(McClelland, Jeffrey)
April 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 59 SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on April 5, 2023. (rvill, )
April 5, 2023 Filing 58 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 4/5/2023. Telephonic Status Conference set for 9/18/2023 02:00 PM in Courtroom C203 before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Five minutes prior to the start of the hearing, the parties shall call the conference line (888) 398-2342, Access Code 5755390# to participate. Discovery due by 1/19/2024. Dispositive Motions due by 2/16/2024. FTR: Courtroom C203. (rvill, )
March 29, 2023 Filing 57 Proposed Scheduling Order (also filed on behalf of Defendant) by Plaintiff Southwest Airlines Co. (McClelland, Jeffrey)
March 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 56 Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 13 March 2023. It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Request Setting ofScheduling Conference (Dkt. #54 ) is GRANTED. It is hereby ORDERED that atelephonic Scheduling Conference is SET on April 5, 2023 at 10:30 a.m. The parties are directed to call the conference line as a participant at (888) 398-2342, Access Code 5755390# at the scheduled time. PLEASE READ ATTACHED MINUTE ORDER. (cmadr, )
March 13, 2023 Filing 55 MEMORANDUM regarding #54 Unopposed MOTION for Hearing/Conference Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Request Setting of Scheduling Conference filed by Southwest Airlines Co. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter by Judge William J. Martinez on 3/13/2023. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
March 10, 2023 Filing 54 Unopposed MOTION for Hearing/Conference Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Request Setting of Scheduling Conference by Plaintiff Southwest Airlines Co. (McClelland, Jeffrey)
December 2, 2022 Filing 53 REPLY to Response to #45 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Scott Moss. (Santillan, Tanya)
November 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER granting Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss #51 . Defendant is granted leave, for good cause shown, to file said Reply on or before December 2, 2022. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 11/23/2022. Text Only Entry(wjmsec, )
November 21, 2022 Filing 51 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #45 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint (Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition) by Defendant Scott Moss. (Santillan, Tanya)
November 9, 2022 Filing 50 BRIEF in Opposition to #45 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint / Southwest Airlines Co.'s Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff Southwest Airlines Co. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J)(KohSweeney, Adam)
October 31, 2022 Filing 49 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jason Matthew Zarrow on behalf of Southwest Airlines CoAttorney Jason Matthew Zarrow added to party Southwest Airlines Co(pty:pla) (Zarrow, Jason)
October 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER granting #47 Plaintiffs Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendants Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiffs are granted leave, for good cause shown, to file said Response on or before November 9, 2022. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 10/11/2022. Text Only Entry (wjmlc3, )
October 11, 2022 Filing 47 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to to Respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiff Southwest Airlines Co. (McClelland, Jeffrey)
September 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 46 Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 29 September 2022. In light of the Second Amended Complaint for Declaratory Judgment (Dkt. #43 ),which removed Attorney General Phil Weiser as a defendant, it is hereby ORDEREDthat the Attorney General's Motion to Stay Discovery, Stay Fed. R. Civ. P. 26 Deadlines, and Vacate the Sept. 6 Scheduling Conference Pending Resolution of the Attorney General's Motion to Dismiss (Dkt. #26 ) is DENIED AS MOOT. PLEASE READ ATTACHED MINUTE ORDER. (cmadr, )
September 28, 2022 Filing 45 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint by Defendant Scott Moss. (Brennan, Evan)
September 14, 2022 Filing 44 NOTICE of Filing Amended Pleading re #43 Amended Complaint (Second Amended Complaint) by Plaintiff Southwest Airlines Co (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Black Lined Second Amended Complaint)(Dawson, Micah)
September 14, 2022 Filing 43 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment against Scott Moss, Philip J. Weiser, filed by Southwest Airlines Co.(Dawson, Micah) Modified on 9/19/2022 to add text (trvo, ).
September 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 42 Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 2 September 2022. This matter is before the court sua sponte. In light of the Joint Notice of Intentionto File Second Amended Complaint and Request to Vacate Motions Hearing (Dkt. #41 ), it is hereby ORDERED that the Motion Hearing set on September 6, 2022 at 11:00 a.m. is VACATED. PLEASE READ ATTACHED MINUTE ORDER. (cmadr, )
September 1, 2022 Filing 41 NOTICE of Filing Amended Pleading Second Amended Complaint and Request Vacate Motion Hearing by Plaintiff Southwest Airlines Co (Dawson, Micah)
August 22, 2022 Filing 40 RESPONSE to #26 MOTION to Stay ATTORNEY GENERALS MOTION TO STAY DISCOVERY, STAY FED. R. CIV. P. 26 DEADLINES, AND VACATE THE SEPT. 6 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE PENDING RESOLUTION OF THE ATTORNEY GENERALS MOTION TO DISMISS filed by Plaintiff Southwest Airlines Co. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Dawson, Micah)
August 18, 2022 Filing 39 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Tanya M. Santillan on behalf of Scott MossAttorney Tanya M. Santillan added to party Scott Moss(pty:dft) (Santillan, Tanya)
August 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 38 Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 15 August 2022. In light of Judge Martinez's Order (Dkt. # 37 ) referring the Attorney General'sMotion to Stay Discovery (Dkt. #26 ), the Court finds it prudent to order expedited briefing. Therefore, it is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff shall file a response to the Motion on or before August 22, 2022, and the Attorney General shall file a reply on or before September 2, 2022. It is further ORDERED that the Status Conference set on September 6, 2022 at 11:00 a.m. is CONVERTED a Motion Hearing. The parties shall be prepared to argue their respective positions concerning the Motion to Stay Discovery. The parties are reminded to call the conference line as a participant at (888) 398-2342, Access Code5755390# at the scheduled time. PLEASE READ ATTACHED MINUTE ORDER. (cmadr, )
August 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER: This matter is before the Court on Defendant Moss's Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint #24 and Attorney General's Motion to Dismiss #25 . Notwithstanding the fact that the Defendants filed their Motions to Dismiss while this case was pending before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter, the motions are hereby STRICKEN for non-compliance with the undersigned's Revised Practice Standard III.D.1. This Practice Standard requires counsel to confer prior to filing a motion pursuant to Rule 12, in order to discuss whether the alleged deficiency in the operative complaint can be cured by amendment, and to exercise their best efforts to stipulate to such amendment. This Order is without prejudice to the filing or refiling of any Rule 12 motion by any party, if warranted by the facts of this case and the applicable law, and in compliance with all applicable federal rules and statutes, and the undersigned's Revised Practice Standards. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 8/15/2022. Text Only Entry(wjmsec, )
August 15, 2022 Filing 36 MEMORANDUM regarding #26 MOTION to Stay ATTORNEY GENERALS MOTION TO STAY DISCOVERY, STAY FED. R. CIV. P. 26 DEADLINES, AND VACATE THE SEPT. 6 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE PENDING RESOLUTION OF THE ATTORNEY GENERALS MOTION TO DISMISS filed by Philip J. Weiser. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter by Judge William J. Martinez on 8/15/2022. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
August 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER: Counsel for the parties and all counsel who may later enter an appearance shall review and familiarize themselves with the undersigned's Revised Practice Standards (as most recently revised effective December 1, 2021 and as they may be amended from time to time), which may be downloaded #here. Counsel shall also review and familiarize themselves with the Practice Standards of the Magistrate Judge assigned in the referral role in this case. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 8/15/2022. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
August 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Magistrate Judge Neureiter, or such other Magistrate Judge who may in the future be reassigned this case, is designated to conduct NDISPO proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 72(a) and (b). Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the Magistrate Judge or on the request of the parties by motion, the court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 8/15/2022. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
August 12, 2022 Filing 33 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #32 Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge William J. Martinez and drawn to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. All future pleadings should be designated as 22-cv-01342-WJM. (Text Only Entry) (cmadr, )
August 12, 2022 Filing 32 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Southwest Airlines Co All parties do not consent.. (McClelland, Jeffrey)
August 10, 2022 Filing 31 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Adam Paul KohSweeney on behalf of Southwest Airlines CoAttorney Adam Paul KohSweeney added to party Southwest Airlines Co(pty:pla) (KohSweeney, Adam)
August 10, 2022 Filing 30 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Robert Alan Siegel on behalf of Southwest Airlines CoAttorney Robert Alan Siegel added to party Southwest Airlines Co(pty:pla) (Siegel, Robert)
August 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MINUTE ORDER. This matter is before the Court upon review of the docket. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file the Consent/Non-Consent Form (Dkt. #9 ) on or before August 12, 2022. It is further ORDERED that the Scheduling Conference set for September 6, 2022 at 11:00 a.m. is CONVERTED to a Status Conference. The parties are directed to call the conference line as a participant at (888) 398-2342, Access Code 5755390# at the scheduled time. By Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on August 10, 2022. (rvill, )
August 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MINUTE ORDER. The Unopposed Motion for Extensions of Time to Respond to Motions to Dismiss (Dkt. #27 ) is GRANTED. Plaintiff shall respond to the motions to dismiss (Dkt. # #24 & #25 ) on or before September 22, 2022. By Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on August 10, 2022. (rvill, )
August 10, 2022 Filing 27 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #24 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint, #25 MOTION to Dismiss Attorney General's Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiff Southwest Airlines Co. (McClelland, Jeffrey)
August 2, 2022 Filing 26 MOTION to Stay ATTORNEY GENERALS MOTION TO STAY DISCOVERY, STAY FED. R. CIV. P. 26 DEADLINES, AND VACATE THE SEPT. 6 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE PENDING RESOLUTION OF THE ATTORNEY GENERALS MOTION TO DISMISS by Defendant Philip J. Weiser. (Kotlarczyk, Michael)
August 2, 2022 Filing 25 MOTION to Dismiss Attorney General's Motion to Dismiss by Defendant Philip J. Weiser. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Kotlarczyk, Michael)
August 2, 2022 Filing 24 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint by Defendant Scott Moss. (Brennan, Evan)
July 28, 2022 Filing 23 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by John August Lizza on behalf of Scott MossAttorney John August Lizza added to party Scott Moss(pty:dft) (Lizza, John)
July 19, 2022 Filing 22 Exhibits in Support of #21 Notice of Filing Amended Pleading by Plaintiff Southwest Airlines Co. (Dawson, Micah)
July 19, 2022 Filing 21 NOTICE of Filing Amended Pleading re #1 Complaint, First Amended Complaint for Declaratory Judgment by Plaintiff Southwest Airlines Co (Attachments: #1 Exhibit legal black-line of pleading)(Dawson, Micah)
July 19, 2022 Filing 20 AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT against All Defendants, filed by Southwest Airlines Co.(McClelland, Jeffrey)
June 29, 2022 Filing 19 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jeffrey H. McClelland on behalf of Southwest Airlines CoAttorney Jeffrey H. McClelland added to party Southwest Airlines Co(pty:pla) (McClelland, Jeffrey)
June 28, 2022 Filing 18 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to the Complaint to July 20, 2022 by Defendants Scott Moss, Philip J. Weiser.. (Dawson, Micah)
June 28, 2022 Filing 17 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Evan P. Brennan on behalf of Scott MossAttorney Evan P. Brennan added to party Scott Moss(pty:dft) (Brennan, Evan)
June 28, 2022 Filing 16 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Michael T. Kotlarczyk on behalf of Philip J. Weiser Attorney Michael T. Kotlarczyk added to party Philip J. Weiser (pty:dft) (Kotlarczyk, Michael)
June 10, 2022 Filing 15 Utility Setting Deadlines: Scott Moss answer due 6/29/2022; Philip J. Weiser answer due 6/29/2022. (Entered pursuant to ECF #11 through #14 ) Text Only Entry (cmadr, ) Modified to correct answer due date on 6/10/2022 (cmadr, ).
June 9, 2022 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT Return of Service by Plaintiff Southwest Airlines Co. (Dawson, Micah)
June 9, 2022 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT Return of Service by Plaintiff Southwest Airlines Co. (Dawson, Micah)
June 9, 2022 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT Return of Service by Plaintiff Southwest Airlines Co. (Dawson, Micah)
June 9, 2022 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT Return of Service - by Plaintiff Southwest Airlines Co. (Dawson, Micah)
June 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE AND SETTING DEADLINE FOR FILING OF CONSENT/NON-CONSENT FORM by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 1 June 2022. Consent Form due by 8/23/2022. Proposed Scheduling Order due 8/31/2022. Scheduling Conference set for 9/6/2022 11:00 AM in Courtroom C203 before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. The Scheduling Conference will be conducted via telephone. The parties are directed to call the conference line as a participant at (888) 398-2342, Access Code 5755390# at the scheduled time. (cmadr, )
June 1, 2022 Filing 9 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (athom, )
June 1, 2022 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE by Senior Judge Blackburn. This case is randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. All future pleadings should be designated as 22-cv-01342-NRN. (athom, )
June 1, 2022 Filing 7 SUMMONSES issued by Clerk. (athom, )
May 31, 2022 Filing 6 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Scott Moss by Plaintiff Southwest Airlines Co. (Dawson, Micah)
May 31, 2022 Filing 5 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Philip J Weiser by Plaintiff Southwest Airlines Co. (Dawson, Micah)
May 27, 2022 Filing 4 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). No Summons issued. (tgall, )
May 27, 2022 Filing 3 Case assigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn and drawn to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Text Only Entry. (tgall, )
May 27, 2022 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Dawson, Micah)
May 27, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment against Scott Moss Official Capacity as Director of Division of Labor Standards (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number BCODC-8480347)Attorney Micah David Dawson added to party Southwest Airlines Co(pty:pla), filed by Southwest Airlines Co. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Dawson, Micah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Southwest Airlines Co v. Scott Moss et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Southwest Airlines Co
Represented By: Micah David Dawson
Represented By: Jeffrey H. McClelland
Represented By: Adam Paul KohSweeney
Represented By: Robert Alan Siegel
Represented By: Jason Matthew Zarrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Moss Official Capacity as Director of Division of Labor Standards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Moss
Represented By: Evan P. Brennan
Represented By: John August Lizza
Represented By: Tanya M. Santillan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philip J. Weiser
Represented By: Michael T. Kotlarczyk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Transport Workers Union, Local 556
Represented By: Andrew H. Turner
Represented By: Valerie Lisa Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?