Ferrara Candy Company v. H C, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Ferrara Candy Company
Defendant: H C, LLC and Rajkumar Dhameja doing business as Luxury Group
Case Number: 1:2022cv01359
Filed: May 31, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Daniel D Domenico
Referring Judge: Michael E Hegarty
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1051 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 13, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 13 July 2022. At the emailed request of Plaintiff, the Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) scheduling conference set for August 1, 2022 is vacated and rescheduled for September 19, 2022, at 10:00 a.m., in Courtroom A-501, on the fifth floor of the Alfred A. Arraj United States Courthouse located at 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado. (cmadr, )
June 3, 2022 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE Form AO 120 - Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark by Plaintiff Ferrara Candy Company. (McFarland, J.)
June 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 1 June 2022. Proposed Scheduling Order due 7/25/2022. Scheduling Conference set for 8/1/2022 11:15 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. (cmadr, )
June 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of Local Civ. R. 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions, and (5) pursuant to Local Civ. R. 16.6 and at the discretion of the Magistrate Judge, convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 6/1/2022. Text Only Entry (dddlc4)
June 1, 2022 Filing 4 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). No Summons Issued. (norlin, )
June 1, 2022 Filing 3 Case assigned to Judge Daniel D. Domenico and drawn to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Text Only Entry (norlin, )
June 1, 2022 Filing 2 Administrative Notice: Notice to filer of non-compliance with Patent, Trademark, or Copyright Action case opening procedures. It is the responsibility of the attorney or pro se party commencing the action to follow Local Rule D.C.COLO.LCivR 3.1. Please file a properly completed Report form, which can be found on the courts website. (Text Only Entry) (norlin, )
May 31, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against H C, LLC, Rajkumar Dhameja (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number ACODC-8483016)Attorney J. Lucas McFarland added to party Ferrara Candy Company(pty:pla), filed by Ferrara Candy Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement)(McFarland, J.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ferrara Candy Company v. H C, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ferrara Candy Company
Represented By: J. Lucas McFarland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H C, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rajkumar Dhameja doing business as Luxury Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?