Citizens Project et al v. Colorado Springs et al
Plaintiff: Citizens Project, Colorado Latinos Vote, League of Women Voters of the Pikes Peak Region and Black/Latino Leadership Coalition
Defendant: City of Colorado Springs, Office of the City Clerk of Colorado Springs and Sarah Ball Johnson
Case Number: 1:2022cv01365
Filed: June 1, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Maritza Dominguez Braswell
Referring Judge: Philip A Brimmer
2 Judge: Michael E Hegarty
3 Judge: Charlotte N Sweeney
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 13, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 38 PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Maritza Dominguez Braswell on 12/13/2022. (evaug)
December 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting #35 Motion for Protective Order by Magistrate Judge Maritza Dominguez Braswell on 12/13/2022. Text Only Entry(evaug)
December 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MEMORANDUM regarding #35 Joint Motion for Protective Order Governing Confidential Information and Documents. Motion #35 is referred to Magistrate Judge Maritza Dominguez Braswell, by Judge Charlotte N. Sweeney on 12/12/2022. Text Only Entry (cnssec.)
December 12, 2022 Filing 35 Joint MOTION for Protective Order Governing Confidential Information and Documents by Plaintiffs Black/Latino Leadership Coalition, Citizens Project, Colorado Latinos Vote, League of Women Voters of the Pikes Peak Region. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Stipulated Protective Order Governing Confidential Information and Documents)(Lee, Theresa)
November 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MINUTE ORDER granting #32 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Written Discovery. Plaintiffs shall respond to Defendants' written discovery requests on or before December 13, 2022. Defendants shall respond to Plaintiffs' written discovery requests on or before December 16, 2022. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Maritza Dominguez Braswell on 11/21/2022. Text Only Entry(mdblc1)
November 21, 2022 Filing 33 MEMORANDUM regarding #32 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Written Discovery. Motion #32 is referred to Magistrate Judge Maritza Dominguez Braswell, by Judge Charlotte N. Sweeney on 11/21/2022. Text Only Entry (cnssec.)
November 21, 2022 Filing 32 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Written Discovery by Defendants City of Colorado Springs, Sarah Ball Johnson. (Lamphere, William)
November 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MINUTE ORDER granting #29 Joint Motion for Clarification. The deadline to serve all forms of written discovery, including interrogatories and requests for production and admission, is extended to May 10, 2023. By Magistrate Judge Maritza Dominguez Braswell on 11/14/22. Text Only Entry(mdblc2)
November 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MEMORANDUM regarding #29 Joint MOTION to Clarify re #25 Scheduling Conference, #26 Scheduling Order. Motion #29 is referred to Magistrate Judge Maritza Dominguez Braswell, by Judge Charlotte N. Sweeney on 11/14/2022. Text Only Entry (cnssec.)
November 14, 2022 Filing 29 Joint MOTION to Clarify re #25 Scheduling Conference, #26 Scheduling Order by Plaintiffs Black/Latino Leadership Coalition, Citizens Project, Colorado Latinos Vote, League of Women Voters of the Pikes Peak Region. (Lee, Theresa)
September 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MINUTE ORDER: A Final Pretrial Conference is set for 12/7/2023 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom C204 before Judge Charlotte N. Sweeney. The parties Proposed Pretrial Order is due by 11/30/2023. By Judge Charlotte N. Sweeney on 9/8/2022. Text Only Entry (cnssec. )
September 7, 2022 Filing 27 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Tracy M. Lessig on behalf of City of Colorado Springs, Sarah Ball JohnsonAttorney Tracy M. Lessig added to party City of Colorado Springs(pty:dft), Attorney Tracy M. Lessig added to party Sarah Ball Johnson(pty:dft) (Lessig, Tracy)
August 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 6/9/2023. Dispositive Motions due by 7/28/2023. So ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Maritza Dominguez Braswell on 8/31/2022. (evaug )
August 31, 2022 Filing 25 COURTROOM MINUTES for Scheduling Conference held on 8/31/2022 before Magistrate Judge Maritza Dominguez Braswell: Scheduling Order shall be entered as modified on the record. Within 24 hours after the scheduling conference, parties shall jointly contact chambers by email (Sweeney_chambers@cod.uscourts.gov) to get a final pretrial conference date. FTR: Courtroom 101. (evaug )
August 23, 2022 Filing 24 Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiffs Black/Latino Leadership Coalition, Citizens Project, Colorado Latinos Vote, League of Women Voters of the Pikes Peak Region. (Lee, Theresa)
August 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MINUTE ORDER: The Telephonic Scheduling Conference is RESET for August 31, 2022 at 09:45 AM before Magistrate Judge Maritza Dominguez Braswell. At the appointed time, each participant should call 571-353-2301, and then enter ID # 617286044. The court expects parties to utilize land line telephones rather than cellular devices whenever possible. If a party must utilize a cellular telephone, the caller must be in an indoor stationary position. All other dates remain as previously set. The parties' joint proposed scheduling order remains due August 24, 2022. By Magistrate Judge Maritza Dominguez Braswell on 08/03/22. Text Only Entry (mdblc2)
August 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 REASSIGNMENT OF JUDGE. This action is reassigned to Judge Charlotte N. Sweeney upon her appointment. Unless otherwise ordered, the dates and times for all previously scheduled matters will be maintained and will now be handled by Judge Sweeney in Courtroom 204 in the Byron Rogers Courthouse. Her chambers are located in C-253 and her telephone number is (303) 335-2610. All future pleadings should be designated as 22-cv-01365-CNS-MDB. (Text only entry) (agarc, )
July 29, 2022 Filing 21 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by City of Colorado Springs, Sarah Ball Johnson.(Lamphere, William)
July 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MINUTE ORDER granting #18 Joint Motion to Amend Minute Order. The parties shall hold a Rule 26(f) meeting on or before August 17, 2022. The proposed scheduling order shall be due August 24, 2022. The Telephonic Scheduling Conference is RESET for August 31, 2022 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Maritza Dominguez Braswell. At the appointed time, each participant should call 571-353-2301, and then enter ID # 617286044. The court expects parties to utilize land line telephones rather than cellular devices whenever possible. If a party must utilize a cellular telephone, the caller must be in an indoor stationary position. By Magistrate Judge Maritza Dominguez Braswell on 07/13/22. Text Only Entry(mdblc2)
July 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MEMORANDUM regarding #18 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify #8 Order to Reschedule Rule 16(b) conference and Rule 26(f) meeting filed by Black/Latino Leadership Coalition, League of Women Voters of the Pikes Peak Region, Citizens Project, Colorado Latinos Vote. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Maritza Dominguez Braswell, by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 7/13/2022. Text Only Entry (pabsec, )
July 13, 2022 Filing 18 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify #8 Order to Reschedule Rule 16(b) conference and Rule 26(f) meeting by Plaintiffs Black/Latino Leadership Coalition, Citizens Project, Colorado Latinos Vote, League of Women Voters of the Pikes Peak Region. (Lee, Theresa)
July 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 REASSIGNING MAGISTRATE JUDGE. This action is reassigned to Magistrate Judge Maritza Dominguez Braswell, upon her appointment. All future pleadings should reference Magistrate Judge Dominguez Braswell at the end of the civil action number (such as 22-cv-1365-PAB-MDB. Unless otherwise ordered, the dates and times for all previously scheduled matters will be maintained and will now be handled by Magistrate Judge Dominguez Braswell in Suite 100. Her chambers are located at 212 North Wasatch Avenue, Suite 100, Colorado Springs, CO 80903. Her telephone number is 719-575-0328. (angar, )
June 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 6/24/2022, re: #14 Notice of Dismissal of Party. ORDERED the case was dismissed without prejudice against defendant Office of the City Clerk of Colorado Springs as of the entry of the Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(I) [Docket No. 14]. No order of dismissal is necessary. (sphil, )
June 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 23 June 2022. For good cause shown, Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading to the Complaint #12 is granted. Defendants shall file their answer or other response to the operative pleading on or before July 29, 2022.(cmadr, )
June 23, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Party Office of the City Clerk of Colorado Springs by Plaintiffs Black/Latino Leadership Coalition, Citizens Project, Colorado Latinos Vote, League of Women Voters of the Pikes Peak Region (Hessel, Daniel)
June 22, 2022 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM regarding #12 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint, filed by Office of the City Clerk of Colorado Springs, City of Colorado Springs, Sarah Ball Johnson. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty, by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 6/22/2022. Text Only Entry (pabsec, )
June 22, 2022 Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint, by Defendants City of Colorado Springs, Sarah Ball Johnson, Office of the City Clerk of Colorado Springs. (Lamphere, William)
June 9, 2022 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Sarah Ball Johnson served on 6/3/2022, answer due 6/24/2022. (Hessel, Daniel)
June 7, 2022 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Office of the City Clerk of Colorado Springs served on 6/3/2022, answer due 6/24/2022. (Hessel, Daniel)
June 7, 2022 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. City of Colorado Springs served on 6/3/2022, answer due 6/24/2022. (Hessel, Daniel)
June 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 2 June 2022. Proposed Scheduling Order due 7/26/2022. Scheduling Conference set for 8/2/2022 10:15 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. (cmadr, )
June 1, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Nicholas O. Stephanopoulos on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Nicholas O. Stephanopoulos added to party Black/Latino Leadership Coalition(pty:pla), Attorney Nicholas O. Stephanopoulos added to party Citizens Project(pty:pla), Attorney Nicholas O. Stephanopoulos added to party Colorado Latinos Vote(pty:pla), Attorney Nicholas O. Stephanopoulos added to party League of Women Voters of the Pikes Peak Region(pty:pla) (Stephanopoulos, Nicholas)
June 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty for non-dispositive matters. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, and (4) conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding, by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 6/01/2022. Text Only Entry (pabsec, )
June 1, 2022 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE by Senior Judge Blackburn. This case is randomly reassigned to Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer and drawn to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. All future pleadings should be designated as 22-cv-01365-PAB. (athom, )
June 1, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Daniel Jacob Hessel on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Daniel Jacob Hessel added to party Black/Latino Leadership Coalition(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel Jacob Hessel added to party Citizens Project(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel Jacob Hessel added to party Colorado Latinos Vote(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel Jacob Hessel added to party League of Women Voters of the Pikes Peak Region(pty:pla) (Hessel, Daniel)
June 1, 2022 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (tgall, )
June 1, 2022 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn and drawn to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Text Only Entry. (tgall, )
June 1, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against City of Colorado Springs, Sarah Ball Johnson, Office of the City Clerk of Colorado Springs (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number BCODC-8483272), filed by Citizens Project, Black/Latino Leadership Coalition, League of Women Voters of the Pikes Peak Region, Colorado Latinos Vote. (Attachments: #1 Summons City of Colorado Springs, #2 Summons Office of the City Clerk of Colorado Springs, #3 Summons Sarah Ball Johnson, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lee, Theresa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Citizens Project et al v. Colorado Springs et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Citizens Project
Represented By: Theresa Jeane Lee
Represented By: Daniel Jacob Hessel
Represented By: Nicholas O. Stephanopoulos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Colorado Latinos Vote
Represented By: Theresa Jeane Lee
Represented By: Daniel Jacob Hessel
Represented By: Nicholas O. Stephanopoulos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: League of Women Voters of the Pikes Peak Region
Represented By: Theresa Jeane Lee
Represented By: Daniel Jacob Hessel
Represented By: Nicholas O. Stephanopoulos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Black/Latino Leadership Coalition
Represented By: Theresa Jeane Lee
Represented By: Daniel Jacob Hessel
Represented By: Nicholas O. Stephanopoulos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Colorado Springs
Represented By: William Erik Lamphere
Represented By: Tracy M. Lessig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Office of the City Clerk of Colorado Springs
Represented By: William Erik Lamphere
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sarah Ball Johnson
Represented By: William Erik Lamphere
Represented By: Tracy M. Lessig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?